Madison Chiropractic & Nutrition Center, LLC
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

8:2018-bk-82075 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
30
08/15/2018
Bankruptcy Administrator Notice
48
12/09/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
52
12/27/2018
Approving
53
12/30/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
54
01/10/2019
Disclosure Statement

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.