Lydia A. Baker
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00405 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
11/21/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
11/21/2018
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
11/21/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
11/21/2018
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
4
11/21/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
11/21/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/21/2018
Credit Counseling Deficiency to Chambers (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/21/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/21/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
11/21/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)
6
11/21/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)
7
11/21/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)
8
11/23/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
9
11/23/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
10
11/23/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
11
11/25/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
12
11/26/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
13
12/10/2018
Request for Notice by Creditor

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.