Lonnie J Overton and Mary E Overton
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

8:2017-bk-83649 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
46
09/13/2018
Limit Notice
56
12/09/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
57
12/09/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
58
12/28/2018
Chapter 13 Trustee Final Report and Account
01/12/2019
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (Text entry; no document attached.)
64
01/25/2019
Incorrect Event (Notice of)
65
01/28/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
68
03/06/2019
Personal Financial Management Course Certificate
69
03/06/2019
Personal Financial Management Course Certificate

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.