Louis Hayden Green, Jr and Lee Ann Green
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

2:2019-bk-00040 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
02/04/2019
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
2
02/04/2019
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
3
02/04/2019
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
02/04/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/05/2019
Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event) (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/05/2019
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/05/2019
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/05/2019
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/05/2019
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/05/2019
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/05/2019
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
02/05/2019
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice)
7
02/07/2019
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (With Db Atty) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
8
02/07/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
9
02/07/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
10
02/07/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
11
02/07/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
12
02/09/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing
13
02/11/2019
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
14
02/19/2019
Extend Time
15
02/19/2019
Extend Time
02/19/2019
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
02/28/2019
Extend Time
17
03/05/2019
Extend Time
03/05/2019
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/06/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
03/07/2019
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
19
03/07/2019
Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)
20
03/07/2019
Certification of Domestic Support Payments
21
03/07/2019
Notice of Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline
22
03/07/2019
Affidavit of Service
03/08/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/20/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - CH 11, 12 & 13) (Text entry; no document attached.)
23
03/22/2019
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
24
03/28/2019
Proceeding Memo
25
04/01/2019
Objection to Confirmation of Plan (CM45-COAwith)
26
04/01/2019
Amended Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN04)
27
04/01/2019
Affidavit of Service
28
04/02/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
04/08/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
29
04/10/2019
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
30
04/12/2019
Withdrawal of Document / Motion
31
04/12/2019
Confirming Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN01) (SA)
32
04/12/2019
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
33
04/14/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
34
04/14/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.