Louis Hayden Green, Jr
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-00215 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
07/10/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
2
07/10/2018
Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)
3
07/10/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
07/10/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/10/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/10/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/11/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/11/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/11/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
07/11/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice)
7
07/12/2018
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (Pro Se) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
8
07/13/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
9
07/13/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
10
07/13/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
11
07/13/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
12
07/14/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
13
07/14/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
08/08/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
14
08/28/2018
Entry of Appearance
15
08/28/2018
Dismiss Case (No Hrg Rqd for Ch 13, Hrg Rqd for Ch 7,11,12 - FRBP2002(a)(4)) (CM15)
16
08/28/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
09/05/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
17
09/14/2018
Proceeding Memo
18
09/17/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
19
09/19/2018
Certificate of No Objection
20
09/20/2018
Dismiss Case
09/20/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/20/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
21
09/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.