Madsen et al v. North Slope Borough et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

2:2019-cv-00001 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
01/04/2019
Notice of Removal
2
01/04/2019
Civil Cover Sheet
3
01/04/2019
Remand
4
01/07/2019
Order to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal
5
01/11/2019
Response to Motion (Non-Opposition)
6
01/18/2019
Notice of Change of Address
02/06/2019
Order on Motion to Remand (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
03/05/2019
Judgment

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.