Longmire et al v. United States of America
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00153 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
06/27/2018
Complaint
2
06/27/2018
Civil Cover Sheet
3
06/28/2018
Unissued Summons
06/28/2018
1 - Summons Issued as to USA (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
08/13/2018
Order
5
08/31/2018
Extension of Time to File Answer
09/18/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
09/25/2018
Notice (Other)
8
10/02/2018
Answer to Complaint
9
10/02/2018
Initial Case Status Report Order
10
10/22/2018
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
11
01/10/2019
Order
12
02/06/2019
Stipulation
13
02/08/2019
Order on Stipulation

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.