Lynn H Lythgoe, Jr.
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2007-bk-00658 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/31/2018
Notice of Transfer / Assignment of Claim - With or Without Waiver (Fee) (BNC Notice)
05/31/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/31/2018
Transfer of Claim Flag Removed After QC (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/31/2018
Transfer of Claim Fee Paid (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
06/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Transfer of Claims
09/05/2018
Postconfirmation Progress Report
10/03/2018
Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)
10/03/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
10/03/2018
Certificate of Service
10/03/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/10/2018
Certificate of Service of Prompt Determination of Tax Liability
10/19/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/24/2018
Certificate of No Objection
10/24/2018
Certificate of Service
10/25/2018
QC Remark Re: Incorrect Image (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/26/2018
Corrective Entry (File Correct Image ONLY - No Changes to Document)
10/29/2018
Setting Hearing (SA)
10/30/2018
Generic Motion / Application
10/31/2018
Relief from Stay
10/31/2018
Continue / Reschedule Hearing (SA)
10/31/2018
Terminate Document / Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/31/2018
Document Served Conventionally (Notes Service Through the Mail) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/31/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
11/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
11/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
11/05/2018
Clerks Notice of Undeliverable Mail
11/05/2018
Document Served Conventionally (Notes Service Through the Mail) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/08/2018
Entry of Appearance
12/11/2018
Postconfirmation Progress Report
12/14/2018
Proceeding Memo
12/14/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/14/2018
Audio File (Active Event)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.