Lowe v. MAC Federal Credit Union et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00130 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
06/05/2018
Complaint
2
06/05/2018
Civil Cover Sheet
06/05/2018
1 - Summons Issued (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
06/05/2018
Unissued Summons
4
07/30/2018
Notice of Appearance
5
07/30/2018
Answer to Complaint
6
08/02/2018
Notice of Settlement
08/12/2018
Status Report Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
09/05/2018
Initial Case Status Report Order
10
09/17/2018
Stipulation of Dismissal

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.