Lorona v. Arizona Summit law School LLC et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Arizona

2:2015-cv-00972 (azd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: 209 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
05/28/2015
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2015-000681. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-11726653 filed by Scott Thompson, Infilaw Corporation, Arizona Summit Law School LLC, Stephanie Lee. (submitted by Michael Catlett)
1
Exhibit
2
Notice of Removal
3
Civil Cover Sheet
4
Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(KMG
4 Attachments
2
05/28/2015
NOTICE - Verification of Michael S. Catlett to re: 1 Notice of Removal by Arizona Summit Law School LLC, Infilaw Corporation, Stephanie Lee, Scott Thompson. (submitted by Michael Cablett)
05/28/2015
*****State Court record received on 5/28/2015*****SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Paula C Lorona: Affidavits of Service re: Summons, Demand for Jury Trial, First Amended Complaint, upon Arizona Summit Law School LLC; Scott Thompson; Jane Doe Thompson; Infilaw Corporation on May 5, 2015.*****Affidavits of Service filed in State Court on 5/6/2015, docketed in U.S. District Court on 5/28/2015 for case management purposes.***** (KMG) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/28/2015
*****State Court record received on 5/28/2015*****SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Paula C Lorona: Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Demand for Jury Trial, First Amended Complaint upon Jason Lee; Jason Lee for Susan Lee on May 6, 2015.*****Affidavits of Service filed in State Court on 5/6/2015, docketed in U.S. District Court on 5/28/2015 for case management purposes.***** (KMG) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/28/2015
*****State Court record received on 5/28/2015*****SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Paula C Lorona: Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Demand for Jury Trial, First Amended Complaint upon Jason Lee for Stephanie Lee (not Susan Lee) on May 6, 2015.*****Affidavit of Service filed in State Court on 5/20/2015, docketed in U.S. District Court on 5/28/2015 for case management purposes.***** (KMG) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
05/28/2015
Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-11726653. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Neil V Wake. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-15-00972-PHX-NVW. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached.
4
05/29/2015
NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Arizona Summit Law School LLC, Infilaw Corporation.
5
05/29/2015
ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and 12(c) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. Therefore, the parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. See order for details. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 5/29/15.
6
06/01/2015
ORDER (STANDING ORDER FOR CERTAIN EMPLOYMENT CASES) - Plaintiff(s) shall provide a copy of this order to Defendant(s) at the time of service of the complaint or within 10 days of receipt of this Order, whichever is later. Plaintiff(s) shall file a notice of service of this order with the Court. See order for complete details. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 6/1/15.
7
06/01/2015
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Arizona Summit Law School LLC.
8
06/01/2015
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Infilaw Corporation.
9
06/04/2015
STIPULATION of Dismissal Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice by Jason Lee, Stephanie Lee, Scott Thompson.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
10
06/04/2015
STIPULATION for Filing Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint by Arizona Summit Law School LLC, Infilaw Corporation.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
11
06/05/2015
ORDER granting the parties' Stipulation (Doc. 10). FURTHER ORDERED that the Plaintiff shall file a Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint no later than Monday, 06/15/15. Upon the filing of a new amended complaint, Defendants shall have ten days to file a responsive pleading. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 6/5/15.
12
06/15/2015
STIPULATION by Arizona Summit Law School LLC.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
13
06/16/2015
ORDER that the Plaintiff shall file a Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint by no later than Thursday, 06/25/15. Upon the filing of a new amended complaint, Defendants shall have ten days to file a responsive pleading. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 6/16/15.
14
06/25/2015
NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Anthony Woods on behalf of Paula C Lorona.
15
06/25/2015
First MOTION to Amend/Correct First Amended Complaint by Paula C Lorona.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
16
07/13/2015
STIPULATION re: 15 First MOTION to Amend/Correct First Amended Complaint by Paula C Lorona.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
17
07/17/2015
ORDER denying 16 Stipulation to File Amended Exhibit A. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 7/17/15.
18
07/21/2015
AMENDED MOTION to Amend/Correct 16 Stipulation to File Amended Exhibit A to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Paula C Lorona.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
19
07/21/2015
ORDER granting Plaintiff's Amended Motion (Doc. 18). FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file her Second Amended Complaint no later than Thursday, 07/23/15. Upon the filing of Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, Defendants shall have ten days to file a responsive pleading. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 7/21/15.
20
07/22/2015
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Arizona Summit Law School LLC, Infilaw Corporation, Unknown Parties filed by Paula C Lorona.
21
08/03/2015
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Arizona Summit Law School LLC, Infilaw Corporation.
1
Exhibit A - Certificate of Conferral
2
Exhibit B - Charge
2 Attachments
22
08/20/2015
STIPULATION re: 21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Paula C Lorona.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
23
08/24/2015
ORDER: The Court having reviewed the parties' Joint Stipulation to Extend Response Deadlines to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 22), ORDERED granting the Stipulation. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall have up to and including August 27, 2015, to file a response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 21) and Defendants shall have up to and including September 14, 2015, to file their reply. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
24
08/27/2015
RESPONSE to Motion re: 21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Paula C Lorona.
1
Exhibit
1 Attachment
25
09/03/2015
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Arizona Summit Law School LLC, Infilaw Corporation.
26
09/09/2015
Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Arizona Summit Law School LLC, Infilaw Corporation.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
27
09/11/2015
PROTECTIVE ORDER - granting the parties' Stipulation (Doc. 26). See order for complete details. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 9/10/15.
28
09/14/2015
REPLY to Response to Motion re: 21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Arizona Summit Law School LLC, Infilaw Corporation.
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
29
11/19/2015
ORDER that Plaintiff file no later than 11/25/15, a short memorandum stating whether Plaintiff objects to the authenticity of the purported copy of the Charge of Discrimination attached to Defendants' Reply (Doc. 28 -1) and if so, on what grounds. If no memorandum is filed by that date, Plaintiff will be deemed to have waived all objections to the copy's authenticity. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 11/19/15.
30
11/24/2015
MEMORANDUM Plaintiff's Memorandum in Response to the Court's November 19, 2015 Order 29 Order by Plaintiff Paula C Lorona.
31
12/02/2015
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED setting oral argument re: 21 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for 12/10/2015 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 504, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Neil V. Wake. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
32
12/10/2015
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Neil V. Wake: Oral Argument held on 12/10/2015. Counsel argue their respective positions regarding the Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 21). Matter taken under advisement. Separate order to follow. APPEARANCES: Robert Mills and Sean Woods for Plaintiff. Eric Johnson and Michael Catlett for Defendants. (Court Reporter Charlotte Powers.) Hearing held 1:56 PM to 4:09 PM (with a recess from 3:13 PM to 3:26 PM) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
33
12/16/2015
ORDER that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 21) is granted with respect to every claim in the Second Amended Complaint (Doc. 20) except (1) Title VII sex discrimination arising from the Law School denying Lorona opportunities for promotion, requiring her to work late, and terminating her; (2) ADA discrimination on the basis of her association with her disabled children; and (3) retaliation for activity protected under Title VII. Infilaw remains a defendant only with respect to Lorona's Title VII and ADA discrimination claims arising from denied opportunities for promotion. FURTHER ORDERED that Lorona may file a further amended complaint by 01/15/16. If Lorona does not file a further amended complaint by that date, she will be held to the position that no amendment could be made that would revive the claims dismissed in this order and may proceed only with her surviving claims, and the time for Defendants to file a responsive pleading will begin to run on the next business day. See order for complete details. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 12/16/15.
34
01/14/2016
AMENDED COMPLAINT Third against All Defendants filed by Paula C Lorona.
35
01/28/2016
MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims : Counts One Through Three by Arizona Summit Law School LLC.
1
Exhibit
1 Attachment
36
02/11/2016
RESPONSE to Motion re: 35 MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims : Counts One Through Three of Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint filed by Paula C Lorona.
37
02/22/2016
REPLY to Response to Motion re: 35 MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims : Counts One Through Three of Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint filed by Arizona Summit Law School LLC.
38
05/04/2016
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED setting oral argument as to 35 MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims: Counts One Through Three for 5/13/2016 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 504, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Neil V. Wake. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
39
05/13/2016
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Neil V. Wake: Oral Argument held on 05/13/16. Counsel state their respective positions regarding Defendant Arizona Summit Law School, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Counts One Through Three of Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint (Doc. 35). Motion taken under advisement. Written order to follow. APPEARANCES: Sean A. Woods for Plaintiff. Michael S. Catlett and Eric B. Johnson for Defendants. (Court Reporter Laurie Adams.) Hearing held 1:49 PM to 3:20 PM This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
40
05/18/2016
ORDER that Defendant Arizona Summit Law School, LLC's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 35) Counts I, II, and III of the Third Amended Complaint (Doc. 34) is granted with prejudice only to the extent those Counts rely on fraud other than misrepresentation in enrollment statistics. The Motion is otherwise denied. FURTHER ORDERED that the parties may, as of the date of this order, begin discovery as to how many of the Law School's students were Alternative students during the times relevant to Lorona's fraud claims. This discovery shall conclude no later than Friday, 07/15/16. FURTHER ORDERED that if the Law School deems the outcome of this discovery dispositive of Lorona's fraud claims, it may file a motion for summary judgment to that effect no later than Monday, 08/01/16. If no such motion is filed, the parties may then begin general discovery as to Lorona's fraud claims. See order for details. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 5/17/16.
41
05/25/2016
NOTICE of Deposition of Shirley Mays, filed by Paula C Lorona.
42
05/25/2016
NOTICE of Deposition of Scott Thompson, filed by Paula C Lorona.
43
05/25/2016
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Paula C Lorona.
44
05/26/2016
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Paula C Lorona.
45
05/26/2016
NOTICE of Deposition of ARIZONA SUMMIT LAW SCHOOL, filed by Paula C Lorona.
46
05/27/2016
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Paula C Lorona.
47
05/28/2016
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Paula C Lorona.
48
05/28/2016
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Paula C Lorona for proceedings held on 5/13/2016, Judge Neil V Wake hearing judge(s).
49
06/01/2016
ANSWER to 34 Amended Complaint by Arizona Summit Law School LLC, Infilaw Corporation.
50
06/17/2016
NOTICE re: Joint Notice of Discovery Dispute Re Depositions by Arizona Summit Law School LLC.
1
Exhibits A-C
1 Attachment
51
06/24/2016
ORDER that the Joint Notice of Discovery Dispute Re Depositions (Doc. 50), which the Court treats as a motion for protective order by Defendants, is granted. Defendants shall produce a witness with knowledge to testify how the data reflected on the spreadsheets were collected and what the data mean. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 6/24/16.
52
07/14/2016
NOTICE re: Discovery Dispute re 30(b)(6) Deposition by Paula C Lorona.
1
Exhibit Defendants' Exhibits B-D
1 Attachment
53
06/30/2016
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing proceedings held on 05/13/2016, before Judge Neil V. Wake. (Court Reporter: Laurie A. Adams). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/21/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/1/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/28/2016.
54
07/15/2016
*NOTICE of Errata re 52 Joint Notice of Discovery Dispute Re 30(b)(6) Deposition - Exhibit A by Plaintiff Paula C Lorona.
1
Exhibit Exhibit A) *Modified to include document linkage on 7/18/2016 (KMG
1 Attachment
55
08/01/2016
MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Counts One Through Three of Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint by Arizona Summit Law School LLC, Infilaw Corporation.
56
08/01/2016
STATEMENT OF FACTS re: 55 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Counts One Through Three of Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint by Defendants Arizona Summit Law School LLC, Infilaw Corporation.
1
Exhibit
1 Attachment
57
08/01/2016
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED setting oral argument on the pending Discovery Dispute (Doc. 52 54) for 8/4/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 504, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Senior Judge Neil V.Wake. Ordered by Senior Judge Neil V Wake. (vg)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.)
58
08/04/2016
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Senior Judge Neil V. Wake: Discovery Hearing/Oral Argument held on 8/4/2016. Counsel state their respective positions regarding the Joint Notice of Discovery Dispute (Docs. 52, 54). Treating the pending dispute as a motion, the Court denies Plaintiff's request. APPEARANCES: Sean A. Woods for Plaintiff. Michael S. Catlett for Defendants. (Court Reporter Laurie Adams.) Hearing held 2:04 PM to 2:57 PM This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
59
08/09/2016
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Paula C Lorona for proceedings held on 08/04/2016, Judge Neil V Wake hearing judge(s).
60
08/16/2016
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Discovery Hearing proceedings held on 08/04/2016, before Judge Neil V. Wake. (Court Reporter: Laurie A. Adams). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/6/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/16/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/14/2016.
61
09/06/2016
STIPULATION re: 55 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Counts One Through Three of Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint, 56 Statement of Facts to Extend Time for Plaintiff's Response by Paula C Lorona.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
62
09/07/2016
ORDER granting the parties' Stipulation (Doc. 61). FURTHER ORDERED extending the time for Plaintiff to file her Response to Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment until Tuesday, 09/13/16. Signed by Senior Judge Neil V. Wake on 9/7/16.
63
09/13/2016
RESPONSE to Motion re: 55 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Counts One Through Three of Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint filed by Paula C Lorona.
64
09/13/2016
STATEMENT OF FACTS re: 63 Response to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Paula C Lorona.
1
Exhibit Exhibits 1-13
1 Attachment
65
09/13/2016
STATEMENT OF FACTS re: 63 Response to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, 64 Statement of Facts Controverting Statement of Facts by Plaintiff Paula C Lorona.
66
10/03/2016
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE DEFENDANTS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT (FIRST REQUEST) by Arizona Summit Law School LLC, Infilaw Corporation, Jason Lee, Stephanie Lee, Scott Thompson, Unknown Thompson, Unknown Parties.
1
Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
1 Attachment
67
10/03/2016
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Defendant submit a proposed form of order that is not on law firm stationery, in compliance with Local Rule 7.1(b)(3) re: 66 Stipulation to Extend Time filed by Infilaw Corporation, Stephanie Lee, Unknown Thompson, Arizona Summit Law School LLC, Unknown Parties, Scott Thompson, Jason Lee. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
68
10/03/2016
Additional Attachments to Main Document re: 66 Stipulation TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE DEFENDANTS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT (FIRST REQUEST) by Defendants Arizona Summit Law School LLC, Infilaw Corporation, Jason Lee, Stephanie Lee, Scott Thompson, Unknown Thompson, Unknown Parties.
69
10/04/2016
ORDER granting the parties' Stipulation (Doc. 66). FURTHER ORDERED extending the time for Defendant to file its Reply in in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment until Tuesday, 10/11/16. Signed by Senior Judge Neil V. Wake on 10/3/16.
70
10/11/2016
*RESPONSE re: 64 Statement of Facts DEFENDANT ARIZONA SUMMIT LAW SCHOOL, LLC'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF PAULA C. LORONA'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF HER RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT ARIZONA SUMMIT LAW SCHOOL'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Defendants Arizona Summit Law School LLC, Infilaw Corporation. *Modified to correct event type on 10/12/2016
71
10/11/2016
*REPLY in Response to 55 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment DEFENDANT ARZIONA SUMMIT LAW SCHOOL, LLC'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON COUNTS ONE THROUGH THREE OF PLAINTIFF'S THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT by Defendants Arizona Summit Law School LLC, Infilaw Corporation. *Modified to add document number on 10/12/2016
72
12/27/2016
ORDER that Plaintiff Paula C. Lorona's objection to the admission of the Law Schools Source Spreadsheet is overruled. ORDERED that Defendant Arizona Summit Law School, LLC's 55 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Counts One Through Three of Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a Rule 16 Scheduling Conference will be set by separate order. Signed by Senior Judge Neil V Wake on 12/27/2016. (See Order for details.) (LFIG)
73
12/27/2016
SCHEDULING ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 2/10/2017 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 504, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Senior Judge Neil V Wake (see document for further details). Signed by Senior Judge Neil V Wake on 12/27/16.
74
12/29/2016
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Arizona Summit Law School LLC.
75
01/23/2017
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Arizona Summit Law School LLC, Infilaw Corporation.
76
01/23/2017
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Paula C Lorona.
77
02/02/2017
Due to a conflict in the Court's calendar, IT IS ORDERED the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference, presently set for 02/10/2017 at 10:30 AM is VACATED and RESET to 02/17/2017 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 504, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Senior Judge Neil V. Wake. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED affirming all orders contained within the Court's Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference (Doc. 73) except for the date and time of said conference. Ordered by Senior Judge Neil V Wake. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.)
78
02/02/2017
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Arizona Summit Law School LLC, Infilaw Corporation.
79
02/03/2017
Due to a conflict in Plaintiff's counsel's calendar and upon agreement of all parties, IT IS ORDERED resetting the Scheduling Conference, presently set for 02/17/2017 at 2:30 PM to 2/24/2017 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 504, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Senior Judge Neil V. Wake. Ordered by Senior Judge Neil V Wake. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.)
80
02/24/2017
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Senior Judge Neil V Wake: At the time set for Scheduling Conference on 2/24/2017, discussion is held. The parties are directed to meet and submit a revised Joint Proposed Discovery Plan, as stated on the record, not later than 3/10/2017. Scheduling Conference is reset for 3/20/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 504, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Senior Judge Neil V Wake. APPEARANCES: Sean Woods for Plaintiff. Eric Johnson for Defendants. (Court Reporter Laurie Adams.) Hearing held 1:36 PM to 1:54 PM This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
81
03/02/2017
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Paula C Lorona.
82
03/10/2017
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Arizona Summit Law School LLC, Infilaw Corporation.
83
03/11/2017
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Paula C Lorona.
84
03/13/2017
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED, due to a conflict in the Court's calendar, resetting the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference from 3/20/2017 at 9:30 AM to 3/21/2017 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 504, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Senior Judge Neil V. Wake. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
85
03/15/2017
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Paula C Lorona.
86
03/15/2017
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Paula C Lorona.
87
03/21/2017
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Senior Judge Neil V Wake: Scheduling Conference held on 3/21/2017. Case status and scheduling are discussed. Separate Case Management Order to issue. APPEARANCES: Sean Anthony Woods for Plaintiff. Eric Bowen Johnson for Defendants. (Court Reporter Linda Schroeder.) Hearing held 11:29 AM to 12:01 PM This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
89
05/31/2017
STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice by Arizona Summit Law School LLC, Infilaw Corporation.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
90
06/01/2017
ORDER granting 89 Stipulation of Dismissal. The above-captioned matter is dismissed with prejudice with each party to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Senior Judge Neil V Wake on 06/01/2017.

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.