Maaileen Villasin Weaver
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2019-bk-00019 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
01/22/2019
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
01/22/2019
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
01/22/2019
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/22/2019
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/23/2019
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
01/23/2019
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)
4
01/23/2019
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)
5
01/23/2019
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)
6
01/23/2019
Request for Notice by Creditor
7
01/25/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
8
01/25/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
9
01/25/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
02/24/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10
04/08/2019
Financial Management Course Certificate
04/09/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/09/2019
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11
04/09/2019
Financial Management Course Certificate
12
04/23/2019
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
13
04/25/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
04/26/2019
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.