Lois C Shikles
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

8:2018-bk-80151 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/18/2018
Approving
doc
05/21/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
62
07/19/2018
Notice of Withdrawal
70
10/10/2018
Limit Notice
77
12/23/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.