MacKenzie Shannon Norfleet
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2019-bk-00085 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
03/19/2019
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
03/19/2019
Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Form 103A) (BKM01)
3
03/19/2019
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
4
03/19/2019
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
03/19/2019
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
03/19/2019
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
03/19/2019
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/19/2019
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
03/19/2019
Pay Filing Fees in Installments (BKO01)
03/19/2019
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/19/2019
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/19/2019
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/19/2019
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10
03/20/2019
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
11
03/21/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
12
03/21/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
13
03/21/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
14
03/21/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
15
03/26/2019
Request for Special Notice
16
04/01/2019
Request for Notice by Creditor
04/11/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
17
04/12/2019
Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Form 103A) (BKM01)
18
04/12/2019
Pay Filing Fees in Installments (BKO01)
04/12/2019
Receipt of Installment Payment (Use FINAL if this payment will pay off balance) (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
04/14/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
20
04/16/2019
Financial Management Course Certificate
04/19/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/19/2019
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.