Loretta M Blackmon
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-01637 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/24/2018
Meeting of Creditors Held
doc
05/29/2018
Dismiss Case - Other
doc
05/29/2018
Dismiss Case for Failure to File Documents under 521(i)
doc
05/29/2018
Trustee Objection to Confirmation of Plan
46
10/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
12/12/2018
Transcript (Text entry; no document attached.)
56
12/12/2018
Bench Sheet from Confirmation Hearing
57
12/14/2018
Confirming Chapter 13 Plan
58
12/17/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
12/26/2018
Close Adversary Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.