Lorraine Aldea Tallman
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2011-bk-00104 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
19
11/13/2018
Reopen Chapter 7 Case (Fee) (CM20)
20
11/13/2018
Appoint Trustee (CM05)
21
11/14/2018
Reassigning Judge (SA)
22
11/14/2018
Reopen Chapter 7 Case
23
11/14/2018
Appointing Trustee
11/15/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
11/15/2018
Clerks Notice of Deferred Fees
25
11/16/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
26
11/16/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
27
11/16/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
28
11/17/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
29
12/17/2018
Amended Schedules A/B C G H I J (no fee)
12/26/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
31
12/28/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
02/07/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/07/2019
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/28/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/03/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/04/2019
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.