Louie Wesley Crandall, II
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2019-bk-00014 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
01/18/2019
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
01/18/2019
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
3
01/18/2019
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
01/18/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
01/18/2019
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
01/18/2019
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/18/2019
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/18/2019
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
01/18/2019
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)
6
01/18/2019
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)
7
01/18/2019
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)
8
01/20/2019
Request for Notice by Creditor
9
01/20/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
10
01/20/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
11
01/20/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
12
01/22/2019
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
13
02/05/2019
Financial Management Course Certificate
14
02/08/2019
Reaffirmation Agreement (Pro Se - No Atty Signature) (BKRA02)
15
02/11/2019
Notice of Reaffirmation Hearing (Chambers Template-BNC Notice)
16
02/13/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
17
02/20/2019
Declaration Regarding Debtor's Schedules (Form 106Dec or Form 202 )
02/20/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
02/21/2019
Continue / Reschedule Hearing
19
02/22/2019
Continue / Reschedule Hearing
02/24/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/24/2019
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
20
02/24/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
21
03/13/2019
Regarding Reaffirmation Agreement (CM37-COAfter) (SA)
22
03/13/2019
Proceeding Memo
03/14/2019
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
23
03/15/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
24
03/15/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.