Lyons et al v. Conagra Foods Packaged Foods LLC
Court Docket Sheet

Eastern District of Arkansas

4:2012-cv-00245 (ared)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: 412 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
04/24/2012
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re 1 Complaint: docket text modified to add "Class Action". (Text entry; no document attached.)
2
05/09/2012
FIRST AMENDED and Substituted Complaint - Class Action with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Khanthalyxay La Rasavong, Tommy Applegate, Edward White, Justin Anderson, Craig Lyons, Brandon Etzkorn, Gerald Fisher, Jr, James Geary, William Mars,(adding plaintiffs Pha Nanthalansy, Anong Nanthalansy, Richard Casey and Gary Mars)
3
06/06/2012
NOTICE by Justin Anderson, Tommy Applegate, Richard Casey, Brandon Etzkorn, Gerald Fisher, Jr, James Geary, Craig Lyons, Gary Mars, William Mars, Anong Nanthalansy, Pha Nanthalansy, Khanthalyxay La Rasavong, Edward White Consent to Join -- Michael Hinman
4
06/08/2012
MOTION to Certify Class Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. § 216(b) by Justin Anderson, Tommy Applegate, Richard Casey, Brandon Etzkorn, Gerald Fisher, Jr, James Geary, Craig Lyons, Gary Mars, William Mars, Anong Nanthalansy, Pha Nanthalansy, Khanthalyxay La Rasavong, Edward White
1
Exhibit A- Plaintiffs' Affidavits
2
Exhibit B- Labor Agreement Excerpts
3
Exhibit C- Proposed Notice
4
Exhibit D- Proposed Consent to Join
4 Attachments
5
06/08/2012
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 4 Motion to Certify Class, Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. § 216(b) filed by Justin Anderson, Tommy Applegate, Richard Casey, Brandon Etzkorn, Gerald Fisher, Jr, James Geary, Craig Lyons, Gary Mars, William Mars, Anong Nanthalansy, Pha Nanthalansy, Khanthalyxay La Rasavong, Edward White.
6
06/08/2012
MOTION to Certify Class Pursuant to FRCP 23 by Justin Anderson, Tommy Applegate, Richard Casey, Brandon Etzkorn, Gerald Fisher, Jr, James Geary, Craig Lyons, Gary Mars, William Mars, Anong Nanthalansy, Pha Nanthalansy, Khanthalyxay La Rasavong, Edward White
1
Exhibit A- Sanford Affidavit
2
Exhibit B- Proposed Notice
2 Attachments
7
06/08/2012
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 6 Motion to Certify Class, Pursuant to FRCP 23 filed by Justin Anderson, Tommy Applegate, Richard Casey, Brandon Etzkorn, Gerald Fisher, Jr, James Geary, Craig Lyons, Gary Mars, William Mars, Anong Nanthalansy, Pha Nanthalansy, Khanthalyxay La Rasavong, Edward White.
8
06/12/2012
NOTICE by Justin Anderson, Tommy Applegate, Richard Casey, Brandon Etzkorn, Gerald Fisher, Jr, James Geary, Craig Lyons, Gary Mars, William Mars, Anong Nanthalansy, Pha Nanthalansy, Khanthalyxay La Rasavong, Edward White Consent to Join Collective Action -- Brian Massey and Wanda Thompson
9
06/13/2012
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint and First Amended Complaint and two class motions and briefs (Doc. Nos 1, 2 and 4 through 7, filed by Khanthalyxay La Rasavong, Pha Nanthalansy, Gary Mars, Edward White, Anong Nanthalansy, Craig Lyons, Brandon Etzkorn, Gerald Fisher, Jr, James Geary, William Mars. Conagra Foods Packaged Foods LLC served on 6/12/2012.
10
06/19/2012
NOTICE by Justin Anderson, Tommy Applegate, Richard Casey, Brandon Etzkorn, Gerald Fisher, Jr, James Geary, Craig Lyons, Gary Mars, William Mars, Anong Nanthalansy, Pha Nanthalansy, Khanthalyxay La Rasavong, Edward White Consent to Join -- Bradley Mayfield
11
06/20/2012
NOTICE by Justin Anderson, Tommy Applegate, Richard Casey, Brandon Etzkorn, Gerald Fisher, Jr, James Geary, Craig Lyons, Gary Mars, William Mars, Anong Nanthalansy, Pha Nanthalansy, Khanthalyxay La Rasavong, Edward White Consents to Join -- Mary Wewer and Amy Anderson
12
06/21/2012
NOTICE by Justin Anderson, Tommy Applegate, Richard Casey, Brandon Etzkorn, Gerald Fisher, Jr, James Geary, Craig Lyons, Gary Mars, William Mars, Anong Nanthalansy, Pha Nanthalansy, Khanthalyxay La Rasavong, Edward White Consent to Join -- Larry Dodson
13
06/21/2012
NOTICE by Justin Anderson, Tommy Applegate, Richard Casey, Brandon Etzkorn, Gerald Fisher, Jr, James Geary, Craig Lyons, Gary Mars, William Mars, Anong Nanthalansy, Pha Nanthalansy, Khanthalyxay La Rasavong, Edward White Consent to Join -- Allen Young
14
06/26/2012
NOTICE by Justin Anderson, Tommy Applegate, Richard Casey, Brandon Etzkorn, Gerald Fisher, Jr, James Geary, Craig Lyons, Gary Mars, William Mars, Anong Nanthalansy, Pha Nanthalansy, Khanthalyxay La Rasavong, Edward White Consent to Join -- Lisa Jones
15
06/26/2012
NOTICE by Justin Anderson, Tommy Applegate, Richard Casey, Brandon Etzkorn, Gerald Fisher, Jr, James Geary, Craig Lyons, Gary Mars, William Mars, Anong Nanthalansy, Pha Nanthalansy, Khanthalyxay La Rasavong, Edward White Consent to Join -- Bobby Anderson
16
06/26/2012
MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended and Substitued Complaint by Justin Anderson, Tommy Applegate, Richard Casey, Brandon Etzkorn, Gerald Fisher, Jr, James Geary, Craig Lyons, Gary Mars, William Mars, Anong Nanthalansy, Pha Nanthalansy, Khanthalyxay La Rasavong, Edward White
1
Exhibit A -- Proposed Second Amended and Substituted Complaint
1 Attachment
17
06/26/2012
NOTICE by Justin Anderson, Tommy Applegate, Richard Casey, Brandon Etzkorn, Gerald Fisher, Jr, James Geary, Craig Lyons, Gary Mars, William Mars, Anong Nanthalansy, Pha Nanthalansy, Khanthalyxay La Rasavong, Edward White Consent to Join -- Pam Evans
18
06/27/2012
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting 16 Motion for Leave to File a second amended complaint. Plaintiffs may file their second amended and substituted complaint within five days of the entry of this order. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 6/27/12.
19
06/27/2012
NOTICE by Justin Anderson, Tommy Applegate, Richard Casey, Brandon Etzkorn, Gerald Fisher, Jr, James Geary, Craig Lyons, Gary Mars, William Mars, Anong Nanthalansy, Pha Nanthalansy, Khanthalyxay La Rasavong, Edward White Consent to Join -- Onita Martin
20
06/28/2012
SECOND AMENDED AND SUBSTITUTED COMPLAINT - CLASS ACTION, with Jury Demand against deft Conagra Foods Packaged Foods LLC, filed by pltfs Tommy Applegate, Gary Mars, Edward White, Anong Nanthalansy, Craig Lyons, Gerald Fisher, Jr, James Geary, Khanthalyxay La Rasavong, Pha Nanthalansy, Justin Anderson, Richard Casey, William Mars, Brandon Etzkorn, Larry Dodson, Wanda Thompson, Michael Hinman, Lisa Jones, Bobby Anderson, Alan Young, Mary Wewer, Bradley Mayfield, Amy Anderson and Brian Massey
21
06/28/2012
NOTICE by Amy Anderson, Bobby Anderson, Justin Anderson, Tommy Applegate, Richard Casey, Larry Dodson, Brandon Etzkorn, Gerald Fisher, Jr, James Geary, Michael Hinman, Lisa Jones, Craig Lyons, Gary Mars, William Mars, Brian Massey, Bradley Mayfield, Anong Nanthalansy, Pha Nanthalansy, Khanthalyxay La Rasavong, Wanda Thompson, Mary Wewer, Edward White, Alan Young Consent to Join -- Wilma Garrison
22
06/28/2012
NOTICE by Amy Anderson, Bobby Anderson, Justin Anderson, Tommy Applegate, Richard Casey, Larry Dodson, Brandon Etzkorn, Gerald Fisher, Jr, James Geary, Michael Hinman, Lisa Jones, Craig Lyons, Gary Mars, William Mars, Brian Massey, Bradley Mayfield, Anong Nanthalansy, Pha Nanthalansy, Khanthalyxay La Rasavong, Wanda Thompson, Mary Wewer, Edward White, Alan Young Consent to Join -- Tammy Hudson
23
06/28/2012
NOTICE by Amy Anderson, Bobby Anderson, Justin Anderson, Tommy Applegate, Richard Casey, Larry Dodson, Brandon Etzkorn, Gerald Fisher, Jr, James Geary, Michael Hinman, Lisa Jones, Craig Lyons, Gary Mars, William Mars, Brian Massey, Bradley Mayfield, Anong Nanthalansy, Pha Nanthalansy, Khanthalyxay La Rasavong, Wanda Thompson, Mary Wewer, Edward White, Alan Young Consent to Join -- Shannon Mixon
24
06/29/2012
NOTICE by Amy Anderson, Bobby Anderson, Justin Anderson, Tommy Applegate, Richard Casey, Larry Dodson, Brandon Etzkorn, Gerald Fisher, Jr, James Geary, Michael Hinman, Lisa Jones, Craig Lyons, Gary Mars, William Mars, Brian Massey, Bradley Mayfield, Anong Nanthalansy, Pha Nanthalansy, Khanthalyxay La Rasavong, Wanda Thompson, Mary Wewer, Edward White, Alan Young Consent to Join -- Angela Thompson
25
06/29/2012
NOTICE by Amy Anderson, Bobby Anderson, Justin Anderson, Tommy Applegate, Richard Casey, Larry Dodson, Brandon Etzkorn, Gerald Fisher, Jr, James Geary, Michael Hinman, Lisa Jones, Craig Lyons, Gary Mars, William Mars, Brian Massey, Bradley Mayfield, Anong Nanthalansy, Pha Nanthalansy, Khanthalyxay La Rasavong, Wanda Thompson, Mary Wewer, Edward White, Alan Young Consent to Join -- Freddie Cogburn, Jr.
26
06/29/2012
NOTICE by Amy Anderson, Bobby Anderson, Justin Anderson, Tommy Applegate, Richard Casey, Larry Dodson, Brandon Etzkorn, Gerald Fisher, Jr, James Geary, Michael Hinman, Lisa Jones, Craig Lyons, Gary Mars, William Mars, Brian Massey, Bradley Mayfield, Anong Nanthalansy, Pha Nanthalansy, Khanthalyxay La Rasavong, Wanda Thompson, Mary Wewer, Edward White, Alan Young Consent to Join -- Ezell Cotton
27
06/29/2012
NOTICE by Amy Anderson, Bobby Anderson, Justin Anderson, Tommy Applegate, Richard Casey, Larry Dodson, Brandon Etzkorn, Gerald Fisher, Jr, James Geary, Michael Hinman, Lisa Jones, Craig Lyons, Gary Mars, William Mars, Brian Massey, Bradley Mayfield, Anong Nanthalansy, Pha Nanthalansy, Khanthalyxay La Rasavong, Wanda Thompson, Mary Wewer, Edward White, Alan Young Consent to Join -- John Cowen
28
06/29/2012
NOTICE by Amy Anderson, Bobby Anderson, Justin Anderson, Tommy Applegate, Richard Casey, Larry Dodson, Brandon Etzkorn, Gerald Fisher, Jr, James Geary, Michael Hinman, Lisa Jones, Craig Lyons, Gary Mars, William Mars, Brian Massey, Bradley Mayfield, Anong Nanthalansy, Pha Nanthalansy, Khanthalyxay La Rasavong, Wanda Thompson, Mary Wewer, Edward White, Alan Young Consent to Join -- Helen Landenberger
29
06/29/2012
NOTICE by Amy Anderson, Bobby Anderson, Justin Anderson, Tommy Applegate, Richard Casey, Larry Dodson, Brandon Etzkorn, Gerald Fisher, Jr, James Geary, Michael Hinman, Lisa Jones, Craig Lyons, Gary Mars, William Mars, Brian Massey, Bradley Mayfield, Anong Nanthalansy, Pha Nanthalansy, Khanthalyxay La Rasavong, Wanda Thompson, Mary Wewer, Edward White, Alan Young Consent to Join -- Cathy Parker
30
06/29/2012
NOTICE by Amy Anderson, Bobby Anderson, Justin Anderson, Tommy Applegate, Richard Casey, Larry Dodson, Brandon Etzkorn, Gerald Fisher, Jr, James Geary, Michael Hinman, Lisa Jones, Craig Lyons, Gary Mars, William Mars, Brian Massey, Bradley Mayfield, Anong Nanthalansy, Pha Nanthalansy, Khanthalyxay La Rasavong, Wanda Thompson, Mary Wewer, Edward White, Alan Young Consent to Join -- Nancy Sorenson
31
06/29/2012
NOTICE by Amy Anderson, Bobby Anderson, Justin Anderson, Tommy Applegate, Richard Casey, Larry Dodson, Brandon Etzkorn, Gerald Fisher, Jr, James Geary, Michael Hinman, Lisa Jones, Craig Lyons, Gary Mars, William Mars, Brian Massey, Bradley Mayfield, Anong Nanthalansy, Pha Nanthalansy, Khanthalyxay La Rasavong, Wanda Thompson, Mary Wewer, Edward White, Alan Young Consent to Join -- Dennis Weir
32
07/03/2012
NOTICE by Amy Anderson, Bobby Anderson, Justin Anderson, Tommy Applegate, Richard Casey, Larry Dodson, Brandon Etzkorn, Gerald Fisher, Jr, James Geary, Michael Hinman, Lisa Jones, Craig Lyons, Gary Mars, William Mars, Brian Massey, Bradley Mayfield, Anong Nanthalansy, Pha Nanthalansy, Khanthalyxay La Rasavong, Wanda Thompson, Mary Wewer, Edward White, Alan Young Consent to Join -- Debra Carter
33
07/03/2012
NOTICE by Amy Anderson, Bobby Anderson, Justin Anderson, Tommy Applegate, Richard Casey, Larry Dodson, Brandon Etzkorn, Gerald Fisher, Jr, James Geary, Michael Hinman, Lisa Jones, Craig Lyons, Gary Mars, William Mars, Brian Massey, Bradley Mayfield, Anong Nanthalansy, Pha Nanthalansy, Khanthalyxay La Rasavong, Wanda Thompson, Mary Wewer, Edward White, Alan Young Consent to Join -- Patricia Hamilton
34
07/03/2012
NOTICE by Amy Anderson, Bobby Anderson, Justin Anderson, Tommy Applegate, Richard Casey, Larry Dodson, Brandon Etzkorn, Gerald Fisher, Jr, James Geary, Michael Hinman, Lisa Jones, Craig Lyons, Gary Mars, William Mars, Brian Massey, Bradley Mayfield, Anong Nanthalansy, Pha Nanthalansy, Khanthalyxay La Rasavong, Wanda Thompson, Mary Wewer, Edward White, Alan Young Consent to Join -- Sylvia McVay
35
07/03/2012
NOTICE by Amy Anderson, Bobby Anderson, Justin Anderson, Tommy Applegate, Richard Casey, Larry Dodson, Brandon Etzkorn, Gerald Fisher, Jr, James Geary, Michael Hinman, Lisa Jones, Craig Lyons, Gary Mars, William Mars, Brian Massey, Bradley Mayfield, Anong Nanthalansy, Pha Nanthalansy, Khanthalyxay La Rasavong, Wanda Thompson, Mary Wewer, Edward White, Alan Young Consent to Join -- Margie Sexton
36
07/07/2012
NOTICE by Amy Anderson, Bobby Anderson, Justin Anderson, Tommy Applegate, Richard Casey, Larry Dodson, Brandon Etzkorn, Gerald Fisher, Jr, James Geary, Michael Hinman, Lisa Jones, Craig Lyons, Gary Mars, William Mars, Brian Massey, Bradley Mayfield, Anong Nanthalansy, Pha Nanthalansy, Khanthalyxay La Rasavong, Wanda Thompson, Mary Wewer, Edward White, Alan Young Consent to Join -- Shirley Cato
37
07/07/2012
NOTICE by Amy Anderson, Bobby Anderson, Justin Anderson, Tommy Applegate, Richard Casey, Larry Dodson, Brandon Etzkorn, Gerald Fisher, Jr, James Geary, Michael Hinman, Lisa Jones, Craig Lyons, Gary Mars, William Mars, Brian Massey, Bradley Mayfield, Anong Nanthalansy, Pha Nanthalansy, Khanthalyxay La Rasavong, Wanda Thompson, Mary Wewer, Edward White, Alan Young Consent to Join -- Lynda Collins
38
07/07/2012
NOTICE by Amy Anderson, Bobby Anderson, Justin Anderson, Tommy Applegate, Richard Casey, Larry Dodson, Brandon Etzkorn, Gerald Fisher, Jr, James Geary, Michael Hinman, Lisa Jones, Craig Lyons, Gary Mars, William Mars, Brian Massey, Bradley Mayfield, Anong Nanthalansy, Pha Nanthalansy, Khanthalyxay La Rasavong, Wanda Thompson, Mary Wewer, Edward White, Alan Young Consent to Join -- Angela Patrick (Docket text modified on 7/9/2012 to correct name.)
39
07/07/2012
NOTICE by Amy Anderson, Bobby Anderson, Justin Anderson, Tommy Applegate, Richard Casey, Larry Dodson, Brandon Etzkorn, Gerald Fisher, Jr, James Geary, Michael Hinman, Lisa Jones, Craig Lyons, Gary Mars, William Mars, Brian Massey, Bradley Mayfield, Anong Nanthalansy, Pha Nanthalansy, Khanthalyxay La Rasavong, Wanda Thompson, Mary Wewer, Edward White, Alan Young Consent to Join -- Marilyn Jones
07/09/2012
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: 38 Consent to Join. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to indicate the document was signed by Angela Patrick. (Text entry; no document attached.)
40
07/11/2012
NOTICE by Amy Anderson, Bobby Anderson, Justin Anderson, Tommy Applegate, Richard Casey, Larry Dodson, Brandon Etzkorn, Gerald Fisher, Jr, James Geary, Michael Hinman, Lisa Jones, Craig Lyons, Gary Mars, William Mars, Brian Massey, Bradley Mayfield, Anong Nanthalansy, Pha Nanthalansy, Khanthalyxay La Rasavong, Wanda Thompson, Mary Wewer, Edward White, Alan Young Consent to Join -- Brenda Mathis
41
07/11/2012
NOTICE by Amy Anderson, Bobby Anderson, Justin Anderson, Tommy Applegate, Richard Casey, Larry Dodson, Brandon Etzkorn, Gerald Fisher, Jr, James Geary, Michael Hinman, Lisa Jones, Craig Lyons, Gary Mars, William Mars, Brian Massey, Bradley Mayfield, Anong Nanthalansy, Pha Nanthalansy, Khanthalyxay La Rasavong, Wanda Thompson, Mary Wewer, Edward White, Alan Young Consent to Join -- Kenneth Thompson
42
07/13/2012
NOTICE of Appearance by Carolyn B. Witherspoon on behalf of All Defendants
43
07/13/2012
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 20 Amended Complaint, by Conagra Foods Packaged Foods LLC
44
07/13/2012
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting 43 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant's time to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Second Amended and Substituted Complaint is extended up to and including the deadline for answering Plaintiff's forthcoming Third Amended and Substituted Complaint. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 7/13/12.
45
07/16/2012
NOTICE by Amy Anderson, Bobby Anderson, Justin Anderson, Tommy Applegate, Richard Casey, Larry Dodson, Brandon Etzkorn, Gerald Fisher, Jr, James Geary, Michael Hinman, Lisa Jones, Craig Lyons, Gary Mars, William Mars, Brian Massey, Bradley Mayfield, Anong Nanthalansy, Pha Nanthalansy, Khanthalyxay La Rasavong, Wanda Thompson, Mary Wewer, Edward White, Alan Young Consent to Join -- Mechelle Lovejoy
46
07/18/2012
NOTICE by Amy Anderson, Bobby Anderson, Justin Anderson, Tommy Applegate, Richard Casey, Larry Dodson, Brandon Etzkorn, Gerald Fisher, Jr, James Geary, Michael Hinman, Lisa Jones, Craig Lyons, Gary Mars, William Mars, Brian Massey, Bradley Mayfield, Anong Nanthalansy, Pha Nanthalansy, Khanthalyxay La Rasavong, Wanda Thompson, Mary Wewer, Edward White, Alan Young Consent to Joine -- Connie Carrington
47
07/19/2012
NOTICE by Amy Anderson, Bobby Anderson, Justin Anderson, Tommy Applegate, Richard Casey, Larry Dodson, Brandon Etzkorn, Gerald Fisher, Jr, James Geary, Michael Hinman, Lisa Jones, Craig Lyons, Gary Mars, William Mars, Brian Massey, Bradley Mayfield, Anong Nanthalansy, Pha Nanthalansy, Khanthalyxay La Rasavong, Wanda Thompson, Mary Wewer, Edward White, Alan Young Consents to Join -- Jeremy Jones and Patricia Nelson
48
07/20/2012
NOTICE by Amy Anderson, Bobby Anderson, Justin Anderson, Tommy Applegate, Richard Casey, Larry Dodson, Brandon Etzkorn, Gerald Fisher, Jr, James Geary, Michael Hinman, Lisa Jones, Craig Lyons, Gary Mars, William Mars, Brian Massey, Bradley Mayfield, Anong Nanthalansy, Pha Nanthalansy, Khanthalyxay La Rasavong, Wanda Thompson, Mary Wewer, Edward White, Alan Young Consents to Join -- Paul Rodriguez and Jeffrey Monteleone and Sharon Freeman and Linda Coffman and Leonard Coffman
49
07/20/2012
NOTICE by Amy Anderson, Bobby Anderson, Justin Anderson, Tommy Applegate, Richard Casey, Larry Dodson, Brandon Etzkorn, Gerald Fisher, Jr, James Geary, Michael Hinman, Lisa Jones, Craig Lyons, Gary Mars, William Mars, Brian Massey, Bradley Mayfield, Anong Nanthalansy, Pha Nanthalansy, Khanthalyxay La Rasavong, Wanda Thompson, Mary Wewer, Edward White, Alan Young Consent to Join -- Sharon Curtis
50
07/20/2012
NOTICE by Amy Anderson, Bobby Anderson, Justin Anderson, Tommy Applegate, Richard Casey, Larry Dodson, Brandon Etzkorn, Gerald Fisher, Jr, James Geary, Michael Hinman, Lisa Jones, Craig Lyons, Gary Mars, William Mars, Brian Massey, Bradley Mayfield, Anong Nanthalansy, Pha Nanthalansy, Khanthalyxay La Rasavong, Wanda Thompson, Mary Wewer, Edward White, Alan Young Consent to Join -- Charles Davis
51
07/20/2012
NOTICE by Amy Anderson, Bobby Anderson, Justin Anderson, Tommy Applegate, Richard Casey, Larry Dodson, Brandon Etzkorn, Gerald Fisher, Jr, James Geary, Michael Hinman, Lisa Jones, Craig Lyons, Gary Mars, William Mars, Brian Massey, Bradley Mayfield, Anong Nanthalansy, Pha Nanthalansy, Khanthalyxay La Rasavong, Wanda Thompson, Mary Wewer, Edward White, Alan Young Consent to Join -- Cecil Foster, Jr.
52
07/20/2012
NOTICE by Amy Anderson, Bobby Anderson, Justin Anderson, Tommy Applegate, Richard Casey, Larry Dodson, Brandon Etzkorn, Gerald Fisher, Jr, James Geary, Michael Hinman, Lisa Jones, Craig Lyons, Gary Mars, William Mars, Brian Massey, Bradley Mayfield, Anong Nanthalansy, Pha Nanthalansy, Khanthalyxay La Rasavong, Wanda Thompson, Mary Wewer, Edward White, Alan Young Consent to Join -- Doug Wheatley (Docket text modified on 7/24/2012 to correct the description of the document filed.)
53
07/21/2012
NOTICE by Amy Anderson, Bobby Anderson, Justin Anderson, Tommy Applegate, Richard Casey, Larry Dodson, Brandon Etzkorn, Gerald Fisher, Jr, James Geary, Michael Hinman, Lisa Jones, Craig Lyons, Gary Mars, William Mars, Brian Massey, Bradley Mayfield, Anong Nanthalansy, Pha Nanthalansy, Khanthalyxay La Rasavong, Wanda Thompson, Mary Wewer, Edward White, Alan Young Consent to Join -- Genella Smith
54
07/21/2012
NOTICE by Amy Anderson, Bobby Anderson, Justin Anderson, Tommy Applegate, Richard Casey, Larry Dodson, Brandon Etzkorn, Gerald Fisher, Jr, James Geary, Michael Hinman, Lisa Jones, Craig Lyons, Gary Mars, William Mars, Brian Massey, Bradley Mayfield, Anong Nanthalansy, Pha Nanthalansy, Khanthalyxay La Rasavong, Wanda Thompson, Mary Wewer, Edward White, Alan Young Consent to Join -- Scot Smith
55
07/21/2012
MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended and Substituted Complaint by Amy Anderson, Bobby Anderson, Justin Anderson, Tommy Applegate, Richard Casey, Larry Dodson, Brandon Etzkorn, Gerald Fisher, Jr, James Geary, Michael Hinman, Lisa Jones, Craig Lyons, Gary Mars, William Mars, Brian Massey, Bradley Mayfield, Anong Nanthalansy, Pha Nanthalansy, Khanthalyxay La Rasavong, Wanda Thompson, Mary Wewer, Edward White, Alan Young
1
Exhibit A -- Proposed Thrd Amended and Substituted Complaint
2
Document Exhibit A to Third Amended and Substituted Complaint
2 Attachments
56
07/23/2012
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting 55 Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint. Plaintiffs may file their third amended complaint within five (5) days of the entry of this order. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 7/23/12.
57
07/23/2012
NOTICE by Amy Anderson, Bobby Anderson, Justin Anderson, Tommy Applegate, Richard Casey, Larry Dodson, Brandon Etzkorn, Gerald Fisher, Jr, James Geary, Michael Hinman, Lisa Jones, Craig Lyons, Gary Mars, William Mars, Brian Massey, Bradley Mayfield, Anong Nanthalansy, Pha Nanthalansy, Khanthalyxay La Rasavong, Wanda Thompson, Mary Wewer, Edward White, Alan Young Consent to Join -- Holly Johnson
07/24/2012
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: 52 Notice. CORRECTION: The docket entry was modified to correct the description of the document to Doug Wheatley. (Text entry; no document attached.)
58
07/24/2012
NOTICE by Amy Anderson, Bobby Anderson, Justin Anderson, Tommy Applegate, Richard Casey, Larry Dodson, Brandon Etzkorn, Gerald Fisher, Jr, James Geary, Michael Hinman, Lisa Jones, Craig Lyons, Gary Mars, William Mars, Brian Massey, Bradley Mayfield, Anong Nanthalansy, Pha Nanthalansy, Khanthalyxay La Rasavong, Wanda Thompson, Mary Wewer, Edward White, Alan Young Consents to Join -- Michele Turner, Brian Tarkington, Sandra Kellybrew, Raymond Davis and David Glover
59
07/25/2012
THIRD AMENDED & SUBSTITUTED COMPLAINT - CLASS ACTION with Jury Demand against Conagra Foods Packaged Foods LLC, filed by Plaintiffs. (sld) (Docket text modified on 7/26/2012 to correct the party filers.)
07/26/2012
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: 59 THIRD AMENDED & SUBSTITUTED COMPLAINT. CORRECTION: The docket entry was modified to correct the party filers as all Plaintiffs. (Text entry; no document attached.)
60
07/27/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Amanda Martin and Cathy Radcliff (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/25/2013.)
61
07/27/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join --Phyllis Lanoy and Laura Washington (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/25/2013.)
62
07/30/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consent to Join -- Diana Roesler (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/25/2013.)
63
07/31/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consent to Join -- Paula Wilson (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/25/2013.)
64
08/01/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consent to Join -- Brent Duvall (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/25/2013.)
65
08/01/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Dora Perdido-Russell and Chris Russell (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/25/2013.)
66
08/02/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Alicia Partida and Steve Wilson (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/25/2013.)
67
08/03/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consent to Join -- Katie Hency (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/25/2013.)
68
08/06/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consent to Join -- Monica DeLeon (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/25/2013.)
69
08/06/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Ramiro Alonso and Sirina Arias (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/25/2013.)
70
08/07/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consent to Join -- Julie Turley (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/25/2013.)
71
08/08/2012
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Fourth Amended and Substituted Complaint by All Plaintiff's
1
Exhibit A -- Proposed Fourth Amended and Substituted Complaint) (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.) (jak
1 Attachment
72
08/08/2012
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting 71 Motion for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended and Substituted Complaint. Plaintiffs may file their Fourth Amended Complaint within five (5) days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 8/8/12.
73
08/09/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consent to Join -- Armando Cabello (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/25/2013.)
74
08/09/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consent to Join -- Gail DeBardelaben (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/25/2013.)
75
08/09/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Connie Hollis and Josh Poirier and Edith Pledger (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/25/2013.)
76
08/10/2012
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brittany M. Ems by Conagra Foods Packaged Foods LLC
77
08/10/2012
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac by Josef S. Glynias by Conagra Foods Packaged Foods LLC
78
08/10/2012
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Christi Hilker Vaglio by Conagra Foods Packaged Foods LLC
79
08/10/2012
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting 76 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice. Brittany M. Ems may appear pro hac vice on behalf of the Defendant. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 8/10/12.
80
08/10/2012
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting 77 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice. Josef S. Glynias may appear pro hac vice on behalf of the Defendant. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 8/10/12.
81
08/10/2012
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting 78 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice. Christi Hilker Vaglio may appear pro hac vice on behalf of the Defendant. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 8/10/12.
82
08/10/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Edward Robinson and Jimmy O'Brian and Doy England (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/25/2013.)
83
08/13/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Amended Consent to Join -- Wayne O'Briant (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/25/2013.)
84
08/13/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consent to Join -- Warren Cowen (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/25/2013.)
85
08/13/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consent to Join -- Marianne Johnson (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/25/2013.)
86
08/13/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consent to Join -- Claudia De Paz (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/25/2013.)
87
08/13/2012
FOURTH AMENDED and SUBSTITUTED COMPLAINT - Class Action with Jury Demand against Conagra Foods Packaged Foods LLC, filed by Raymond Davis, Holly Johnson, Monica DeLeon, Steve Wilson, Paula Wilson, Ramiro Alonso, Julie Turley, Amanda Martin, Phyllis Lanoy, Sandra Kellybrew, Alicia Partida, Laura Washington, David Glover, Chris Russell, Dora Perdido-Russell, Brian Tarkington, Diana Roesler, Michele Turner, Cathy Radcliff, Sirina Arias, Brent Duvall, Katie Hency
1
Exhibit A - Consents to Join Collective Action) (jap
1 Attachment
88
08/14/2012
NOTICE of Appearance by Cheslee Sizemore Mahan on behalf of All Plaintiff's (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
89
08/14/2012
NOTICE of Appearance by Vanessa Kinney on behalf of All Plaintiffs
90
08/14/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Sammy Smith and Stephanie Jackson (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/25/2013.)
91
08/14/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Brenda Bell and Jose Luis Ochoa Alvarado and Tammy Rogers (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/25/2013.)
92
08/15/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Elizabeth Taylor and Krystal Strandlund and Teresa Rosbia-Laws and Leona Roberds and Debra Coonce (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/25/2013.)
93
08/16/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Pamela Freitas and Dessie Williams and Lillia Williams and Mary Smith (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/25/2013.)
94
08/16/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Joshua Fryar and Debbie Glass and Charlotte Cummings and Barbara DeVore and Wayman James and Michael Williams and Jennifer Williams and Karen Sanders and Sunny James and Judy Summit (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/25/2013.)
95
08/17/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consent to Join --Cheryl Windsor (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/25/2013.)
96
08/17/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Laura Balch and Joanna Ford (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/25/2013.)
97
08/17/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consent to Join -- Donnal Hudson (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/25/2013.)
98
08/20/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Ruth Demmitt and Eric Criswell, Sr., and Linda Calvin and Eddie Renier and Jarman Moody (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/25/2013.)
99
08/20/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Jimmy Roberds and Manuel Ramirez and Richard Choate and Nancy Hentschel and Victoria Heaton and Davida Summit and Donna Johnson and Mary Price (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/25/2013.)
100
08/21/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Sharon Oliver and Johnny Willcutt and Deborah Mahan and Earnest Brown (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/25/2013.)
101
08/22/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Alex Arias and Nestor Gonzalez and Priscilla Noblett and Carrie Murchison and Ashley Williams and Cindy Phalan (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/25/2013.)
102
08/23/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Maria Morales and Juana Salas and Bonnie McNamara and Rosa Herrera (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/25/2013.)
103
08/23/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Cosent to Join -- Christine Bristol (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/25/2013.)
104
08/24/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Marsha Hackler and Elizabeth Moudy and Irvin Lemarr and Jessie Cooper (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/25/2013.)
105
08/24/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consent to Join -- Elizabeth Garcia (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/25/2013.)
106
08/27/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Rebecca Lacy and Anthony Brown (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/25/2013.)
107
08/27/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Kimberley Stewart and Randy Clark (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/25/2013.)
108
08/27/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Cynthia McDaniel and Oscar Mena and Adrianna Mena and Donna Diggs (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/25/2013.)
109
08/28/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consent to Join -- Rebecca Garrigus (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/25/2013.)
110
08/29/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Hernandez and Orozco and Torrellas and Benge (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/25/2013.)
111
08/30/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consent to Join of Juan Carlos Morales (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/25/2013.)
112
08/30/2012
Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to Answer by Conagra Foods Packaged Foods LLC
113
08/31/2012
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting 112 Motion to Extend Time. Defendant will have up to and including September 4, 2012 in which to file an answer or responsive pleading to Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 8/31/12.
114
08/31/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Jorge Rodriguez and Jose Ochoa (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/25/2013.)
115
08/31/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consent to Join -- Linda Taylor (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/25/2013.)
116
08/31/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Tammy Morton and Belinda Rodriguez and James Youngman (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/25/2013.)
117
09/04/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Richard Fryar and Jean Wagner and Kathy Fryar (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/25/2013.)
118
09/04/2012
ANSWER to 87 Amended Complaint, by Conagra Foods Packaged Foods LLC.
119
09/04/2012
STIPULATION (Joint) to Conditional Certification of the FLSA Class Under 29 USC 216(b) by Conagra Foods Packaged Foods LLC.
120
09/04/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Lila Pease and Clem Tucker III and Ida Tucker (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/25/2013.)
121
09/04/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Ignacio Garcia and Walter Orellana (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/25/2013.)
122
09/05/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Mercedes Campos and Nelson Cruz and Vicente Campos and Clifford Davis and Porfirio Aparicio and Leonard Thompson and Ellis Davis and Lenard Brown (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/25/2013.)
123
09/05/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consent to Join -- Juan Paz (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/25/2013.)
124
09/07/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Marvin Soriano and Betty Soriano and James George (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/25/2013.)
125
09/07/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consent to Join -- Nancy Havenstrite (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/25/2013.)
126
09/07/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consent to Join -- Alexander Blandon (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/25/2013.)
127
09/07/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consent to Join -- Alex Bonilla (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/25/2013.)
128
09/10/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Ratael Arrellano and Veronica Abarca (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/25/2013.)
129
09/10/2012
MOTION to Strike Certain Affirmative Defenses by All Plaintiff's (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
130
09/10/2012
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 129 Motion to Strike, Certain Affirmative Defenses filed by All Plaintiff's. (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
131
09/11/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Carrie Reyes and Gerordo Reyes and Carol Lievsay (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/25/2013.)
132
09/11/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consent to Join -- Eddie Davis (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/25/2013.)
133
09/12/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Jael Rivera and Jose Sanchez (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/25/2013.)
134
09/12/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consent to Join -- Sheila Tenango (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/25/2013.) (jak).
135
09/12/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Angelica Velazquez and Connie Bryant and Sonya Leavell (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/25/2013.)
136
09/13/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consent to Join -- Alfonso Paz (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/25/2013.)
137
09/13/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Samuel Cruz and Maria Avila (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/25/2013.)
138
09/13/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consent to Join -- Cynthia Nelson (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/25/2013.)
139
09/13/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Leticia Gonzalez and Maria Salas and Delfino Gonzalez (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/25/2013.)
140
09/14/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consent to Join -- Charles White (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/25/2013.)
141
09/14/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Vicente Perez and Randall Hillis and Juan Alvarenga (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/25/2013.)
142
09/18/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Paul Strnad and Ernesto Crisostomo (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/25/2013.)
143
09/18/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consent to Join -- Patricia Garcia and Alexander Hernandez and Federico Fuentes (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/25/2013.)
144
09/18/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consent to Join -- Jorge Marcia and Maribel Hernandez and William Holmes (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/25/2013.)
145
09/18/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consent to Join -- Benjamin Aley (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/25/2013.)
146
09/18/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consent to Join -- Darlene Melton and Raul Ochoa and Alberto Cargas and Jorge Chica and Luis Gonzalez and Jose Segovia (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/25/2013.)
147
09/18/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Dennis Lemarr and Natasha Hutcherson and Artemio Juarez and Maria Menjivar and Myma Martida and Victor Delgado and Ana Romero-Urquilla and Angela Applegate and Mercedes Castro and Beatriz Ambrosio (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/25/2013.)
148
09/19/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Susana Mejia and Jose Mejia (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/25/2013.)
149
09/19/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Charlie George and Linda Griffin and Velma Freeman and Joan Johnston and Garland Freeman, Jr., and Donna Long (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/25/2013.)
150
09/19/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consent to Join -- Danny Pendergraft (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/25/2013.)
151
09/20/2012
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 11/9/2012. Rule 26(f) Report due by 11/23/2012. Proposed Jury Trial set sometime during the week of 7/8/2013 in Little Rock before Judge James M. Moody. Signed by D. Jackson at the Direction of the Court on 9/20/2012.
1
Proposed FSO)(dmj
1 Attachment
152
09/20/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consent to Join -- Helen Farmer (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/25/2013.)
153
09/21/2012
Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Conagra Foods Packaged Foods LLC
154
09/21/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consent to Join -- Abdon Lozano (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/25/2013.)
155
09/21/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consent to Join -- Judy McClure (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/25/2013.)
156
09/21/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Ubilberto Caballero and Valerie Yandell and Karen Austin and Antonio Rosales (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/25/2013.)
157
09/24/2012
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 129 MOTION to Strike Certain Affirmative Defenses by Conagra Foods Packaged Foods LLC
158
09/24/2012
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting 157 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 129 MOTION to Strike Certain Affirmative Defenses. Defendant's response is due by 10/4/2012. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 9/24/12.
159
09/24/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consent to Join -- Rodolfo Canales (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/25/2013.)
160
09/25/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Carlos Martinez and Carlos D. Martinez (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/25/2013.)
161
09/25/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Carlos Diaz and Jesus Morales and James Christen and Roxanne Foster and Don Condley and Tommy McClure and Barbara Dugger and Carrie Haley and Sheila Sanchez and Jose Morales and Marta Lara and Jose Gonzalez and Xiomara Sandoval and Mercedes Alvarenga (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/25/2013.)
162
09/26/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consent to Join -- Carla Escobar and Mayra Vazquez and Aurora Garcia and Ronan Torres and Linda Julian (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
163
09/27/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Donald Byers and Marlon Morales and Linda McPherson (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
164
09/27/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Andres Arredondo and Mayra Sierra and Francsico Rosales (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
165
09/28/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Ricardo Ramos and Elder Cabrera and Jenny Corona (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
166
10/01/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Kelley Winkle and Rodolfo Paz (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
167
10/01/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Violet Germany and Mayra Rivera-Enriguez and Laura Johnson and Adriana Martinez and Carolyn Burdine and Cindy Wells (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
168
10/02/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Antonio Mares and Teodoro Portillo and Marlon Rivera (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
169
10/03/2012
MOTION to Approve/Approval Collective Action Notice by All Plaintiff's
1
Exhibit Proposed Notice) (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.) (jak
1 Attachment
170
10/03/2012
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 169 Motion to Approve/Approval, filed by All Plaintiff's. (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
171
10/03/2012
ORDER granting in part pursuant to the stipulation and agreement of the parties 4 Plaintiff's motion to certify class pursuant to 29 U.S.C. § 216 (b); denying without prejudice to refile 6 Plaintiff's motion to certify class under Fed. R. Civ. P. 23. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 10/3/2012.
172
10/03/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consent to Join -- Leonard Durham (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
173
10/04/2012
RESPONSE in Opposition re 129 MOTION to Strike Certain Affirmative Defenses filed by Conagra Foods Packaged Foods LLC.
174
10/04/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Teodora Salas and Ignacio Murillo and Perry Roberson and Jose Aleman and Robin Barrientos (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
175
10/05/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Agustin Martinez and Debra Oliver and Nancy Cruz and Celina Lama (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
176
10/08/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Juan Ochoa and Omar Scott and John Mason and Tim Gist and India Duvall and Edwin Rivas (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
177
10/09/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Nora Barrios and Fabio Valladares and Regina Battershell and Renee Qualls and Oscar Gonzalez and Jodie Edwards (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
178
10/10/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consent to Join -- Paul Bragg (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
179
10/11/2012
ORDER denying 129 Motion to Strike certain affirmative defenses. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 10/11/12.
180
10/11/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consent to Join -- Josefina Ochoa (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
181
10/12/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Zenas Smith, Sr., and Magaly Orellano and Dario Abarca and Walter Morales (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
182
10/15/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- David Rice and Pierre Alexander and Georgina Alexander and Betty Norris and Eloy Gonzalez, Jr. (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
183
10/17/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Donald Hill and Ben Maturino (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
184
10/19/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Barbara Wright and Alicia Martin and Joseph Wright and James Wright and Gregory Rodriguez and William Clair and Hector Torres and Miguel Figueroa and David Portillo and Domingo Moran (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
185
10/22/2012
RESPONSE to Motion re 169 MOTION to Approve/Approval Collective Action Notice filed by Conagra Foods Packaged Foods LLC.
186
10/22/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Tommy Parks and Blanca Rodriguez and Randy Freeman (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
187
10/24/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Tyler Brafford and Stephen Gadberry (Docket text modified on 10/24/2012 to correct names.) (thd). (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
188
10/24/2012
REPLY to Response to Motion re 169 MOTION to Approve/Approval Collective Action Notice filed by All Plaintiff's. (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
10/24/2012
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: 187 Notice. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the signer's name to Stephen Gadberry. (Text entry; no document attached.)
189
10/25/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Robert Bewley and Gearld Austin and Lanny Wooten and Marie Bell (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
190
10/26/2012
ORDER granting 169 Plaintiffs' Motion to Approve the Collective Action Notice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 10/26/2012.
191
10/29/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consent to Join -- Lori Terry (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
192
10/30/2012
MOTION for Leave to File Fifth Amended and Substituted Complaint by All Plaintiff's
1
Exhibit A -- Proposed Fifth Amended and Substituted Complaint) (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.) (jak
1 Attachment
193
10/30/2012
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting 192 Motion for Leave to File. Plaintiffs may file their fifth amended and substituted complaint within five (5) days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 10/30/12.
194
10/30/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consent to Join -- Jose Arcia (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
195
10/31/2012
FIFTH AMENDED and Substituted Complaint - Class Action with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiff's.
1
Exhibit Consent to Join Collective Action
2
Exhibit Consent to Join Collective Action)(jap) (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.) (jak
2 Attachments
196
10/31/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consent to Join -- Jose H. Gonzalez Docket text modified on 11/2/2012 to correct the consent name. (kbc) (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
11/02/2012
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re 196 Notice. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the name from "Jose H. Garcia" to "Jose H. Gonzalez" as indicated on the document. (Text entry; no document attached.)
197
11/02/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Saul Martinez and Rosa Martinez and Francisco Reyna and Mary Tennison and Michael Tennison (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
198
11/05/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consent to Join -- Myrna Calito (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
199
11/06/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consent to Join -- Davis Keeton (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
200
11/08/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Barbara Matthews and Earl Matthews and Richard Love, Sr. (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
201
11/09/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Roberto Alvarado and Bonita Embry (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
202
11/12/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consent to Join -- Jorge Jobel (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
203
11/14/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consent to Join -- Debra Lenhart (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
204
11/16/2012
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by All Plaintiff's. (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
205
11/17/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Debra Freeman and Isreal Amaya (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
206
11/19/2012
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading by Conagra Foods Packaged Foods LLC
207
11/19/2012
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting 206 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Conagra Foods Packaged Foods LLC answer due 12/4/2012. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 11/19/12.
208
11/19/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consent to Join -- Celia Gonzalez (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
209
11/20/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consent to Join -- Fransisco Bautista (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
210
11/21/2012
STIPULATION to Conditional Certification of the FLSA Class (Joint) by Conagra Foods Packaged Foods LLC.
1
Exhibit
1 Attachment
211
11/26/2012
FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set sometime during the week of 2/10/2014 at 9:15 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 4A before Judge James M. Moody. Discovery due by 8/14/2013. Motions due by 9/13/2013. Pretrial Disclosure Sheet due by 1/15/2014. Status Report due by 12/16/2013. Signed by D. Jackson at the Direction of the Court on 11/26/2012.
1
Guidelines for Jury Trials)(dmj) (Docket text modified on 11/26/2012 to correct the signature date.) (thd
1 Attachment
11/26/2012
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: 211 Final Scheduling Order. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the signature date to 11/26/2012, as marked on the document. (Text entry; no document attached.)
212
11/26/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Brenda Ramirez and Elizabeth Reyes and Jorge Alonzo and Brenda Hernandez and Guadalupe Hernandez and Pamela Hill and Abdon Lozano, Jr., and Erica Nieto and Betty Palmer and Martha Montoya and Lorenzo Reyes and Jose Reyes and Maria Reyes and Alfredo Arias and Victor Alvidrez (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
213
11/27/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Allen Siddall and Phyllis Ushery and Mary Moten and Pamela Lute and Sabrina O'Briant and Travis Harvey and John Bewley and Matt Wood and Ruben Villacorta and Gloria Shafer and David O'Neal and Jeff Rappe and Rebecca Irwin and Heath Dollar and Richard Walker (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
214
11/27/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Karen Ford and Debra Lenhart and David Alexander and Melvin Hirtler and Barbara Taurone and Jerrad Littrell and Callie Bartlett and Lemuel Keys and Kenneth Simpson and Rose Acree and Chris Childers and Ineda Meimerstorf and Santiago Martinez and Lou Ann Vasquez and Rosemarry Tullous and (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
215
11/27/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Linda Greer and Johnny Litsey and Cathy Heflin and Osmin Ramirez and Jimmy Pease and Rena Pendergraft and Jerry Williams and Emerita May and Vickey Powell and Linda Cook and Robert Bowden and Teresa Monteleone and Jason Morales and Reba King and Sherry Wood (Docket text modified on 11/28/2012 to correct names.) (thd). (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
216
11/27/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Felisha Cooper and Preston Smith and Jose Morales-Herrera and Raul Tovar and Kathryn Sims (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
11/28/2012
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: 215 Notice of Consent to Join. CORRECTION: The docket text was modifed to correct the spelling for Vickey Powell and to add signer Sherry Wood, as indicated in the documents. (Text entry; no document attached.)
217
11/28/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Johnny Floren and Rachel Burton and Wanda Vaughan and Dyana Hefner and Bernabe Jovel and Sabino Bahena and Christian Enriquez (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
218
11/29/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Angela Moro and Charles Williams and Kenneth Barnes and Miao-Hua Lin and Rafael Ramirez and Victor Padilla-Rivera and Mariano Yanes and Peggy Rodriquez and Nicole Williams and Jaime Tejada and William RIchards and Alan Arrington and Tony Laymon and DeAnn Laymon and Rhonda Woody (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
219
11/29/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Eddie Hill and Teresa Rauda and Yong Gabhart and Jeremy Pierce and Gary Brown and Sandra Mata and Freda Cossey and Anna Hughes and Douglas Beech and Sarah Bohher and Franklin Beltran and Sandra Carrillo and Danny Gallaher and Garry Lopez and Brenda Beech and Chong Bewley and Jose Bonilla and Maria Bonilla (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
220
11/29/2012
MOTION to Approve/Approval Belated Approval of Proposed Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff by All Plaintiff's.
1
Affidavit Exhibit A -- Affidavit of Josh Sanford) (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.) (jak
1 Attachment
221
11/29/2012
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 220 Motion to Approve/Approval, Belated Approval of Proposed Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff filed by All Plaintiff's. (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
222
11/29/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Randy Fowler and Caryl Fowler (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
223
11/30/2012
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting 220 Motion to Approve/Approval. The Mailed Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff is hereby approved. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 11/30/12.
224
11/30/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- William Lee and Rosa Mares and Paul Taylor and Michael Freeman and Uriel Tovar and David Hardin and Francisco Rivera and William Foster and Zach Underwood and Denise Crain and Clay Bryant and Grace Bryant and Sandra Molloy and Kimberly Hopson and Robert Delavan and Maria Gonzalez and Shannon Collins and Carlos Duarte and Folvia Aleman and Maria Ortiz (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
225
11/30/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Mario Doratt and Lourdes Montesinos and Amanda Morse and Kenneth Volz (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
226
12/03/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Judy Robinson and Floyd Freeman and Terri Freeman-Staggs and Patricia Chenowith and Samuel Moore and Mike Carrillo and Larry Wiley and Barbara Arnold and Treva Roberds and Grant Poplin and Katherine Rochelle and Jerry Honaker, Sr., and Mohogany Smith and Rhonda Morris and and Alan Newby and Sandy Souvannakhot (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
227
12/03/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- William Freeman and Leslie Pordes and Eva Romero (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
228
12/04/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Alice Dorsett and Kimberly Lee and Balentin Zelaya and Jacquelyn Willcutt and Joseph South and Samuel Morgan and Tina Tanner and Rosa Hernandez and Linda Brown and Stan Nichols and Krystal Humphrey and Tellas Collier and James Snow and Katherine Duvall and Michael Level (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
229
12/04/2012
ANSWER to 195 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand by Conagra Foods Packaged Foods LLC.
230
12/04/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consent to Join -- Alfredo Arias (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
231
12/05/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Dora Brockman and Lori James and Ricardo Castaneda Rojas and Theresa Grigsby and Joyce Metz and Stephanie Hillis and Curtis Brunston (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
232
12/06/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Carol Huggins and Samantha Tavarez and Kristy Sears and Sherry Morell and Shirley Romine and Katharina Reed and William Clark and Karen Noble and Susan Emery and Gloria Lopez and Bobby Ledford, Jr., and Jimmie Noah and Elenilson Ponce (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
233
12/07/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Patricia Rogers and Juan Alfaro and Lacey Qualls and Jeremy Robinson and Martha Montoya and Carrie Crawford and Tom Birge, Jr., and Samuel Genna and Maria Rendon and Filemon Rendon and Silvestre Montoya (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
234
12/07/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Steven Xayadeth and Eric Neatorous and Ellis Davis, Jr. (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
235
12/10/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Juan Parada and Frank Sears and Edwin Melgar and William Roberds and Sherry Pearce and Carol Barnett and Gennifer Horn and Khamphay Visathep and Phouvieng Vistathep and Clinton Jones and Melvin Maxwell (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
236
12/10/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Salvador Bonilla and Guadalupe Talamantes (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
237
12/11/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Francine Byers and Diane Misener and Juan Crisostomo and Esmerelda Cavazos and Ronnie Peoples and Omar Lagos and Rozana Lagos and Laura Baugh and Gregory Suarez (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
238
12/11/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consent to Join -- Irma Giron (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
239
12/12/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Keith Bell and Anita Watson and Emerson Dominguez-Osorio and Earnest Goins and Holly Abbott-Sanchez and Paul Jackson (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
240
12/13/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Marco Belmonte and Cristy Jones and Danny Burton (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
241
12/14/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Estate of Samuel Avery and Jose Navarro and Martha Alvarez and Rosa de Reyes (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
242
12/14/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Randall Boley and Jeffery Freeman (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
243
12/17/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Marvin Alexander and Jorge Andrade and Timothy Davidson and Jose Ruiz and Mary Hughes (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
244
12/18/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Velma Meadows and Rosalio Rivas and Gerald Vongprachahn and Bertha Abrego (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
245
12/18/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Terry Moore and Barbara Collins (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
246
12/19/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Rafael Segora (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
247
12/19/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Iris Reyes and Miguel Alvarado (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
248
12/20/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Phillip Thompson, Jr., and Lester Baugh (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
249
12/21/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Rosa Dixon and Lloyd Callan and Bernice Howard and Cheryl Chronister (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
250
12/21/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Isidro Godoy (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
251
12/27/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Michael Neumeier and Lynn Phipps and Joyce Cook (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
252
12/28/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Billy Moulder and Janice Needham and Lee Dorsey and Manuel Valladeras and Dustin Kemp and Charles Lane (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
253
12/31/2012
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- William Akens and Morena Villacorta and Mary Coffman and Vicky Williams (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
254
01/02/2013
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Chrissie Bishop and Jerry Swilley and David Cook (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
255
01/02/2013
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consent to Join -- Jessica Triste (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
256
01/03/2013
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Celia Osorio and Cesar Ayala and Rachel Edlin (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
257
01/03/2013
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consent to Join -- Melvin Vinson (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
258
01/04/2013
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Irma Avila and Baldemar Robles and Rene Hernandez (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
259
01/07/2013
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Rachelle Stanley and Robert Templin and Bruce Stanley and Rosa Gutierrez and Dennis Stroud (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
260
01/07/2013
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Kristina Davis and Daniel Apanavicius (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
261
01/08/2013
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Emily Simmons and Reina Marcos and Leslie Loveland and German Sanabria and Marina Sanabria (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
262
01/08/2013
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Glemdy Carrillo and Cristian Valladares (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
263
01/08/2013
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consent to Join -- Jerome Roesler (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
264
01/09/2013
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Raquiel Masters and Linda Tanner and Nathan Balch and Kathy Garrigus (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
265
01/10/2013
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Gilberto Morales and Jose Loaeza and Idalia Romero (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
266
01/11/2013
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Theodore Bruce and Austin Padgett and Rheba Smith and Julianna Ditton and Robert Ditton and Joseph Melton and Ruth Criswell and Zolaida Palacios and Medardo Calerdo and Josefina Arias (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
267
01/11/2013
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Christopher Anderson and Jose Navarette and Sylvia Navarette and Kristy Hagan (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
268
01/14/2013
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Deidre Embry and Tommy Honaker and Regina Stewart and Diane Winton and Mario Lozano and Hermes Henriquez and Daniel Kelley and Michael Rogers and Carolyn Parrish (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
269
01/14/2013
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consent to Join -- Katie Moss (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
270
01/15/2013
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Rickey Shaffer and Cecil Keith and Carla McAlister and Lori Brooks (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
271
01/16/2013
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Ashante Chenault and Vickie Higgins and Juana Alvarado and Tomas Romero and Christina Kugler and Jacquelene Brooks (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
272
01/16/2013
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Carla Hernandez and Raul Hernandez and Amanda Navarrete (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
273
01/17/2013
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Helen Diaz and Rafael Sorto and Rudy Castillo and Felipe Martinez and Cheryl Martinez and Carolina Martinez and Denise Hon (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
274
01/17/2013
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Jerry Holland and Jacinto Diaz (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
275
01/18/2013
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Jerry Brown and Gene Canady and Gary Canady and Joe Stevens and David Conner (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
276
01/18/2013
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consent to Join -- Eric Wilson (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
277
01/21/2013
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- William Shelton and Angela McVey and Justin Criswell (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
278
01/21/2013
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Sharon Phillips and Mercedes Hernandez and Maria Hernandez and Germanus Orndorff and Juan Hernandez and Frankie Jackson and Gloria Snyder and Maria Alvarenga and Lawrence Freeman (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
279
01/22/2013
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Zachary Anderson and Jack Proctor and Michelle Torres and David Paz and Irlanda Espinoza and Hipolita Velasquez and Maria Velazquez and Joshua Vaughn and Guy Hill and Matt Wolfe and David Huaranga and James Standridge and Linda Romine and Johnny Foster and Frank Sosa and Bobby Pearson and Henry Hernandez (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/28/2013.)
280
01/23/2013
NOTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join --Christopher Myers and Dina Ayala and Keith Byrum and Artemio Avalos (Docket Text modified to shorten the party filer text on 1/25/2013.)
01/28/2013
DOCKET NOTE: For clarity in the docket, the Clerk's office has modified the filings made by Plaintiffs to indicate the documents were filed by "All Plaintiffs" instead of listing the Plaintiffs individually by name. (Text entry; no document attached.)
281
01/28/2013
NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Jimmy Earls and Mattie Romines and Edin Gonzalez and Orlando Alcantar and Esparanza Alcantar and Maria Reyes
282
01/29/2013
NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Pedro Rojas and Rosa Izaquirre
283
01/29/2013
NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Consent to Join -- Mark Brashear
284
01/30/2013
NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Consent to Join -- Luis Reyes
285
01/31/2013
NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Billy Ralls and Wanza Cross
286
02/01/2013
NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Consent to Join -- Sergio Zamora
287
02/04/2013
NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Consent to Join -- Carlos Carrillo
288
02/07/2013
NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Consent to Join -- Kimberly Anderson
289
02/13/2013
NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Juan Zavala and Rebeca Godoy
290
02/14/2013
NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Consent to Join -- Dennis Berry
291
02/16/2013
NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join -- Antonio Torres and Heidi Gering
292
02/16/2013
NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Consent to Join -- Richard Tillery
293
02/18/2013
NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Consent to Join -- Lonnie Harris
294
02/18/2013
NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Consent to Join --Shereacia Kinnon
295
02/19/2013
MOTION for Leave to File Sixth Amended and Substituted Complaint by All Plaintiffs
1
Exhibit A -- Proposed Sixth Amended and Substituted Complaint
1 Attachment
296
02/20/2013
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting 295 Motion for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Sixth Amended Complaint. Plaintiffs may file their Sixth Amended Complaint within five (5) days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 2/20/13.
02/21/2013
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: 297 Amended Complaint. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the description of the document filed as "SIXTH AMENDED AND SUBSTITUTED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand." (Text entry; no document attached.)
298
03/07/2013
MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding the Compensability of Donning and Doffing Time for all Plaintiffs by All Plaintiffs
1
Exhibit 1 -- Affidavit of Justin Anderson
2
Exhibit 2 -- Excerpts of Collective Bargaining Agreement
2 Attachments
299
03/07/2013
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 298 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Regarding the Compensability of Donning and Doffing Time for all Plaintiffs filed by All Plaintiffs.
300
03/07/2013
STATEMENT OF FACTS (Local Rule 56.1) re 298 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Regarding the Compensability of Donning and Doffing Time for all Plaintiffs filed by All Plaintiffs.
301
03/08/2013
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 297 Amended Complaint by All Defendants
302
03/08/2013
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting 301 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Conagra Foods Packaged Foods LLC answer due 4/10/2013. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 3/8/13.
303
03/21/2013
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 298 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding the Compensability of Donning and Doffing Time for all Plaintiffs by All Defendants
304
03/25/2013
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting 303 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 298 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding the Compensability of Donning and Doffing Time for all Plaintiffs Response due by 4/1/2013. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 3/25/13.
305
03/29/2013
Joint MOTION to Continue Certain Discovery Deadlines by All Plaintiffs
306
03/29/2013
ORDER granting 305 Joint Motion to Continue. The identification of Plaintiffs' expert(s) and due date for Plaintiffs' expert reports is extended to 7/3/2013. The expert witness deposition deadline for Plaintiffs' expert(s) is extended to 7/17/2013. The identification of Defendant's expert(s) and due date for Defendant's expert reports is extended to 8/1/2013. The expert witness deposition deadline for Defendant's expert(s) is extended to 8/15/2013. The discovery deadline is extended to 9/16/2013. The motion deadline is extended to October 14, 2013 (excluding motions in limine). Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 3/29/2013.
307
03/29/2013
Second MOTION to Certify Class under FRCP 23 by All Plaintiffs
1
Affidavit Exhibit 1: Lyons Affidavit
2
Affidavit Exhibit 2: Sanford Verified Statement
3
Exhibit Exhibit 3: Excerpt from Labor Agreement Handbook
4
Exhibit Exhibit 4: Proposed Class Notice
4 Attachments
308
03/29/2013
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 307 Motion to Certify Class, FRCP 23 filed by All Plaintiffs.
309
03/29/2013
Joint MOTION for Protective Order by All Defendants
1
Exhibit
1 Attachment
310
04/01/2013
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 4/1/2013.
311
04/01/2013
MOTION in RESPONSE re 298 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding the Compensability of Donning and Doffing Time for all Plaintiffs, Moving Under FRCP 56(d) to Dismiss or Stay the First Issue Presented in Plaintiffs' Motion, filed by All Defendants.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B) (Docket entry modified on 4/2/2013 to correct the filing event and the description of the document filed.) (thd
2 Attachments
312
04/01/2013
CROSS-MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment in Opposition re 298 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding the Compensability of Donning and Doffing Time for all Plaintiffs filed by All Defendants. (Docket entry modified on 4/2/2013 to correct the filing event and the description of the document filed.)
313
04/01/2013
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 312 Response in Opposition to Motion, and Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Conagra Foods Packaged Foods LLC.
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
314
04/01/2013
STATEMENT OF FACTS (Local Rule 56.1) re 312 Response in Opposition to Motion, and Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Conagra Foods Packaged Foods LLC.
1
Exhibit 1
2
Exhibit 2
2 Attachments
04/02/2013
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: 311 and 312 RESPONSES. CORRECTION: Each docket entry was modified to correct the filing event and the description of the document filed as follows: 311 MOTION in RESPONSE re 298 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and 312 CROSS-MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. (Text entry; no document attached.)
315
04/03/2013
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 312 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, 311 MOTION to Dismiss by All Plaintiffs
316
04/03/2013
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting 315 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Plaintiffs will have up to and including 4/29/13 in which to file a response in opposition to Defendant's Rule 56(d) motion for partial summary judgment and in support of their own motion for partial summary judgment; and, a response to Defendant's cross motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 4/3/13.
317
04/10/2013
ANSWER to 297 Amended Complaint (Sixth) by Conagra Foods Packaged Foods LLC.
318
04/11/2013
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 307 Second MOTION to Certify Class under FRCP 23 by All Defendants
319
04/11/2013
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting 318 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 307 Second MOTION to Certify Class under FRCP 23. Response due by 4/29/2013. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 4/11/13.
320
04/11/2013
RESPONSE in Opposition re 311 MOTION to Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs.
1
Exhibit 1_Additional affidavits of named plaintiffs
2
Exhibit 2_Email negotiations regarding discovery
3
Exhibit 3_Defendant's Interrogatories to Plaintiffs
3 Attachments
321
04/29/2013
RESPONSE in Opposition re 312 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by All Plaintiffs.
1
Exhibit 1-CBA Excerpt
2
Exhibit 2-Moss V.S.
2 Attachments
322
04/29/2013
STATEMENT OF FACTS (Local Rule 56.1) re 314 Statement of Facts (Local Rule 56.1) opposing Defendant's Statement of Facts filed by All Plaintiffs.
323
04/29/2013
RESPONSE in Opposition re 307 Second MOTION to Certify Class under FRCP 23 filed by Conagra Foods Packaged Foods LLC.
324
05/01/2013
MOTION for Discovery (Regarding Plaintiffs' Expert Study) by All Plaintiffs
1
Exhibit 1 -- Expert Requirements
2
Exhibit 2 -- Email Exchange
3
Exhibit 3 -- Discovery Plan
3 Attachments
325
05/01/2013
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 324 Motion for Discovery (Regarding Plaintiffs' Expert Study) filed by All Plaintiffs.
326
05/09/2013
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 321 Response in Opposition to Motion by Conagra Foods Packaged Foods LLC
327
05/10/2013
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 307 Second MOTION to Certify Class under FRCP 23, 323 Response in Opposition to Motion by All Plaintiffs
328
05/13/2013
RESPONSE to Motion re 327 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 307 Second MOTION to Certify Class under FRCP 23, 323 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Conagra Foods Packaged Foods LLC.
1
Appendix Attachment A
2
Appendix Attachment B
2 Attachments
329
05/13/2013
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting 326 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 312 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Reply due by 5/16/2013. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 5/13/13.
330
05/13/2013
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting 327 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply. The Court will allow Plaintiffs to file a reply in support of their motion for rule 23 class certification by 5/24/13. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 5/13/13.
331
05/14/2013
REPLY to Response to Motion re 311 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Conagra Foods Packaged Foods LLC.
332
05/15/2013
REPLY to Response to Motion re 307 Second MOTION to Certify Class under FRCP 23 filed by All Plaintiffs.
1
Exhibit 1-Affidavits of Eleven Additional Plaintiffs
1 Attachment
333
05/16/2013
REPLY to Response to Motion re 312 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Conagra Foods Packaged Foods LLC.
334
05/16/2013
STATEMENT OF FACTS (Local Rule 56.1) re 322 Statement of Facts (Local Rule 56.1) filed by Conagra Foods Packaged Foods LLC.
335
05/17/2013
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (For Modification of Scheduling Orders) by All Plaintiffs
336
05/17/2013
ORDER granting 335 Joint Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 5/17/2013.
337
05/20/2013
MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition of Defendant's Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by All Plaintiffs
1
Exhibit 1 -- Pleadings Diagram
2
Exhibit 2 -- Proposed Sur-Reply
3
Exhibit 3 -- Exhibit 1 to Proposed Sur-Reply
3 Attachments
338
05/20/2013
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting 337 Motion for Leave to File. The Court will consider Plaintiff's sur-reply in opposition to Defendant's cross motion for partial summary judgment. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 5/20/13.
339
05/20/2013
RESPONSE in Opposition re 312 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Sur-Reply in Opposition of Defendant's Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Per Order ECF No. 338 filed by All Plaintiffs.
1
Exhibit 1 -- Kronos Record of Lloyd Callan
1 Attachment
340
05/20/2013
RESPONSE in Opposition re 324 MOTION for Discovery (Regarding Plaintiffs' Expert Study) filed by All Defendants.
1
Exhibit
2
Exhibit
2 Attachments
341
05/21/2013
REPLY to Response to Motion re 324 MOTION for Discovery (Regarding Plaintiffs' Expert Study) filed by All Plaintiffs.
1
Exhibit 1 - Radwin Declaration
1 Attachment
342
05/21/2013
ORDER granting 324 Motion for Discovery. The expert study will take place beginning with the first shift of June 10, 2013 and ending with the third shift of June 14, 2013. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 5/21/13.
343
05/24/2013
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by All Defendants
1
Affidavit
1 Attachment
344
05/28/2013
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting 343 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice. Andrew J. Weissler may appear pro hac vice on behalf of the Defendant. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 5/28/13.
345
06/12/2013
NOTICE OF CONFERENCE HEARING regarding pending motions set for 7/25/2013 at 10:15 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 4A before Judge James M. Moody
346
07/10/2013
MOTION to Stay Discovery and Motions Deadlines or in the Alternative, Modify Scheduling Order by All Defendants
347
07/10/2013
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting 346 Motion to Stay the discovery and motions deadlines. The deadlines will be reset by separate order. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 7/10/2013.
348
07/22/2013
TRIAL BRIEF for Hearing on July 25, 2013 by Dario Abarca, Bertha Abrego, Rose Acree, William Akens, Esparanza Alcantar, Orlando Alcantar, Fulvia Aleman, David Alexander, Marvin Alexander, Juan Alfaro, Ramiro Alonso, Jorge Alonzo, Juana Alvarado, Miguel Alvarado, Roberto Alvarado, Maria S Alvarenga, Martha Alvarez, Victor Alvidrez, Israel A Amaya, Amy Anderson, Bobby Anderson, Christopher Anderson, Justin Anderson, Kimberly Anderson, Zachary Anderson, Jorge Andrade, Daniel Apanavicius, Tommy Applegate, Jose Arcia, Alfredo Arias, Josefina Arias, Sirina Arias, Barbara Arnold, Alan Arrington, Artemio Avalos, Rebekah Avery, Irma Avila, Samuel Avilacruz, Cesar Ayala, Dina Ayala, Sabino Bahena, Nathan Balch, Kenneth Barnes, Carol Barnett, Callie Bartlett, Laura Baugh, Lester Baugh, Francisco Bautista, Brenda Beech, Douglas Beech, Keith Bell, Marco Belmonte, Franklin Beltran, Dennis Berry, Chong Bewley, John Bewley, Tom Birge, Jr, Chrissie Bishop, Sarah Bohlier, Randall Boley, Alex A Bonilla, Jose Bonilla, Maria Bonilla, Salvador Bonilla, Rosa Bonilla De Reyes, Robert Bowden, Tyler Brafford, Paul Bragg, Mark Brashear, Christine Bristol, Dora Brockman, Jacqueline Brooks, Lori Brooks, Anthony A Brown, Earnest Lee Brown, Gary Brown, Jerry Brown, Lenard Ray Brown, Linda Brown, Theodore Bruce, Jr, Curtis Brunston, Clay Bryant, Connie Denise Bryant, Grace Bryant, Carolyn Burdine, Danny Burton, Rachel Burton, Donald Byers, Francine Byers, Keith Byrum, Ubilberto Caballero, Armando Cabello, Elder R Cabrera, Medardo Calero, Myrna Calito, Lloyd Callan, Linda Calvin, Mercedes E Campos, Vicente Campos, Gary Canady, Gene Canady, Rodolfo Canales, Alberto Cargas, Carlos Carrillo, Glendy Carrillo, Mike Carrillo, Sandra Carrillo, Connie Carrington, Debra Carter, Richard Casey, Rudy Castillo, Mercedes Castro, Shirley Cato, Esmeralda Cavazos, Ashanti Chenault, Patricia Chenowith, Jorge Chica, Chris Childers, Richard Choate, James M Christen, Cheryl Chronister, William Clair, Randy Dewayne Clark, William Clark, Leonard Coffman, Linda Coffman, Mary Coffman, Freddie Cogburn, Jr, Tellas Collier, Barbara Collins, Lynda Collins, Shannon Collins, Don Condley, David Conner, David Cook, Joyce Cook, Linda Cook, Debra Coonce, Felisha Cooper, Jessie Cooper, Jenny L Corona, Freda Cossey, Ezell Cotton, John Cowen, Warren Cowen, Denise Crain, Carrie Crawford, Ernesto Antonio Crisostomo, Juan Crisostomo, Eric Criswell, Sr, Justin Criswell, Ruth Criswell, Wanza Cross, Nancy Cruz, Nelson A Cruz, Charlotte Cummings, Sharon Curtis, Timothy Davidson, Charles Davis, Clifford Harold Davis, Eddie Neil Davis, Ellis Davis, Jr, Ellis Christopher Davis, Sr, Keeton Davis, Kristina Davis, Raymond Davis, Monica DeLeon, Gail Debardelaben, Robert Delavan, Victor Delgado, Ruth Demmitt, Barbara Devore, Carlos Diaz, Helen Diaz, Jacinto Diaz, Donna Diggs, Julianna Ditton, Robert Ditton, Rosa Dixon, Larry Dodson, Heath Dollar, Emerson Dominguez-Osorio, Mario Doratt, Alice Dorsett, Lee Dorsey, Carlos Duarte, Barbara A Dugger, Leonard Durham, Brent Duvall, India Duvall, Katherine Duvall, Jimmy Earls, Rachel Edlin, Jodie Edwards, Bonita Embry, Deirdre Embry, Susan Emery, Doy England, Christian Enriquez, Carla Escobar, Irlanda Espinoza, Brandon Etzkorn, Pam Evans, Helen Farmer, Miguel Figueroa, Gerald Fisher, Jr, Johnny Floren, Joanna Kay Ford, Karen Ford, Cecil Foster, Jr, Johnnie Foster, Roxanne Foster, William Foster, Caryl Fowler, Randy Fowler, Debra Freeman, Floyd Freeman, Garland Freeman, Jr, Jeffery Freeman, Lawrence Freeman, Michael Freeman, Randy Freeman, Sharon Freeman, Velma Freeman, William Freeman, Pamela Freitas, Kathy Fryar, Richard Fryar, Thomas Fryar, Frederico Fuentes, Yong Gabhart, Stephen Gadberry, Danny Gallaher, Aurora Garcia, Elizabeth Garcia, Ignacio T Garcia, Jr, Patricia Morales Garcia, Kathy Garrigus, Wilma Garrison, James Geary, Samuel Genna, Charlie George, James Michael George, Heidi Gering, Violet Germany, Irma Giran, Tim Gist, Debbie Glass, David Glover, Isidro Godoy, Rebeca Godoy, Ernest Goins, Luis Gonzales, Celia Gonzalez, Delfino Gonzalez, Edin Gonzalez, Eloy Gonzalez, Jr, Jose H Gonzalez, Jose Gonzalez, Leticia Gonzalez, Maria Gonzalez, Nestor Gonzalez, Oscar Gonzalez, Linda Greer, Linda Griffin, Theresa Grigsby, Rosa Guiterrez, Marsha Hackler, Kristy Hagan, Carrie Haley, Patricia Hamilton, David Hardin, Lonnie Harris, Travis Harvey, Nancy Ann Havenstrite, Victoria Mae Heaton, Cathy Heflin, Dyana Hefner, Katie Hency, Hermes Henriquez, Nancy Hentschel, Alexander B Hernandez, Brenda Hernandez, Carmen Hernandez, Guadalupe Hernandez, Henry Hernandez, Jose Luis Hernandez, Juan Hernandez, Maria Hernandez, Maribel Hernandez, Mercedes Hernandez, Raul Hernandez, Rene Hernandez, Rosa Hernandez, Rosa M Herrera, Vickie Higgins, Donald Hill, Eddie Hill, Guy Hill, Pamela Hill, Randall Hillis, Stephanie Hillis, Michael Hinman, Melvin Hirtler, Jerry Holland, Connie Hollis, William Holmes, Denise Hon, Jerry Honaker, Sr, Tommy Honaker, Kimberly Hopson, Gennifer Horn, Bernice Howard, David Huaranga, Donna L Hudson, Tammy Hudson, Carol Huggins, Anna Hughes, Mary Hughes, Krystal Humphrey, Natasha Hutcherson, Rebecca Irwin, Rosa Izaguirre, Frankie Jackson, Paul Jackson, Stephanie Jackson, Lori James, Sunny James, Wayman James, Jorge Jobel, Donna G Johnson, Holly Johnson, Laura Johnson, Marianne Johnson, Joan Johnston, Clinton Jones, Cristy Jones, Jeremy Jones, Lisa Jones, Marilyn Jones, Bernabe Jovel, Artemio Juarez, Linda Julian, Cecil Keith, Daniel Kelley, Sandra Kellybrew, Dustin Kemp, Lemuel Keys, Reba King, Shereacia Kinnon, Christina Kugler, Rebecca Lacy, Omar Lagos, Roxana Lagos, Celina Lama, Helen Landenberger, Charles Lane, Phyllis Lanoy, Marta Lara, Deann Laymon, Tony Laymon, Sonya Sue Leavell, Bobby Ledford, Jr, Kimberly Lee, William Lee, Dennis Lemarr, Irvin Lemarr, Debra Lenhart, Michael Level, Carol Jean Lievsay, Miao-Hua Lin, Johnny Litsey, Jerrad Littrell, Jose Loaeza, Donna S Long, Garry Lopez, Gloria Lopez, Richard Love, Sr, Mechelle Lovejoy, Leslie Loveland, Abdon Lozano, Jr, Abdon Lozano, Mario Lozano, Pamela Lute, Craig Lyons, Deborah Mahan, Jorge A Marcia, Reina Marcos, Antonio Paz Mares, Rosa Mares, Gary Mars, William Mars, Alicia Martin, Amanda Martin, Onita Martin, Adriana Martinez, Agustin Martinez, Carlos Martinez, Carlos D Martinez, Carolina Martinez, Felipe Martinez, Rosa Martinez, Santiago Martinez, Saul Martinez, John Mason, Brian Massey, Raquiel Masters, Sandra Mata, Brenda Mathis, Barbara Matthews, Earl Matthews, Ben Maturino, Melvin Maxwell, Emerita May, Bradley Mayfield, Carla McAlister, Judy C McClure, Tommy McClure, Cynthia Dianne McDaniel, Cheryl McGee, Bonnie McNamara, Linda McPherson, Sylvia McVay, Angela McVey, Velma Meadows, Ineda Meimerstorf, Jose Mejia, Susana Mejia, Edwin Melgar, Darlene Melton, Joseph Melton, Adrianna Mena, Oscar Armando Mena, Maria E Menjivar, Joyce Metz, Diane Misener, Shannon C Mixon, Sandra Molloy, Jeffery Monteleone, Teresa Monteleone, Lourdes Montesinos, Martha Montoya, Silvestre Montoya, Jarman Moody, Samuel Moore, Terry Moore, Gilbert Morales, Jason Morales, Jesus Morales, Jose A Morales, Juan Carlos Morales, Maria Del Carmen Morales, Marlon Garcia Morales, Walter Morales, Jose Morales-Herrera, Domingo Moran, Sherry Morell, Samuel Morgan, Angela Moro, Rhonda Morris, Amanda Morse, Tammy Morton, Katie Moss, Mary Moten, Elizabeth Moudy, Bill Moulder, Carrie Murchison, Ignacio Murillo, Christopher Myers, Anong Nanthalansy, Pha Nanthalansy, Amanda Navarrete, Jose Navarrete, Sylvia Navarrete, Jose Navarro, Eric Neaterous, Janice Needham, Cynthia Nelson, Patricia Nelson, Michael Neumeier, Alan Newby, Stan Nichols, Erica Nieto, Jimmy Noah, Karen Noble, Priscilla J Noblett, Betty Norris, Sabrina O'Briant, Wayne O'Briant, David O'Neal, Jose Luis Ochoa, Josefina Ochoa, Juan Ochoa, Raul Ochoa, Debra Oliver, Sharon Lynnette Oliver, Magaly Orellano, Germanus Orndorff, III, Raul Rodriguez Orozco, Walter Danilo Orrellana, Maria Ortiz, Celia Osorio, Austin Padgett, Victor Padilla-Rivera, Zolaida Palacios, Betty Palmer, Juan Parada, Leslie Paredes, Cathy Parker, Tommy Parks, Carolyn Parrish, Alicia Partida, Myrna G Partida, Angela Patrick, Alfonso Paz, Claudiade Paz, David Paz, Juan Paz, Rodolfo Paz, Sherry Pearce, Bobby Pearson, Jimmy Pease, Lila Dean Pease, Danny L Pendergraft, Rena Pendergraft, Ronnie Peoples, Dora Perdido-Russell, Vicente Perez, Cindy Phalan, Sharon Phillips, Lynn Phipps, Jeremy Pierce, Edith Pledger, Josh Poirier, Elenilson Ponce, Grant Popliln, David Portillo, Teodoro Portillo, Vickey Powell, Mary L Price, Jack Proctor, Lacey Qualls, Renee Qualls, Cathy Radcliff, Billy Ralls, Jr, Brenda Ramirez, Manuel Ramirez, Osmin Ramirez, Rafael Ramirez, Ricardo Ramos, Jeff Rappe, Khanthalyxay La Rasavong, Teresa Rauda, Katharina Reed, Filemon Rendon, Maria Rendon, Eddie Renier, Carrie Reyes, Elizabeth Reyes, Gerordo Reyes, Iris Reyes, Jose Reyes, Lorenzo Reyes, Luis Reyes, Maria Reyes, Maria C Reyes, Francisco Reyna, David Rice, William Richards, Edwin Rivas, Rosalio Rivas, Francisco Rivera, Jael Rivera, Marlon Rivera, Mayra Rivera-Enriquez, Jimmy Roberds, Leona Roberds, Treva Roberds, William Roberds, Perry Roberson, Edward Robinson, Jeremy Robinson, Judy Robinson, Baldemar Robles, Katherine Rochell, Belinda Rodriguez, Blanca Rodriguez, Gregorio Rodriguez, Jorge Paz Rodriguez, Paul Rodriguez, Peggy Rodriguez, Diana Roesler, Jerome Roesler, Michael Rogers, Patricia Rogers, Tammy Rogers, Pedro Rojas, Ricardo Rojas, Eva Romero, Idalia Romero, Tomas Romero, Ana Romero-Urquilla, Linda Romine, Shirley Romine, Mattie Romines, Antonio Rosales, Francsico Rosales, Teresa Rosbia-Laws, Jose Ruiz, Chris Russell, Juana Salas, Maria Salas, Teodora Salas, German Sanabria, Marina Sanabria, Holly Sanchez, Jose D Sanchez, Sheila Sanchez, Karen Sanders, Xiomara Sandoval, Omar Jovan F Scott, Frank Sears, Kristy Sears, Jose Segovia, Rafael Segura, Margie Sexton, Gloria Shafer, Rickey Shaffer, William Shelton, Allen Siddall, Mayra Sierra, Emily Simmons, Kenneth Simpson, Kathryn Sims, Genella Smith, Mahogany Smith, Mary Smith, Preston Smith, Rheba Smith, Sammy Smith, Scot Smith, Zenas Smith, Sr, James Snow, Gloria Snyder, Nancy Sorenson, Betty Soriano, Marvin M Soriano, Rafael Sorto, Frank Sosa, Joseph South, Sandy Souvannakhot, Terry Staggs, James Standridge, Bruce Stanley, Rachelle Stanley, Joseph Stevens, Kimberley Ann Stewart, Regina Stewart, Krystal Strandlund, Paul J Strnad, Dennis Stroud, Gregorio Suarez, Davida Elaine Summit, Judy Summit, Jerry Swilley, Guadalupe Talamantes, Linda Tanner, Tina Tanner, Brian Tarkington, Barbara Taurone, Samantha Tavarez, Elizabeth Taylor, Linda Taylor, Paul Taylor, Rebecca Taylor-Garrigus, Jaime Tejada, Robert Templin, Sheila Ann Tenango, Mary Tennison, Michael Tennison, Lori Terry, Angela Thompson, Kenneth Thompson, Leonard Norman Thompson, Phillip Thompson, Jr, Wanda Thompson, Richard Tillery, Luz Dary Torrellas, Antonio Torres, Hector Torres, Michelle Torres, Ronan F Torres, Raul Tovar, Uriel Tovar, Jessica Triste, Clem Tucker, III, Ida L Tucker, Rosemary Tullous, Julie Turley, Michele Turner, Joshua Tyler, Zach Underwood, Phyllis Ushery, Christian Valladares, Fabio Valladares, Manuel Valladares, Lou Ann Vasquez, Joshua Vaughan, Wanda Vaughan, Mayra Vazquez, Hipolita Velasquez, Maria Velasquez, Angelica Velazquez, Morena Villacorta, Ruben Villacorta, Melvin Vinson, Khamphay Visathep, Phouvieng Visathep, Kenneth Volz, Gerald Vongprachanh, Jean Wagner, Richard Walker, Laura Washington, Anita Watson, Ronnie Watts, Dennis Weir, Cindy Wells, Mary Wewer, Doug Wheatley, Charles White, Edward White, Larry Wiley, Jacquelyn Willcutt, Johnny D Willcutt, Ashley Williams, Charles Williams, Dessie Williams, Jennifer Williams, Jerry Williams, Lillia Williams, Michael Williams, Nicole Williams, Vicky Williams, Eric Wilson, Paula Wilson, Steve Wilson, Cheryl T Windsor, Kelley Winkle, Diane Winton, Matthew Wolfe, Matt Wood, Sherry Wood, Rhonda Woody, Lanny Wooten, Barbara Wright, James Wright, Joseph Wright, Steven Xayadeth, Valerie Yandell, Mariano Yanes, Alan Young, James M Youngman, Sergio Zamora, Juan Zavala, Balentin Zelaya
1
Exhibit 1 -- Deposition Excerpt, Denise Oxley
2
Exhibit 2 -- Senate Bill
3
Exhibit 3 -- Act 545
3 Attachments
349
07/25/2013
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge James M. Moody on 7/25/2013. Participating: Brittany Ems, Joe Glynias, Josh Sanford, Joshua West & Lydia Hamlet. Court Reporter - Karen Baker
350
08/01/2013
NOTICE of Hearing on Pending Motions set for 10/3/2013 at 9:15 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 4A before Judge James M. Moody
351
08/05/2013
MOTION to Strike 348 Trial Brief, and to Exclude Deposition Testimony by Conagra Foods Packaged Foods LLC
352
08/05/2013
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 351 Motion to Strike and to Exclude Deposition Testimony filed by Conagra Foods Packaged Foods LLC.
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
353
08/12/2013
NOTICE by All Defendants of Expert Report
354
08/20/2013
RESPONSE in Opposition re 351 MOTION to Strike 348 Trial Brief, and to Exclude Deposition Testimony filed by All Plaintiffs.
355
08/21/2013
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER denying 351 Motion to Strike. The Court will allow Defendant to respond to any new arguments raised in Plaintiffs' Pre-Trial Brief on or before September 6, 2013. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 8/21/13.
356
09/06/2013
RESPONSE re 348 Trial Brief, by Conagra Foods Packaged Foods LLC
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
2 Attachments
357
09/30/2013
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by All Defendants
358
09/30/2013
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting 357 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christi H. Vaglio terminated. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 9/30/13.
359
10/03/2013
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) HEARING ON PENDING MOTIONS held before Judge James M. Moody on 10/3/2013. Following arguments by Counsel, decision taken under advisement. Participating: Andrew Weissler, Josef Glynias, Josh Sanford, Josh West & Amber Shubert. Court Reporter - Karen Baker
360
10/31/2013
ORDER denying Plaintiff's 298 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying as moot Defendant's 311 Motion pursuant to Rule 56(d); and granting in part and denying in part Defendant's 312 Cross Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 10/31/2013.
361
11/08/2013
MOTION for Leave to Appeal by All Plaintiffs
362
11/08/2013
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 361 Motion for Leave to Appeal filed by All Plaintiffs.
363
11/25/2013
RESPONSE in Opposition re 361 MOTION for Leave to Appeal filed by Conagra Foods Packaged Foods LLC.
1
Appendix A
1 Attachment
364
11/25/2013
ORDER denying as moot 307 Plaintiff's second motion for class certification; and granting 361 Plaintiff's motion for leave to file an interlocutory appeal. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 11/25/2013.
365
11/25/2013
AMENDED ORDER allowing for an interlocutory appeal re 364 Order. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 11/25/2013.
366
12/05/2013
Letter from Clerk, USCA: A Petition to File Appeal has been filed in the case of Craig Lyons et al v. ConAgra Foods Packaged Foods, under the miscellaneous case number 13-8041.
367
12/26/2013
Letter from Clerk, USCA: The Petition to File Appeal has been denied. Judgment and Mandate attached hereto.
368
01/03/2014
MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Conagra Foods Packaged Foods LLC
369
01/03/2014
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 368 Motion to Consolidate Cases filed by Conagra Foods Packaged Foods LLC.
1
Attachment A
1 Attachment
370
01/09/2014
RESPONSE to Motion re 368 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by All Plaintiffs.
1
Exhibit 1 -- Email of Dec 31, 2013
1 Attachment
371
01/30/2014
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) Based on the Order staying discovery and motion deadlines 347, the jury trial scheduled 2/10/2014 is canceled and will be reset by separate order. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 1/30/2014.
372
01/30/2014
ORDER granting Defendant's 368 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Consolidating Case 4:13-cv-96 with LEAD CASE 4:12-cv-245; all future documents are to be filed in the LEAD CASE. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 1/30/2014.
373
02/13/2014
TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing Proceedings held on October 3, 2013, before Judge James M. Moody. Court Reporter Karen Baker. Transcript may be viewed only at the public terminals in the Clerk's office. Copies of transcript are only available through the Official Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. DEADLINES: Notice of Intent to Request Redaction due 2/24/2014. Redaction Request due 3/6/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/17/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/14/2014.
374
02/17/2014
NOTICE by All Defendants Joint Status Report
375
02/24/2014
SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set sometime during the week of 3/2/2015 at 9:15 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 4A before Judge James M. Moody. Discovery due by 7/1/2014. Motions due by 8/29/2014. Pretrial Disclosure Sheet due by 1/30/2015. Status Report due by 1/2/2015. Signed by D. Jackson at the Direction of the Court on 2/24/2014.
376
03/10/2014
ORDER TRANSFERRING CASES. Case reassigned to Judge James M. Moody Jr. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 3/10/2014.
377
05/01/2014
Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 375 Scheduling Order, by Conagra Foods Packaged Foods LLC
378
05/07/2014
ORDER granting 377 parties' joint motion to amend the current scheduling order. The deadlines in the current scheduling order are stayed, and the discovery schedule set in this order addresses the 29 U.S.C. § 203(o) issues remaining in the case. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 5/7/2014.
379
07/02/2014
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by All Plaintiffs
380
07/02/2014
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting 379 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The parties' deadline for discovery relevant to Section 203(o) is extended to 08/18/2014, and all dates dependent on that date are extended accordingly. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 07/02/2014.
381
09/17/2014
MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Conagra Foods Packaged Foods LLC
382
09/17/2014
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 381 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Conagra Foods Packaged Foods LLC.
383
09/17/2014
STATEMENT OF FACTS (Local Rule 56.1) re 381 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Joint) filed by Conagra Foods Packaged Foods LLC.
384
09/17/2014
STATEMENT OF FACTS (Local Rule 56.1) re 383 Statement of Facts (Local Rule 56.1) Plaintiffs' Objection filed by All Plaintiffs.
385
09/18/2014
ADDENDUM filed by Conagra Foods Packaged Foods LLC to 383 Statement of Facts (Local Rule 56.1). Exhibit 1 to the Joint Statement of Facts
386
10/08/2014
RESPONSE in Opposition re 381 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by All Plaintiffs.
387
10/08/2014
STATEMENT OF FACTS (Local Rule 56.1) re 386 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by All Plaintiffs.
1
Exhibit Index
2
Exhibit 1 Deposition of Vansickle
3
Exhibit 2 Deposition of Fryar
4
Exhibit 3 Union Proposals
5
Exhibit 4 Notes by Ken Knowles
6
Exhibit 5 Notes by Karen Smith
7
Exhibit 6 Notes by Kathy Fryar
8
Exhibit 7 Notes by Chirs Vansickle
9
Exhibit 8 Notes by Jerry Swilley
10
Exhibit 9 Notes by Paul Rodriguez
11
Exhibit 10 Deposition of Nichols
12
Exhibit 11 Deposition of Lester
13
Exhibit 12 Deposition of Swilley
14
Exhibit 13 Deposition of Rodriguez
15
Exhibit 14 Deposition of Gates
15 Attachments
388
10/23/2014
REPLY to Response to Motion re 381 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Conagra Foods Packaged Foods LLC.
389
10/23/2014
STATEMENT OF FACTS (Local Rule 56.1) re 388 Reply to Response to Motion filed by Conagra Foods Packaged Foods LLC.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
4
Exhibit D
5
Exhibit E
6
Exhibit F
7
Exhibit G
8
Exhibit H
9
Exhibit I
10
Exhibit J
11
Exhibit K
12
Exhibit L
12 Attachments
390
11/07/2014
RESPONSE in Opposition re 381 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Sur-Reply filed by All Plaintiffs.
1
Exhibit 1 Dep of Crystal Hill
2
Exhibit 2 Dep of Kathy Lester
3
Exhibit 3 Dep of Karen Smith
3 Attachments
391
11/12/2014
NOTICE OF HEARING on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 381 set for 2/5/2015 at 9:15 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 4A before Judge James M. Moody Jr.
392
11/13/2014
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Craig Lyons
393
11/14/2014
ORDER: Pursuant to Plaintiff's 392 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, Separate Plaintiff Craig Lyons' Fair Labor Standards Act retaliation claim is hereby dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear their own costs and attorneys fees. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 11/14/2014.
394
01/29/2015
MOTION for Reconsideration re 360 Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Order on Motion to Dismiss, by All Plaintiffs
1
Exhibit 1 Sebastian Co Cir Ct Order
1 Attachment
395
01/29/2015
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 394 Motion for Reconsideration filed by All Plaintiffs.
396
01/30/2015
RESPONSE in Opposition re 394 MOTION for Reconsideration re 360 Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Order on Motion to Dismiss, filed by Conagra Foods Packaged Foods LLC.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
2 Attachments
397
02/01/2015
REPLY to Response to Motion re 394 MOTION for Reconsideration re 360 Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Order on Motion to Dismiss, filed by All Plaintiffs.
398
02/03/2015
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Pursuant to the Courts Order 378 dated May 7, 2014, which granted the Motion to Amend/Correct the Scheduling Order, the Jury Trial set for 3/2/2015 is removed from the docket. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 2/3/2015.
399
02/03/2015
ORDER denying Plaintiffs' 394 Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Order denying Plaintiffs' motion for partial summary judgment. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 2/3/2015.
400
02/04/2015
ORDER allowing Joe Glynias and Brittany Falkowski, of the law firm of Husch Blackwell LLP to bring a cell phone, laptop computer, or personal digital assistant into the courthouse in Little Rock, Arkansas on 2/5/2015. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 2/4/2015.
401
02/05/2015
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) CLERK'S MINUTES for proceedings held before Judge James M. Moody Jr.: MOTION HEARING held on Thursday, 2/5/2015 re 381 Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment. Following argument by counsel, parties advised that the Courts ruling and a written order are forthcoming. Josh Sanford, Steve Rauls present for Plaintiffs; Joe Glynias, Brittany Falkowski present for Defendant. (Court Reporter Karen Baker.)
402
09/30/2015
ORDER granting Defendant's 381 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Plaintiffs' donning and doffing claims as well as their claims for walking time are dismissed. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 9/30/2015.
403
05/27/2016
MOTION for Order Defendants Notice Of Intervening Authority and Motion For A Status Conference by All Defendants
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
404
05/30/2016
Second MOTION for Reconsideration re 360 Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Order on Motion to Dismiss, by All Plaintiffs
1
Exhibit 1 Gerber v. Hewitt Opinion
1 Attachment
405
05/30/2016
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 404 Motion for Reconsideration filed by All Plaintiffs.
406
06/01/2016
RESPONSE to Motion re 403 MOTION for Order Defendants Notice Of Intervening Authority and Motion For A Status Conference filed by All Plaintiffs.
407
06/09/2016
MOTION for Ruling on Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification (Doc. 307) by All Plaintiffs
408
06/09/2016
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 407 Motion for Ruling filed by All Plaintiffs.
409
06/15/2016
RESPONSE in Opposition re 404 Second MOTION for Reconsideration re 360 Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Order on Motion to Dismiss, filed by Conagra Foods Packaged Foods LLC.
410
07/14/2016
ORDER denying 403 motion for status conference; granting in part and denying in part 404 motion for reconsideration; denying 407 motion for ruling; and referring this case to mediation. If necessary, the Court will enter a modified final scheduling order and Plaintiffs will be allowed to file an amended motion for class certification following mediation. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 07/14/2016.
411
07/18/2016
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney for Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 7/18/2016.
412
07/26/2016
NOTICE of Hearing: Settlement Conference set for 8/24/2016 at 10:00 AM in Little Rock, Arkansas, in Courtroom #4B, before Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney.
413
08/22/2016
Docket Note re: 412 Notice of Hearing: The Settlement Conference has been cancelled and will be reset at a later date. Counsel are to contact the Court when they are ready to proceed with the Settlement Conference.
414
08/26/2016
NOTICE of Hearing: SCHEDULING TELEPHONE CONFERENCE set for 9/8/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge James M. Moody Jr.
415
09/08/2016
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.)CLERK'S MINUTES for proceedings held before Judge James M. Moody Jr.:SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 9/8/2016. Parties agree to file a joint motion for new scheduling order with proposed dates. Counsel for Plaintiffs - Josh Sanford; Counsel for Defendants - Josef Glynias (Court Reporter Karen Baker.)
416
09/12/2016
Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct The Scheduling Order by All Defendants
417
09/29/2016
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting 416 Motion to Amend/Correct the Scheduling Order. Amended Final Scheduling Order to follow. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 9/29/2016.
418
09/29/2016
FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set sometime during the week of 9/25/2017 at 9:15 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 4A before Judge James M. Moody Jr. Discovery due by 1/3/2017; Motions due by 3/1/2017; Pretrial Disclosure Sheet due by 8/28/2017; Status Report due by 4/5/2017. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 9/29/2016.
419
12/02/2016
NOTICE of Hearing: Settlement Conference set for 1/10/2017 at 10:00 AM in Little Rock, Arkansas, in Courtroom #4B before Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney.
420
12/22/2016
Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct the Scheduling Order by All Defendants
421
12/29/2016
ORDER granting in part and denying in part the parties' 420 joint motion to amend the final scheduling order. Discovery deadline to be completed no later than 3/7/2017; mediation deadline on or before 3/27/2017; class certification no later than 4/6/2017; all motions, with the exception of motions in limine, shall be filed on or before 5/1/2017; and status report due by 6/5/2017. The trial date and pre-trial related deadlines will remain the same. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 12/29/2016.
422
01/07/2017
NOTICE by All Defendants JOINT NOTICE REGARDING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
423
01/09/2017
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER CANCELING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. A date will be reset in March per Judge Moody's 421 Order that the Settlement Conference be held no later than March 27, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 01/09/2017.
424
02/03/2017
NOTICE of Hearing: Settlement Conference set for 3/23/2017 at 10:00 AM in Little Rock, Arkansas, in Courtroom # 4B before Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney.
425
02/15/2017
MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Scott D. Meyers. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3000226. Filed by All Defendants
426
02/21/2017
ORDER granting Conagra Foods Packaged Foods, LLC's 425 motion to admit counsel pro hac vice. Scott D. Meyers is hereby admitted to appear before this Court as co-counsel of record in this action. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 2/21/2017.
427
02/21/2017
MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Kaytlin E. Kopen. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3002924. Filed by All Defendants
428
02/22/2017
ORDER granting Defendant Conagra Foods Packaged Foods, LLC's 427 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Kaytlin E. Kopen is hereby admitted to appear before this Court as co-counsel of record in this action. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 2/22/2017.
429
03/07/2017
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery : Deposition of Expert Witness by All Plaintiffs
430
03/15/2017
NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re 429 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery : Deposition of Expert Witness Withdrawal of Motion
431
03/16/2017
ORDER cancelling the Settlement Conference currently scheduled for 03/23/2017 at 10:00 AM and directing the parties to consult their calendars and agree to a date for the Settlement Conference to be rescheduled sometime in the last two (2) weeks of May. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 03/16/2017.
432
03/27/2017
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting 429 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The discovery deadline is extended through March 16, 2017, for the limited purpose of allowing Plaintiffs counsel to depose Defendants expert witness. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 3/27/2017.
1
Exhibit 1 Declaration of Sanford
2
Exhibit 2 Proposed Notice
3
Exhibit 3 Excerpt from Expert Report
4
Exhibit 4 Excerpt from ConAgra Employment Guide
5
Exhibit 5 Excerpt from Dep. of King
6
Exhibit 6 Excerpt from Dep. of Sexton
7
Exhibit 7 Excerpt from Dep. of Lee
8
Exhibit 8 Excerpt from Dep. of Moore
8 Attachments
434
04/06/2017
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 433 Motion to Certify Class, filed by All Plaintiffs.
435
04/20/2017
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 434 Brief in Support, 433 Third MOTION to Certify Class Under Rule 23 of the FRCP by All Defendants
436
04/21/2017
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting 435 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re 433 Third MOTION to Certify Class Under Rule 23 of the FRCP Response due by 4/27/2017. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 4/21/17.
437
04/27/2017
MEMORANDUM Joint Memorandum Regarding Rule 23 Class Certification re 433 Third Motion to Certify Class.
1
Exhibit A)(Docket text modified on 4/28/2017 to establish linkage). (jak
1 Attachment
04/28/2017
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re 437 Memorandum. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to establish linkage to docket entry 433 Third Motion to Certify Class. (Text entry; no document attached.)
439
04/28/2017
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 438 Motion for Summary Judgment on All Claims in Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by All Defendants.
440
04/28/2017
STATEMENT OF FACTS (Local Rule 56.1) re 438 Motion for Summary Judgment on all Claims in Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by All Defendants.
1
Exhibit 1
2
Exhibit 2
3
Exhibit 3
4
Exhibit 4
5
Exhibit 5
6
Exhibit 6
7
Exhibit 7
8
Exhibit 8
9
Exhibit 9
10
Exhibit 10
11
Exhibit 11
12
Exhibit 12
13
Exhibit 13
14
Exhibit 14
15
Exhibit 15
16
Exhibit 16
17
Exhibit 17
18
Exhibit 18
19
Exhibit 19
20
Exhibit 20
21
Exhibit 21
22
Exhibit 22
23
Exhibit 23
24
Exhibit 24
25
Exhibit 25
26
Exhibit 26
27
Exhibit 27
28
Exhibit 28
29
Exhibit 29
29 Attachments
441
05/01/2017
MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding the Compensability of Donning and Doffing Activities by All Plaintiffs
1
Exhibit 1 ConAgra Employment Guide
2
Exhibit 2 ConAgra Hygiene Policy
3
Exhibit 3 Excerpts of Parrish Deposition
4
Exhibit 4 Excerpts of Moore Deposition
5
Exhibit 5 Excerpts of King Deposition
6
Exhibit 6 Excerpts of Phalan Deposition
7
Exhibit 7 Excerpts of Gates Deposition
8
Exhibit 8 Excerpts of Sexton Deposition
9
Exhibit 9 Excerpts of Wood Deposition
10
Exhibit 10 Excerpts of Condley Deposition
11
Exhibit 11 Excerpts of Plaintiffs' Expert Report
12
Exhibit 12 Excerpts of Defendant's Expert Report
12 Attachments
442
05/01/2017
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 441 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, filed by All Plaintiffs.
443
05/01/2017
STATEMENT OF FACTS (Local Rule 56.1) re 441 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, filed by All Plaintiffs.
444
05/01/2017
SEALED DOCUMENT.
445
05/01/2017
MOTION for Order Permitting Jury View of Defendant's Facility by All Plaintiffs
1
Exhibit 1 Excerpts from Gist Deposition
1 Attachment
446
05/01/2017
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 445 Motion for Order filed by All Plaintiffs.
447
05/08/2017
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE of Hearing: STATUS TELEPHONE CONFERENCE set for 5/9/2017 at 1:30 PM in Little Rock Courtroom # 4A before Judge James M. Moody Jr.
448
05/09/2017
RESPONSE in Opposition re 438 MOTION for Summary Judgment on all Claims in Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by All Plaintiffs.
1
Exhibit 1 ConAgra New Hire Orientation
2
Exhibit 2 ConAgra Box Knife Training
3
Exhibit 3 Excerpt from Deposition of Honaker
4
Exhibit 4 Sample Knife Log
5
Exhibit 5 House Bill 1846 Before Amendment
6
Exhibit 6 Amendment 1 to HB1846
6 Attachments
449
05/09/2017
RESPONSE re 440 Statement of Facts (Local Rule 56.1), by Dario Abarca, Bertha Abrego, Rose Acree, William Akens, Esparanza Alcantar, Orlando Alcantar, Fulvia Aleman, David Alexander, Marvin Alexander, Juan Alfaro, Ramiro Alonso, Jorge Alonzo, Juana Alvarado, Miguel Alvarado, Roberto Alvarado, Maria S Alvarenga, Martha Alvarez, Victor Alvidrez, Israel A Amaya, Amy Anderson, Bobby Anderson, Christopher Anderson, Justin Anderson, Kimberly Anderson, Zachary Anderson, Jorge Andrade, Daniel Apanavicius, Tommy Applegate, Jose Arcia, Alfredo Arias, Josefina Arias, Sirina Arias, Barbara Arnold, Alan Arrington, Artemio Avalos, Rebekah Avery, Irma Avila, Samuel Avilacruz, Cesar Ayala, Dina Ayala, Sabino Bahena, Nathan Balch, Kenneth Barnes, Carol Barnett, Callie Bartlett, Laura Baugh, Lester Baugh, Francisco Bautista, Brenda Beech, Douglas Beech, Keith Bell, Marco Belmonte, Franklin Beltran, Dennis Berry, Chong Bewley, John Bewley, Tom Birge, Jr, Chrissie Bishop, Sarah Bohlier, Randall Boley, Alex A Bonilla, Jose Bonilla, Maria Bonilla, Salvador Bonilla, Rosa Bonilla De Reyes, Robert Bowden, Tyler Brafford, Paul Bragg, Mark Brashear, Christine Bristol, Dora Brockman, Jacqueline Brooks, Lori Brooks, Anthony A Brown, Earnest Lee Brown, Gary Brown, Jerry Brown, Lenard Ray Brown, Linda Brown, Theodore Bruce, Jr, Curtis Brunston, Clay Bryant, Connie Denise Bryant, Grace Bryant, Carolyn Burdine, Danny Burton, Rachel Burton, Donald Byers, Francine Byers, Keith Byrum, Ubilberto Caballero, Armando Cabello, Elder R Cabrera, Medardo Calero, Myrna Calito, Lloyd Callan, Linda Calvin, Mercedes E Campos, Vicente Campos, Gary Canady, Gene Canady, Rodolfo Canales, Alberto Cargas, Carlos Carrillo, Glendy Carrillo, Mike Carrillo, Sandra Carrillo, Connie Carrington, Debra Carter, Richard Casey, Rudy Castillo, Mercedes Castro, Shirley Cato, Esmeralda Cavazos, Ashanti Chenault, Patricia Chenowith, Jorge Chica, Chris Childers, Richard Choate, James M Christen, Cheryl Chronister, William Clair, Randy Dewayne Clark, William Clark, Leonard Coffman, Linda Coffman, Mary Coffman, Freddie Cogburn, Jr, Tellas Collier, Barbara Collins, Lynda Collins, Shannon Collins, Don Condley, David Conner, David Cook, Joyce Cook, Linda Cook, Debra Coonce, Felisha Cooper, Jessie Cooper, Jenny L Corona, Freda Cossey, Ezell Cotton, John Cowen, Warren Cowen, Denise Crain, Carrie Crawford, Ernesto Antonio Crisostomo, Juan Crisostomo, Eric Criswell, Sr, Justin Criswell, Ruth Criswell, Wanza Cross, Nancy Cruz, Nelson A Cruz, Charlotte Cummings, Sharon Curtis, Timothy Davidson, Charles Davis, Clifford Harold Davis, Eddie Neil Davis, Ellis Davis, Jr, Ellis Christopher Davis, Sr, Keeton Davis, Kristina Davis, Raymond Davis, Monica DeLeon, Gail Debardelaben, Robert Delavan, Victor Delgado, Ruth Demmitt, Barbara Devore, Carlos Diaz, Helen Diaz, Jacinto Diaz, Donna Diggs, Julianna Ditton, Robert Ditton, Rosa Dixon, Larry Dodson, Heath Dollar, Emerson Dominguez-Osorio, Mario Doratt, Alice Dorsett, Lee Dorsey, Carlos Duarte, Barbara A Dugger, Leonard Durham, Brent Duvall, India Duvall, Katherine Duvall, Jimmy Earls, Rachel Edlin, Jodie Edwards, Bonita Embry, Deirdre Embry, Susan Emery, Doy England, Christian Enriquez, Carla Escobar, Irlanda Espinoza, Brandon Etzkorn, Pam Evans, Helen Farmer, Miguel Figueroa, Gerald Fisher, Jr, Johnny Floren, Joanna Kay Ford, Karen Ford, Cecil Foster, Jr, Johnnie Foster, Roxanne Foster, William Foster, Caryl Fowler, Randy Fowler, Debra Freeman, Floyd Freeman, Garland Freeman, Jr, Jeffery Freeman, Lawrence Freeman, Michael Freeman, Randy Freeman, Sharon Freeman, Velma Freeman, William Freeman, Pamela Freitas, Kathy Fryar, Richard Fryar, Thomas Fryar, Frederico Fuentes, Yong Gabhart, Stephen Gadberry, Danny Gallaher, Aurora Garcia, Elizabeth Garcia, Ignacio T Garcia, Jr, Patricia Morales Garcia, Kathy Garrigus, Wilma Garrison, James Geary, Samuel Genna, Charlie George, James Michael George, Heidi Gering, Violet Germany, Irma Giran, Tim Gist, Debbie Glass, David Glover, Isidro Godoy, Rebeca Godoy, Ernest Goins, Luis Gonzales, Celia Gonzalez, Delfino Gonzalez, Edin Gonzalez, Eloy Gonzalez, Jr, Jose H Gonzalez, Jose Gonzalez, Leticia Gonzalez, Maria Gonzalez, Nestor Gonzalez, Oscar Gonzalez, Linda Greer, Linda Griffin, Theresa Grigsby, Rosa Guiterrez, Marsha Hackler, Kristy Hagan, Carrie Haley, Patricia Hamilton, David Hardin, Lonnie Harris, Travis Harvey, Nancy Ann Havenstrite, Victoria Mae Heaton, Cathy Heflin, Dyana Hefner, Katie Hency, Hermes Henriquez, Nancy Hentschel, Alexander B Hernandez, Brenda Hernandez, Carmen Hernandez, Guadalupe Hernandez, Henry Hernandez, Jose Luis Hernandez, Juan Hernandez, Maria Hernandez, Maribel Hernandez, Mercedes Hernandez, Raul Hernandez, Rene Hernandez, Rosa Hernandez, Rosa M Herrera, Vickie Higgins, Donald Hill, Eddie Hill, Guy Hill, Pamela Hill, Randall Hillis, Stephanie Hillis, Michael Hinman, Melvin Hirtler, Jerry Holland, Connie Hollis, William Holmes, Denise Hon, Jerry Honaker, Sr, Tommy Honaker, Kimberly Hopson, Gennifer Horn, Bernice Howard, David Huaranga, Donna L Hudson, Tammy Hudson, Carol Huggins, Anna Hughes, Mary Hughes, Krystal Humphrey, Natasha Hutcherson, Rebecca Irwin, Rosa Izaguirre, Frankie Jackson, Paul Jackson, Stephanie Jackson, Lori James, Sunny James, Wayman James, Jorge Jobel, Donna G Johnson, Holly Johnson, Laura Johnson, Marianne Johnson, Joan Johnston, Clinton Jones, Cristy Jones, Jeremy Jones, Lisa Jones, Marilyn Jones, Bernabe Jovel, Artemio Juarez, Linda Julian, Cecil Keith, Daniel Kelley, Sandra Kellybrew, Dustin Kemp, Lemuel Keys, Reba King, Shereacia Kinnon, Christina Kugler, Rebecca Lacy, Omar Lagos, Roxana Lagos, Celina Lama, Helen Landenberger, Charles Lane, Phyllis Lanoy, Marta Lara, Deann Laymon, Tony Laymon, Sonya Sue Leavell, Bobby Ledford, Jr, Kimberly Lee, William Lee, Dennis Lemarr, Irvin Lemarr, Debra Lenhart, Michael Level, Carol Jean Lievsay, Miao-Hua Lin, Johnny Litsey, Jerrad Littrell, Jose Loaeza, Donna S Long, Garry Lopez, Gloria Lopez, Richard Love, Sr, Mechelle Lovejoy, Leslie Loveland, Abdon Lozano, Jr, Abdon Lozano, Mario Lozano, Pamela Lute, Craig Lyons, Deborah Mahan, Jorge A Marcia, Reina Marcos, Antonio Paz Mares, Rosa Mares, Gary Mars, William Mars, Alicia Martin, Amanda Martin, Onita Martin, Adriana Martinez, Agustin Martinez, Carlos Martinez, Carlos D Martinez, Carolina Martinez, Felipe Martinez, Rosa Martinez, Santiago Martinez, Saul Martinez, John Mason, Brian Massey, Raquiel Masters, Sandra Mata, Brenda Mathis, Barbara Matthews, Earl Matthews, Ben Maturino, Melvin Maxwell, Emerita May, Bradley Mayfield, Carla McAlister, Judy C McClure, Tommy McClure, Cynthia Dianne McDaniel, Cheryl McGee, Bonnie McNamara, Linda McPherson, Sylvia McVay, Angela McVey, Velma Meadows, Ineda Meimerstorf, Jose Mejia, Susana Mejia, Edwin Melgar, Darlene Melton, Joseph Melton, Adrianna Mena, Oscar Armando Mena, Maria E Menjivar, Joyce Metz, Diane Misener, Shannon C Mixon, Sandra Molloy, Jeffery Monteleone, Teresa Monteleone, Lourdes Montesinos, Martha Montoya, Silvestre Montoya, Jarman Moody, Samuel Moore, Terry Moore, Gilbert Morales, Jason Morales, Jesus Morales, Jose A Morales, Juan Carlos Morales, Maria Del Carmen Morales, Marlon Garcia Morales, Walter Morales, Jose Morales-Herrera, Domingo Moran, Sherry Morell, Samuel Morgan, Angela Moro, Rhonda Morris, Amanda Morse, Tammy Morton, Katie Moss, Mary Moten, Elizabeth Moudy, Bill Moulder, Carrie Murchison, Ignacio Murillo, Christopher Myers, Anong Nanthalansy, Pha Nanthalansy, Amanda Navarrete, Jose Navarrete, Sylvia Navarrete, Jose Navarro, Eric Neaterous, Janice Needham, Cynthia Nelson, Patricia Nelson, Michael Neumeier, Alan Newby, Stan Nichols, Erica Nieto, Jimmy Noah, Karen Noble, Priscilla J Noblett, Betty Norris, Sabrina O'Briant, Wayne O'Briant, David O'Neal, Jose Luis Ochoa, Josefina Ochoa, Juan Ochoa, Raul Ochoa, Debra Oliver, Sharon Lynnette Oliver, Magaly Orellano, Germanus Orndorff, III, Raul Rodriguez Orozco, Walter Danilo Orrellana, Maria Ortiz, Celia Osorio, Austin Padgett, Victor Padilla-Rivera, Zolaida Palacios, Betty Palmer, Juan Parada, Leslie Paredes, Cathy Parker, Tommy Parks, Carolyn Parrish, Alicia Partida, Myrna G Partida, Angela Patrick, Alfonso Paz, Claudiade Paz, David Paz, Juan Paz, Rodolfo Paz, Sherry Pearce, Bobby Pearson, Jimmy Pease, Lila Dean Pease, Danny L Pendergraft, Rena Pendergraft, Ronnie Peoples, Dora Perdido-Russell, Vicente Perez, Cindy Phalan, Sharon Phillips, Lynn Phipps, Jeremy Pierce, Edith Pledger, Josh Poirier, Elenilson Ponce, Grant Popliln, David Portillo, Teodoro Portillo, Vickey Powell, Mary L Price, Jack Proctor, Lacey Qualls, Renee Qualls, Cathy Radcliff, Billy Ralls, Jr, Brenda Ramirez, Manuel Ramirez, Osmin Ramirez, Rafael Ramirez, Ricardo Ramos, Jeff Rappe, Khanthalyxay La Rasavong, Teresa Rauda, Katharina Reed, Filemon Rendon, Maria Rendon, Eddie Renier, Carrie Reyes, Elizabeth Reyes, Gerordo Reyes, Iris Reyes, Jose Reyes, Lorenzo Reyes, Luis Reyes, Maria Reyes, Maria C Reyes, Francisco Reyna, David Rice, William Richards, Edwin Rivas, Rosalio Rivas, Francisco Rivera, Jael Rivera, Marlon Rivera, Mayra Rivera-Enriquez, Jimmy Roberds, Leona Roberds, Treva Roberds, William Roberds, Perry Roberson, Edward Robinson, Jeremy Robinson, Judy Robinson, Baldemar Robles, Katherine Rochell, Belinda Rodriguez, Blanca Rodriguez, Gregorio Rodriguez, Jorge Paz Rodriguez, Paul Rodriguez, Peggy Rodriguez, Diana Roesler, Jerome Roesler, Michael Rogers, Patricia Rogers, Tammy Rogers, Pedro Rojas, Ricardo Rojas, Eva Romero, Idalia Romero, Tomas Romero, Ana Romero-Urquilla, Linda Romine, Shirley Romine, Mattie Romines, Antonio Rosales, Francsico Rosales, Teresa Rosbia-Laws, Jose Ruiz, Chris Russell, Juana Salas, Maria Salas, Teodora Salas, German Sanabria, Marina Sanabria, Holly Sanchez, Jose D Sanchez, Sheila Sanchez, Karen Sanders, Xiomara Sandoval, Omar Jovan F Scott, Frank Sears, Kristy Sears, Jose Segovia, Rafael Segura, Margie Sexton, Gloria Shafer, Rickey Shaffer, William Shelton, Allen Siddall, Mayra Sierra, Emily Simmons, Kenneth Simpson, Kathryn Sims, Genella Smith, Mahogany Smith, Mary Smith, Preston Smith, Rheba Smith, Sammy Smith, Scot Smith, Zenas Smith, Sr, James Snow, Gloria Snyder, Nancy Sorenson, Betty Soriano, Marvin M Soriano, Rafael Sorto, Frank Sosa, Joseph South, Sandy Souvannakhot, Terry Staggs, James Standridge, Bruce Stanley, Rachelle Stanley, Joseph Stevens, Kimberley Ann Stewart, Regina Stewart, Krystal Strandlund, Paul J Strnad, Dennis Stroud, Gregorio Suarez, Davida Elaine Summit, Judy Summit, Jerry Swilley, Guadalupe Talamantes, Linda Tanner, Tina Tanner, Brian Tarkington, Barbara Taurone, Samantha Tavarez, Elizabeth Taylor, Linda Taylor, Paul Taylor, Rebecca Taylor-Garrigus, Jaime Tejada, Robert Templin, Sheila Ann Tenango, Mary Tennison, Michael Tennison, Lori Terry, Angela Thompson, Kenneth Thompson, Leonard Norman Thompson, Phillip Thompson, Jr, Wanda Thompson, Richard Tillery, Luz Dary Torrellas, Antonio Torres, Hector Torres, Michelle Torres, Ronan F Torres, Raul Tovar, Uriel Tovar, Jessica Triste, Clem Tucker, III, Ida L Tucker, Rosemary Tullous, Julie Turley, Michele Turner, Joshua Tyler, Zach Underwood, Phyllis Ushery, Christian Valladares, Fabio Valladares, Manuel Valladares, Lou Ann Vasquez, Joshua Vaughan, Wanda Vaughan, Mayra Vazquez, Hipolita Velasquez, Maria Velasquez, Angelica Velazquez, Morena Villacorta, Ruben Villacorta, Melvin Vinson, Khamphay Visathep, Phouvieng Visathep, Kenneth Volz, Gerald Vongprachanh, Jean Wagner, Richard Walker, Laura Washington, Anita Watson, Ronnie Watts, Dennis Weir, Cindy Wells, Mary Wewer, Doug Wheatley, Charles White, Edward White, Larry Wiley, Jacquelyn Willcutt, Johnny D Willcutt, Ashley Williams, Charles Williams, Dessie Williams, Jennifer Williams, Jerry Williams, Lillia Williams, Michael Williams, Nicole Williams, Vicky Williams, Eric Wilson, Paula Wilson, Steve Wilson, Cheryl T Windsor, Kelley Winkle, Diane Winton, Matthew Wolfe, Matt Wood, Sherry Wood, Rhonda Woody, Lanny Wooten, Barbara Wright, James Wright, Joseph Wright, Steven Xayadeth, Valerie Yandell, Mariano Yanes, Alan Young, James M Youngman, Sergio Zamora, Juan Zavala, Balentin Zelaya
450
05/09/2017
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.)CLERK'S MINUTES for proceedings held before Judge James M. Moody Jr.:Status Conference held on 5/9/2017. Counsel for Plaintiffs - Josh Sanford; Counsel for Defendant - Joe Glynias (Court Reporter Karen Baker.)
451
05/11/2017
Joint MOTION to Extend Time for Expert Deposition and Responses to Pending Motions by All Plaintiffs
452
05/16/2017
Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 451 Joint MOTION to Extend Time for Expert Deposition and Responses to Pending Motions by All Defendants
453
05/17/2017
ORDER granting 452 Amended Joint Motion for Extension of Time. The 451 original motion is denied as moot The deadline for discovery is extended through 7/14/2017 for the limited purpose of allowing Plaintiffs to depose Defendant's expert witness. The deadline for Defendant's response to Plaintiff's motion for jury view is 6/30/2017. The deadline for Defendant's response to Plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment is 5/24/2017. The parties will schedule a mediated settlement conference immediately upon resolution of the pending motions for summary judgment. All issues surrounding class certification and the sending of notice shall be resolved following the resolution of the pending motions for summary judgment. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 5/17/2017.
454
05/24/2017
RESPONSE in Opposition re 441 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding the Compensability of Donning and Doffing Activities And Reply Brief in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment filed by All Defendants.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
2 Attachments
455
05/24/2017
REPLY in support of 440 Statement of Facts (Local Rule 56.1) filed by Conagra Foods Packaged Foods LLC. (Docket text modified on 5/25/2017 to correct the description of the document filed).
456
05/24/2017
RESPONSE to 443 Statement of Facts filed by Conagra Foods Packaged Foods LLC.
1
Exhibit 1
2
Exhibit 2
3
Exhibit 3
4
Exhibit 4
5
Exhibit 5
6
Exhibit 6
7
Exhibit 7
8
Exhibit 9
9
Exhibit 10
10
Exhibit 11
11
Exhibit 12
12
Exhibit 13
13
Exhibit 8) (Docket text modified on 5/25/2017 to correct the description of the document filed). (jak
13 Attachments
05/25/2017
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re 455 Statement of Facts and 456 Statement of Facts. CORRECTION: The docket text for docket entry 455 was modified to correct the description of the document filed as "REPLY in support of 440 Statement of Facts (Local Rule 56.1) filed by Conagra Foods Packaged Foods LLC" as marked on the document. The docket text for docket entry 456 was modified to correct the description of the document filed as "RESPONSE to 443 Statement of Facts filed by Conagra Foods Packaged Foods LLC" as marked on the document. (Text entry; no document attached.)
457
05/31/2017
REPLY to Response to Motion re 441 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding the Compensability of Donning and Doffing Activities filed by All Plaintiffs.
1
Exhibit 1 Excerpt from Avery Hearing Transcript
1 Attachment
458
06/12/2017
STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Craig Lyons.
459
06/30/2017
Joint MOTION to Stay deadline for Defendant's Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Jury View by All Defendants
460
07/06/2017
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting 459 Motion to Stay the deadline for the defendant to respond to the plaintiffs' motion for jury view(#445). The deadline for defendant to respond to the motion for jury view is stayed pending resolution of the pending motions for summary judgment. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 7/6/17.
461
08/28/2017
PRETRIAL DISCLOSURE SHEET by Dario Abarca, Bertha Abrego, Rose Acree, William Akens, Esparanza Alcantar, Orlando Alcantar, Fulvia Aleman, David Alexander, Marvin Alexander, Juan Alfaro, Ramiro Alonso, Jorge Alonzo, Juana Alvarado, Miguel Alvarado, Roberto Alvarado, Maria S Alvarenga, Martha Alvarez, Victor Alvidrez, Israel A Amaya, Amy Anderson, Bobby Anderson, Christopher Anderson, Justin Anderson, Kimberly Anderson, Zachary Anderson, Jorge Andrade, Daniel Apanavicius, Tommy Applegate, Jose Arcia, Alfredo Arias, Josefina Arias, Sirina Arias, Barbara Arnold, Alan Arrington, Artemio Avalos, Rebekah Avery, Irma Avila, Samuel Avilacruz, Cesar Ayala, Dina Ayala, Sabino Bahena, Nathan Balch, Kenneth Barnes, Carol Barnett, Callie Bartlett, Laura Baugh, Lester Baugh, Francisco Bautista, Brenda Beech, Douglas Beech, Keith Bell, Marco Belmonte, Franklin Beltran, Dennis Berry, Chong Bewley, John Bewley, Tom Birge, Jr, Chrissie Bishop, Sarah Bohlier, Randall Boley, Alex A Bonilla, Jose Bonilla, Maria Bonilla, Salvador Bonilla, Rosa Bonilla De Reyes, Robert Bowden, Tyler Brafford, Paul Bragg, Mark Brashear, Christine Bristol, Dora Brockman, Jacqueline Brooks, Lori Brooks, Anthony A Brown, Earnest Lee Brown, Gary Brown, Jerry Brown, Lenard Ray Brown, Linda Brown, Theodore Bruce, Jr, Curtis Brunston, Clay Bryant, Connie Denise Bryant, Grace Bryant, Carolyn Burdine, Danny Burton, Rachel Burton, Donald Byers, Francine Byers, Keith Byrum, Ubilberto Caballero, Armando Cabello, Elder R Cabrera, Medardo Calero, Myrna Calito, Lloyd Callan, Linda Calvin, Mercedes E Campos, Vicente Campos, Gary Canady, Gene Canady, Rodolfo Canales, Alberto Cargas, Carlos Carrillo, Glendy Carrillo, Mike Carrillo, Sandra Carrillo, Connie Carrington, Debra Carter, Richard Casey, Rudy Castillo, Mercedes Castro, Shirley Cato, Esmeralda Cavazos, Ashanti Chenault, Patricia Chenowith, Jorge Chica, Chris Childers, Richard Choate, James M Christen, Cheryl Chronister, William Clair, Randy Dewayne Clark, William Clark, Leonard Coffman, Linda Coffman, Mary Coffman, Freddie Cogburn, Jr, Tellas Collier, Barbara Collins, Lynda Collins, Shannon Collins, Don Condley, David Conner, David Cook, Joyce Cook, Linda Cook, Debra Coonce, Felisha Cooper, Jessie Cooper, Jenny L Corona, Freda Cossey, Ezell Cotton, John Cowen, Warren Cowen, Denise Crain, Carrie Crawford, Ernesto Antonio Crisostomo, Juan Crisostomo, Eric Criswell, Sr, Justin Criswell, Ruth Criswell, Wanza Cross, Nancy Cruz, Nelson A Cruz, Charlotte Cummings, Sharon Curtis, Timothy Davidson, Charles Davis, Clifford Harold Davis, Eddie Neil Davis, Ellis Davis, Jr, Ellis Christopher Davis, Sr, Keeton Davis, Kristina Davis, Raymond Davis, Monica DeLeon, Gail Debardelaben, Robert Delavan, Victor Delgado, Ruth Demmitt, Barbara Devore, Carlos Diaz, Helen Diaz, Jacinto Diaz, Donna Diggs, Julianna Ditton, Robert Ditton, Rosa Dixon, Larry Dodson, Heath Dollar, Emerson Dominguez-Osorio, Mario Doratt, Alice Dorsett, Lee Dorsey, Carlos Duarte, Barbara A Dugger, Leonard Durham, Brent Duvall, India Duvall, Katherine Duvall, Jimmy Earls, Rachel Edlin, Jodie Edwards, Bonita Embry, Deirdre Embry, Susan Emery, Doy England, Christian Enriquez, Carla Escobar, Irlanda Espinoza, Brandon Etzkorn, Pam Evans, Helen Farmer, Miguel Figueroa, Gerald Fisher, Jr, Johnny Floren, Joanna Kay Ford, Karen Ford, Cecil Foster, Jr, Johnnie Foster, Roxanne Foster, William Foster, Caryl Fowler, Randy Fowler, Debra Freeman, Floyd Freeman, Garland Freeman, Jr, Jeffery Freeman, Lawrence Freeman, Michael Freeman, Randy Freeman, Sharon Freeman, Velma Freeman, William Freeman, Pamela Freitas, Kathy Fryar, Richard Fryar, Thomas Fryar, Frederico Fuentes, Yong Gabhart, Stephen Gadberry, Danny Gallaher, Aurora Garcia, Elizabeth Garcia, Ignacio T Garcia, Jr, Patricia Morales Garcia, Kathy Garrigus, Wilma Garrison, James Geary, Samuel Genna, Charlie George, James Michael George, Heidi Gering, Violet Germany, Irma Giran, Tim Gist, Debbie Glass, David Glover, Isidro Godoy, Rebeca Godoy, Ernest Goins, Luis Gonzales, Celia Gonzalez, Delfino Gonzalez, Edin Gonzalez, Eloy Gonzalez, Jr, Jose H Gonzalez, Jose Gonzalez, Leticia Gonzalez, Maria Gonzalez, Nestor Gonzalez, Oscar Gonzalez, Linda Greer, Linda Griffin, Theresa Grigsby, Rosa Guiterrez, Marsha Hackler, Kristy Hagan, Carrie Haley, Patricia Hamilton, David Hardin, Lonnie Harris, Travis Harvey, Nancy Ann Havenstrite, Victoria Mae Heaton, Cathy Heflin, Dyana Hefner, Katie Hency, Hermes Henriquez, Nancy Hentschel, Alexander B Hernandez, Brenda Hernandez, Carmen Hernandez, Guadalupe Hernandez, Henry Hernandez, Jose Luis Hernandez, Juan Hernandez, Maria Hernandez, Maribel Hernandez, Mercedes Hernandez, Raul Hernandez, Rene Hernandez, Rosa Hernandez, Rosa M Herrera, Vickie Higgins, Donald Hill, Eddie Hill, Guy Hill, Pamela Hill, Randall Hillis, Stephanie Hillis, Michael Hinman, Melvin Hirtler, Jerry Holland, Connie Hollis, William Holmes, Denise Hon, Jerry Honaker, Sr, Tommy Honaker, Kimberly Hopson, Gennifer Horn, Bernice Howard, David Huaranga, Donna L Hudson, Tammy Hudson, Carol Huggins, Anna Hughes, Mary Hughes, Krystal Humphrey, Natasha Hutcherson, Rebecca Irwin, Rosa Izaguirre, Frankie Jackson, Paul Jackson, Stephanie Jackson, Lori James, Sunny James, Wayman James, Jorge Jobel, Donna G Johnson, Holly Johnson, Laura Johnson, Marianne Johnson, Joan Johnston, Clinton Jones, Cristy Jones, Jeremy Jones, Lisa Jones, Marilyn Jones, Bernabe Jovel, Artemio Juarez, Linda Julian, Cecil Keith, Daniel Kelley, Sandra Kellybrew, Dustin Kemp, Lemuel Keys, Reba King, Shereacia Kinnon, Christina Kugler, Rebecca Lacy, Omar Lagos, Roxana Lagos, Celina Lama, Helen Landenberger, Charles Lane, Phyllis Lanoy, Marta Lara, Deann Laymon, Tony Laymon, Sonya Sue Leavell, Bobby Ledford, Jr, Kimberly Lee, William Lee, Dennis Lemarr, Irvin Lemarr, Debra Lenhart, Michael Level, Carol Jean Lievsay, Miao-Hua Lin, Johnny Litsey, Jerrad Littrell, Jose Loaeza, Donna S Long, Garry Lopez, Gloria Lopez, Richard Love, Sr, Mechelle Lovejoy, Leslie Loveland, Abdon Lozano, Jr, Abdon Lozano, Mario Lozano, Pamela Lute, Craig Lyons, Deborah Mahan, Jorge A Marcia, Reina Marcos, Antonio Paz Mares, Rosa Mares, Gary Mars, William Mars, Alicia Martin, Amanda Martin, Onita Martin, Adriana Martinez, Agustin Martinez, Carlos Martinez, Carlos D Martinez, Carolina Martinez, Felipe Martinez, Rosa Martinez, Santiago Martinez, Saul Martinez, John Mason, Brian Massey, Raquiel Masters, Sandra Mata, Brenda Mathis, Barbara Matthews, Earl Matthews, Ben Maturino, Melvin Maxwell, Emerita May, Bradley Mayfield, Carla McAlister, Judy C McClure, Tommy McClure, Cynthia Dianne McDaniel, Cheryl McGee, Bonnie McNamara, Linda McPherson, Sylvia McVay, Angela McVey, Velma Meadows, Ineda Meimerstorf, Jose Mejia, Susana Mejia, Edwin Melgar, Darlene Melton, Joseph Melton, Adrianna Mena, Oscar Armando Mena, Maria E Menjivar, Joyce Metz, Diane Misener, Shannon C Mixon, Sandra Molloy, Jeffery Monteleone, Teresa Monteleone, Lourdes Montesinos, Martha Montoya, Silvestre Montoya, Jarman Moody, Samuel Moore, Terry Moore, Gilbert Morales, Jason Morales, Jesus Morales, Jose A Morales, Juan Carlos Morales, Maria Del Carmen Morales, Marlon Garcia Morales, Walter Morales, Jose Morales-Herrera, Domingo Moran, Sherry Morell, Samuel Morgan, Angela Moro, Rhonda Morris, Amanda Morse, Tammy Morton, Katie Moss, Mary Moten, Elizabeth Moudy, Bill Moulder, Carrie Murchison, Ignacio Murillo, Christopher Myers, Anong Nanthalansy, Pha Nanthalansy, Amanda Navarrete, Jose Navarrete, Sylvia Navarrete, Jose Navarro, Eric Neaterous, Janice Needham, Cynthia Nelson, Patricia Nelson, Michael Neumeier, Alan Newby, Stan Nichols, Erica Nieto, Jimmy Noah, Karen Noble, Priscilla J Noblett, Betty Norris, Sabrina O'Briant, Wayne O'Briant, David O'Neal, Jose Luis Ochoa, Josefina Ochoa, Juan Ochoa, Raul Ochoa, Debra Oliver, Sharon Lynnette Oliver, Magaly Orellano, Germanus Orndorff, III, Raul Rodriguez Orozco, Walter Danilo Orrellana, Maria Ortiz, Celia Osorio, Austin Padgett, Victor Padilla-Rivera, Zolaida Palacios, Betty Palmer, Juan Parada, Leslie Paredes, Cathy Parker, Tommy Parks, Carolyn Parrish, Alicia Partida, Myrna G Partida, Angela Patrick, Alfonso Paz, Claudiade Paz, David Paz, Juan Paz, Rodolfo Paz, Sherry Pearce, Bobby Pearson, Jimmy Pease, Lila Dean Pease, Danny L Pendergraft, Rena Pendergraft, Ronnie Peoples, Dora Perdido-Russell, Vicente Perez, Cindy Phalan, Sharon Phillips, Lynn Phipps, Jeremy Pierce, Edith Pledger, Josh Poirier, Elenilson Ponce, Grant Popliln, David Portillo, Teodoro Portillo, Vickey Powell, Mary L Price, Jack Proctor, Lacey Qualls, Renee Qualls, Cathy Radcliff, Billy Ralls, Jr, Brenda Ramirez, Manuel Ramirez, Osmin Ramirez, Rafael Ramirez, Ricardo Ramos, Jeff Rappe, Khanthalyxay La Rasavong, Teresa Rauda, Katharina Reed, Filemon Rendon, Maria Rendon, Eddie Renier, Carrie Reyes, Elizabeth Reyes, Gerordo Reyes, Iris Reyes, Jose Reyes, Lorenzo Reyes, Luis Reyes, Maria Reyes, Maria C Reyes, Francisco Reyna, David Rice, William Richards, Edwin Rivas, Rosalio Rivas, Francisco Rivera, Jael Rivera, Marlon Rivera, Mayra Rivera-Enriquez, Jimmy Roberds, Leona Roberds, Treva Roberds, William Roberds, Perry Roberson, Edward Robinson, Jeremy Robinson, Judy Robinson, Baldemar Robles, Katherine Rochell, Belinda Rodriguez, Blanca Rodriguez, Gregorio Rodriguez, Jorge Paz Rodriguez, Paul Rodriguez, Peggy Rodriguez, Diana Roesler, Jerome Roesler, Michael Rogers, Patricia Rogers, Tammy Rogers, Pedro Rojas, Ricardo Rojas, Eva Romero, Idalia Romero, Tomas Romero, Ana Romero-Urquilla, Linda Romine, Shirley Romine, Mattie Romines, Antonio Rosales, Francsico Rosales, Teresa Rosbia-Laws, Jose Ruiz, Chris Russell, Juana Salas, Maria Salas, Teodora Salas, German Sanabria, Marina Sanabria, Holly Sanchez, Jose D Sanchez, Sheila Sanchez, Karen Sanders, Xiomara Sandoval, Omar Jovan F Scott, Frank Sears, Kristy Sears, Jose Segovia, Rafael Segura, Margie Sexton, Gloria Shafer, Rickey Shaffer, William Shelton, Allen Siddall, Mayra Sierra, Emily Simmons, Kenneth Simpson, Kathryn Sims, Genella Smith, Mahogany Smith, Mary Smith, Preston Smith, Rheba Smith, Sammy Smith, Scot Smith, Zenas Smith, Sr, James Snow, Gloria Snyder, Nancy Sorenson, Betty Soriano, Marvin M Soriano, Rafael Sorto, Frank Sosa, Joseph South, Sandy Souvannakhot, Terry Staggs, James Standridge, Bruce Stanley, Rachelle Stanley, Joseph Stevens, Kimberley Ann Stewart, Regina Stewart, Krystal Strandlund, Paul J Strnad, Dennis Stroud, Gregorio Suarez, Davida Elaine Summit, Judy Summit, Jerry Swilley, Guadalupe Talamantes, Linda Tanner, Tina Tanner, Brian Tarkington, Barbara Taurone, Samantha Tavarez, Elizabeth Taylor, Linda Taylor, Paul Taylor, Rebecca Taylor-Garrigus, Jaime Tejada, Robert Templin, Sheila Ann Tenango, Mary Tennison, Michael Tennison, Lori Terry, Angela Thompson, Kenneth Thompson, Leonard Norman Thompson, Phillip Thompson, Jr, Wanda Thompson, Richard Tillery, Luz Dary Torrellas, Antonio Torres, Hector Torres, Michelle Torres, Ronan F Torres, Raul Tovar, Uriel Tovar, Jessica Triste, Clem Tucker, III, Ida L Tucker, Rosemary Tullous, Julie Turley, Michele Turner, Joshua Tyler, Zach Underwood, Phyllis Ushery, Christian Valladares, Fabio Valladares, Manuel Valladares, Lou Ann Vasquez, Joshua Vaughan, Wanda Vaughan, Mayra Vazquez, Hipolita Velasquez, Maria Velasquez, Angelica Velazquez, Morena Villacorta, Ruben Villacorta, Melvin Vinson, Khamphay Visathep, Phouvieng Visathep, Kenneth Volz, Gerald Vongprachanh, Jean Wagner, Richard Walker, Laura Washington, Anita Watson, Ronnie Watts, Dennis Weir, Cindy Wells, Mary Wewer, Doug Wheatley, Charles White, Edward White, Larry Wiley, Jacquelyn Willcutt, Johnny D Willcutt, Ashley Williams, Charles Williams, Dessie Williams, Jennifer Williams, Jerry Williams, Lillia Williams, Michael Williams, Nicole Williams, Vicky Williams, Eric Wilson, Paula Wilson, Steve Wilson, Cheryl T Windsor, Kelley Winkle, Diane Winton, Matthew Wolfe, Matt Wood, Sherry Wood, Rhonda Woody, Lanny Wooten, Barbara Wright, James Wright, Joseph Wright, Steven Xayadeth, Valerie Yandell, Mariano Yanes, Alan Young, James M Youngman, Sergio Zamora, Juan Zavala, Balentin Zelaya.
462
08/30/2017
ORDER granting Defendant's 438 Motion for Summary Judgment; and denying Plaintiffs' 441 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 8/30/2017. (mcz) Modified on 8/30/2017 to correct typographical error
463
08/30/2017
JUDGMENT Consistent with the 462 Order entered on this date, all claims against the defendant are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 8/30/2017.
464
09/05/2017
MOTION for Reconsideration re 462 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, by All Plaintiffs
465
09/05/2017
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 464 Motion for Reconsideration filed by All Plaintiffs.
466
09/13/2017
MOTION for Costs by Conagra Foods Packaged Foods LLC
1
Exhibit 1
2
Exhibit 2
2 Attachments
467
09/19/2017
RESPONSE in Opposition re 464 MOTION for Reconsideration re 462 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, filed by Conagra Foods Packaged Foods LLC.
468
09/21/2017
REPLY to Response to Motion re 464 MOTION for Reconsideration re 462 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, filed by All Plaintiffs.
469
09/26/2017
RESPONSE in Opposition re 466 MOTION for Costs filed by All Plaintiffs.
470
09/26/2017
ORDER denying Plaintiffs' 464 Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Order granting the Defendant's motion for summary judgment. The Court is not persuaded that its Order entered 8/30/2017 is in error. Plaintiffs' newly raised arguments are untimely. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 9/26/2017.
471
09/27/2017
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 462 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, 463 Judgment, 402 Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Dario Abarca, Bertha Abrego, Rose Acree, William Akens, Esparanza Alcantar, Orlando Alcantar, Fulvia Aleman, David Alexander, Marvin Alexander, Juan Alfaro, Ramiro Alonso, Jorge Alonzo, Juana Alvarado, Miguel Alvarado, Roberto Alvarado, Maria S Alvarenga, Martha Alvarez, Victor Alvidrez, Israel A Amaya, Amy Anderson, Bobby Anderson, Christopher Anderson, Justin Anderson, Kimberly Anderson, Zachary Anderson, Jorge Andrade, Daniel Apanavicius, Tommy Applegate, Jose Arcia, Alfredo Arias, Josefina Arias, Sirina Arias, Barbara Arnold, Alan Arrington, Artemio Avalos, Rebekah Avery, Irma Avila, Samuel Avilacruz, Cesar Ayala, Dina Ayala, Sabino Bahena, Nathan Balch, Kenneth Barnes, Carol Barnett, Callie Bartlett, Laura Baugh, Lester Baugh, Francisco Bautista, Brenda Beech, Douglas Beech, Keith Bell, Marco Belmonte, Franklin Beltran, Dennis Berry, Chong Bewley, John Bewley, Tom Birge, Jr, Chrissie Bishop, Sarah Bohlier, Randall Boley, Alex A Bonilla, Jose Bonilla, Maria Bonilla, Salvador Bonilla, Rosa Bonilla De Reyes, Robert Bowden, Tyler Brafford, Paul Bragg, Mark Brashear, Christine Bristol, Dora Brockman, Jacqueline Brooks, Lori Brooks, Anthony A Brown, Earnest Lee Brown, Gary Brown, Jerry Brown, Lenard Ray Brown, Linda Brown, Theodore Bruce, Jr, Curtis Brunston, Clay Bryant, Connie Denise Bryant, Grace Bryant, Carolyn Burdine, Danny Burton, Rachel Burton, Donald Byers, Francine Byers, Keith Byrum, Ubilberto Caballero, Armando Cabello, Elder R Cabrera, Medardo Calero, Myrna Calito, Lloyd Callan, Linda Calvin, Mercedes E Campos, Vicente Campos, Gary Canady, Gene Canady, Rodolfo Canales, Alberto Cargas, Carlos Carrillo, Glendy Carrillo, Mike Carrillo, Sandra Carrillo, Connie Carrington, Debra Carter, Richard Casey, Rudy Castillo, Mercedes Castro, Shirley Cato, Esmeralda Cavazos, Ashanti Chenault, Patricia Chenowith, Jorge Chica, Chris Childers, Richard Choate, James M Christen, Cheryl Chronister, William Clair, Randy Dewayne Clark, William Clark, Leonard Coffman, Linda Coffman, Mary Coffman, Freddie Cogburn, Jr, Tellas Collier, Barbara Collins, Lynda Collins, Shannon Collins, Don Condley, David Conner, David Cook, Joyce Cook, Linda Cook, Debra Coonce, Felisha Cooper, Jessie Cooper, Jenny L Corona, Freda Cossey, Ezell Cotton, John Cowen, Warren Cowen, Denise Crain, Carrie Crawford, Ernesto Antonio Crisostomo, Juan Crisostomo, Eric Criswell, Sr, Justin Criswell, Ruth Criswell, Wanza Cross, Nancy Cruz, Nelson A Cruz, Charlotte Cummings, Sharon Curtis, Timothy Davidson, Charles Davis, Clifford Harold Davis, Eddie Neil Davis, Ellis Davis, Jr, Ellis Christopher Davis, Sr, Keeton Davis, Kristina Davis, Raymond Davis, Monica DeLeon, Gail Debardelaben, Robert Delavan, Victor Delgado, Ruth Demmitt, Barbara Devore, Carlos Diaz, Helen Diaz, Jacinto Diaz, Donna Diggs, Julianna Ditton, Robert Ditton, Rosa Dixon, Larry Dodson, Heath Dollar, Emerson Dominguez-Osorio, Mario Doratt, Alice Dorsett, Lee Dorsey, Carlos Duarte, Barbara A Dugger, Leonard Durham, Brent Duvall, India Duvall, Katherine Duvall, Jimmy Earls, Rachel Edlin, Jodie Edwards, Bonita Embry, Deirdre Embry, Susan Emery, Doy England, Christian Enriquez, Carla Escobar, Irlanda Espinoza, Brandon Etzkorn, Pam Evans, Helen Farmer, Miguel Figueroa, Gerald Fisher, Jr, Johnny Floren, Joanna Kay Ford, Karen Ford, Cecil Foster, Jr, Johnnie Foster, Roxanne Foster, William Foster, Caryl Fowler, Randy Fowler, Debra Freeman, Floyd Freeman, Garland Freeman, Jr, Jeffery Freeman, Lawrence Freeman, Michael Freeman, Randy Freeman, Sharon Freeman, Velma Freeman, William Freeman, Pamela Freitas, Kathy Fryar, Richard Fryar, Thomas Fryar, Frederico Fuentes, Yong Gabhart, Stephen Gadberry, Danny Gallaher, Aurora Garcia, Elizabeth Garcia, Ignacio T Garcia, Jr, Patricia Morales Garcia, Kathy Garrigus, Wilma Garrison, James Geary, Samuel Genna, Charlie George, James Michael George, Heidi Gering, Violet Germany, Irma Giran, Tim Gist, Debbie Glass, David Glover, Isidro Godoy, Rebeca Godoy, Ernest Goins, Luis Gonzales, Celia Gonzalez, Delfino Gonzalez, Edin Gonzalez, Eloy Gonzalez, Jr, Jose H Gonzalez, Jose Gonzalez, Leticia Gonzalez, Maria Gonzalez, Nestor Gonzalez, Oscar Gonzalez, Linda Greer, Linda Griffin, Theresa Grigsby, Rosa Guiterrez, Marsha Hackler, Kristy Hagan, Carrie Haley, Patricia Hamilton, David Hardin, Lonnie Harris, Travis Harvey, Nancy Ann Havenstrite, Victoria Mae Heaton, Cathy Heflin, Dyana Hefner, Katie Hency, Hermes Henriquez, Nancy Hentschel, Alexander B Hernandez, Brenda Hernandez, Carmen Hernandez, Guadalupe Hernandez, Henry Hernandez, Jose Luis Hernandez, Juan Hernandez, Maria Hernandez, Maribel Hernandez, Mercedes Hernandez, Raul Hernandez, Rene Hernandez, Rosa Hernandez, Rosa M Herrera, Vickie Higgins, Donald Hill, Eddie Hill, Guy Hill, Pamela Hill, Randall Hillis, Stephanie Hillis, Michael Hinman, Melvin Hirtler, Jerry Holland, Connie Hollis, William Holmes, Denise Hon, Jerry Honaker, Sr, Tommy Honaker, Kimberly Hopson, Gennifer Horn, Bernice Howard, David Huaranga, Donna L Hudson, Tammy Hudson, Carol Huggins, Anna Hughes, Mary Hughes, Krystal Humphrey, Natasha Hutcherson, Rebecca Irwin, Rosa Izaguirre, Frankie Jackson, Paul Jackson, Stephanie Jackson, Lori James, Sunny James, Wayman James, Jorge Jobel, Donna G Johnson, Holly Johnson, Laura Johnson, Marianne Johnson, Joan Johnston, Clinton Jones, Cristy Jones, Jeremy Jones, Lisa Jones, Marilyn Jones, Bernabe Jovel, Artemio Juarez, Linda Julian, Cecil Keith, Daniel Kelley, Sandra Kellybrew, Dustin Kemp, Lemuel Keys, Reba King, Shereacia Kinnon, Christina Kugler, Rebecca Lacy, Omar Lagos, Roxana Lagos, Celina Lama, Helen Landenberger, Charles Lane, Phyllis Lanoy, Marta Lara, Deann Laymon, Tony Laymon, Sonya Sue Leavell, Bobby Ledford, Jr, Kimberly Lee, William Lee, Dennis Lemarr, Irvin Lemarr, Debra Lenhart, Michael Level, Carol Jean Lievsay, Miao-Hua Lin, Johnny Litsey, Jerrad Littrell, Jose Loaeza, Donna S Long, Garry Lopez, Gloria Lopez, Richard Love, Sr, Mechelle Lovejoy, Leslie Loveland, Abdon Lozano, Jr, Abdon Lozano, Mario Lozano, Pamela Lute, Craig Lyons, Deborah Mahan, Jorge A Marcia, Reina Marcos, Antonio Paz Mares, Rosa Mares, Gary Mars, William Mars, Alicia Martin, Amanda Martin, Onita Martin, Adriana Martinez, Agustin Martinez, Carlos Martinez, Carlos D Martinez, Carolina Martinez, Felipe Martinez, Rosa Martinez, Santiago Martinez, Saul Martinez, John Mason, Brian Massey, Raquiel Masters, Sandra Mata, Brenda Mathis, Barbara Matthews, Earl Matthews, Ben Maturino, Melvin Maxwell, Emerita May, Bradley Mayfield, Carla McAlister, Judy C McClure, Tommy McClure, Cynthia Dianne McDaniel, Cheryl McGee, Bonnie McNamara, Linda McPherson, Sylvia McVay, Angela McVey, Velma Meadows, Ineda Meimerstorf, Jose Mejia, Susana Mejia, Edwin Melgar, Darlene Melton, Joseph Melton, Adrianna Mena, Oscar Armando Mena, Maria E Menjivar, Joyce Metz, Diane Misener, Shannon C Mixon, Sandra Molloy, Jeffery Monteleone, Teresa Monteleone, Lourdes Montesinos, Martha Montoya, Silvestre Montoya, Jarman Moody, Samuel Moore, Terry Moore, Gilbert Morales, Jason Morales, Jesus Morales, Jose A Morales, Juan Carlos Morales, Maria Del Carmen Morales, Marlon Garcia Morales, Walter Morales, Jose Morales-Herrera, Domingo Moran, Sherry Morell, Samuel Morgan, Angela Moro, Rhonda Morris, Amanda Morse, Tammy Morton, Katie Moss, Mary Moten, Elizabeth Moudy, Bill Moulder, Carrie Murchison, Ignacio Murillo, Christopher Myers, Anong Nanthalansy, Pha Nanthalansy, Amanda Navarrete, Jose Navarrete, Sylvia Navarrete, Jose Navarro, Eric Neaterous, Janice Needham, Cynthia Nelson, Patricia Nelson, Michael Neumeier, Alan Newby, Stan Nichols, Erica Nieto, Jimmy Noah, Karen Noble, Priscilla J Noblett, Betty Norris, Sabrina O'Briant, Wayne O'Briant, David O'Neal, Jose Luis Ochoa, Josefina Ochoa, Juan Ochoa, Raul Ochoa, Debra Oliver, Sharon Lynnette Oliver, Magaly Orellano, Germanus Orndorff, III, Raul Rodriguez Orozco, Walter Danilo Orrellana, Maria Ortiz, Celia Osorio, Austin Padgett, Victor Padilla-Rivera, Zolaida Palacios, Betty Palmer, Juan Parada, Leslie Paredes, Cathy Parker, Tommy Parks, Carolyn Parrish, Alicia Partida, Myrna G Partida, Angela Patrick, Alfonso Paz, Claudiade Paz, David Paz, Juan Paz, Rodolfo Paz, Sherry Pearce, Bobby Pearson, Jimmy Pease, Lila Dean Pease, Danny L Pendergraft, Rena Pendergraft, Ronnie Peoples, Dora Perdido-Russell, Vicente Perez, Cindy Phalan, Sharon Phillips, Lynn Phipps, Jeremy Pierce, Edith Pledger, Josh Poirier, Elenilson Ponce, Grant Popliln, David Portillo, Teodoro Portillo, Vickey Powell, Mary L Price, Jack Proctor, Lacey Qualls, Renee Qualls, Cathy Radcliff, Billy Ralls, Jr, Brenda Ramirez, Manuel Ramirez, Osmin Ramirez, Rafael Ramirez, Ricardo Ramos, Jeff Rappe, Khanthalyxay La Rasavong, Teresa Rauda, Katharina Reed, Filemon Rendon, Maria Rendon, Eddie Renier, Carrie Reyes, Elizabeth Reyes, Gerordo Reyes, Iris Reyes, Jose Reyes, Lorenzo Reyes, Luis Reyes, Maria Reyes, Maria C Reyes, Francisco Reyna, David Rice, William Richards, Edwin Rivas, Rosalio Rivas, Francisco Rivera, Jael Rivera, Marlon Rivera, Mayra Rivera-Enriquez, Jimmy Roberds, Leona Roberds, Treva Roberds, William Roberds, Perry Roberson, Edward Robinson, Jeremy Robinson, Judy Robinson, Baldemar Robles, Katherine Rochell, Belinda Rodriguez, Blanca Rodriguez, Gregorio Rodriguez, Jorge Paz Rodriguez, Paul Rodriguez, Peggy Rodriguez, Diana Roesler, Jerome Roesler, Michael Rogers, Patricia Rogers, Tammy Rogers, Pedro Rojas, Ricardo Rojas, Eva Romero, Idalia Romero, Tomas Romero, Ana Romero-Urquilla, Linda Romine, Shirley Romine, Mattie Romines, Antonio Rosales, Francsico Rosales, Teresa Rosbia-Laws, Jose Ruiz, Chris Russell, Juana Salas, Maria Salas, Teodora Salas, German Sanabria, Marina Sanabria, Holly Sanchez, Jose D Sanchez, Sheila Sanchez, Karen Sanders, Xiomara Sandoval, Omar Jovan F Scott, Frank Sears, Kristy Sears, Jose Segovia, Rafael Segura, Margie Sexton, Gloria Shafer, Rickey Shaffer, William Shelton, Allen Siddall, Mayra Sierra, Emily Simmons, Kenneth Simpson, Kathryn Sims, Genella Smith, Mahogany Smith, Mary Smith, Preston Smith, Rheba Smith, Sammy Smith, Scot Smith, Zenas Smith, Sr, James Snow, Gloria Snyder, Nancy Sorenson, Betty Soriano, Marvin M Soriano, Rafael Sorto, Frank Sosa, Joseph South, Sandy Souvannakhot, Terry Staggs, James Standridge, Bruce Stanley, Rachelle Stanley, Joseph Stevens, Kimberley Ann Stewart, Regina Stewart, Krystal Strandlund, Paul J Strnad, Dennis Stroud, Gregorio Suarez, Davida Elaine Summit, Judy Summit, Jerry Swilley, Guadalupe Talamantes, Linda Tanner, Tina Tanner, Brian Tarkington, Barbara Taurone, Samantha Tavarez, Elizabeth Taylor, Linda Taylor, Paul Taylor, Rebecca Taylor-Garrigus, Jaime Tejada, Robert Templin, Sheila Ann Tenango, Mary Tennison, Michael Tennison, Lori Terry, Angela Thompson, Kenneth Thompson, Leonard Norman Thompson, Phillip Thompson, Jr, Wanda Thompson, Richard Tillery, Luz Dary Torrellas, Antonio Torres, Hector Torres, Michelle Torres, Ronan F Torres, Raul Tovar, Uriel Tovar, Jessica Triste, Clem Tucker, III, Ida L Tucker, Rosemary Tullous, Julie Turley, Michele Turner, Joshua Tyler, Zach Underwood, Phyllis Ushery, Christian Valladares, Fabio Valladares, Manuel Valladares, Lou Ann Vasquez, Joshua Vaughan, Wanda Vaughan, Mayra Vazquez, Hipolita Velasquez, Maria Velasquez, Angelica Velazquez, Morena Villacorta, Ruben Villacorta, Melvin Vinson, Khamphay Visathep, Phouvieng Visathep, Kenneth Volz, Gerald Vongprachanh, Jean Wagner, Richard Walker, Laura Washington, Anita Watson, Ronnie Watts, Dennis Weir, Cindy Wells, Mary Wewer, Doug Wheatley, Charles White, Edward White, Larry Wiley, Jacquelyn Willcutt, Johnny D Willcutt, Ashley Williams, Charles Williams, Dessie Williams, Jennifer Williams, Jerry Williams, Lillia Williams, Michael Williams, Nicole Williams, Vicky Williams, Eric Wilson, Paula Wilson, Steve Wilson, Cheryl T Windsor, Kelley Winkle, Diane Winton, Matthew Wolfe, Matt Wood, Sherry Wood, Rhonda Woody, Lanny Wooten, Barbara Wright, James Wright, Joseph Wright, Steven Xayadeth, Valerie Yandell, Mariano Yanes, Alan Young, James M Youngman, Sergio Zamora, Juan Zavala, Balentin Zelaya.
472
09/27/2017
NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL and NOA SUPPLEMENT as to Craig Lyons, et al re 471 Notice of Appeal, 462 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, 463 Judgment, 402 Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. NOTIFICATION TO COUNSEL: REQUEST FOR TRANSCRIPTS SHOULD BE FILED WITH THE DISTRICT COURT CLERK.
473
09/29/2017
USCA Appeal Fees received $ 505 receipt number LIT063857 re: 471 Notice of Appeal.
474
10/03/2017
REPLY to Response to Motion re 466 MOTION for Costs filed by Conagra Foods Packaged Foods LLC.
475
10/16/2017
USCA Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule as to 471 Notice of Appeal. USCA Case Number 17-3134. Transcript due by 11/27/2017.
476
10/19/2017
USCA Revised Briefing Schedule as to 471 Notice of Appeal. Transcript due by 11/27/2017.

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.