Lorenzo Jordan and Deloise Bosha Jordan
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

2:2018-bk-00259 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
View docket sheet
Last full docket sheet refresh: 124 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
01/23/2018
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Fee Amount $310 Filed by Lorenzo Jordan, Deloise Bosha Jordan
2
01/23/2018
Chapter 13 Plan, and Request to Surrender Collateral. Filed by Joint Debtor Deloise Bosha Jordan, Debtor Lorenzo Jordan.
4
01/23/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor and Joint Debtor Filed by Joint Debtor Deloise Bosha Jordan, Debtor Lorenzo Jordan.
5
01/23/2018
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Lorenzo Jordan.
6
01/23/2018
Employee Income Records Filed by Joint Debtor Deloise Bosha Jordan.
7
01/23/2018
Appraisal Filed by Joint Debtor Deloise Bosha Jordan, Debtor Lorenzo Jordan.
8
01/23/2018
Tax Documents for the Year for 2016 Filed by Joint Debtor Deloise Bosha Jordan, Debtor Lorenzo Jordan.
9
01/23/2018
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 02/21/2018 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 04/03/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 04/03/2018. Government Proof of Claim due by 07/23/2018 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 04/23/2018.
01/24/2018
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for joint debtors Lorenzo Jordan and Deloise Bosha Jordan Case Number 01-00422, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 01/19/2001, Standard Discharge on 09/14/2006; Case Number 01-00422, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 01/19/2001.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10
01/24/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
doc
05/25/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.