Malachi Van Soest
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00403 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
11/20/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
11/21/2018
QC - Deficiency Notice Re: Fees (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/21/2018
QC Remark (generic) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/21/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
2
11/21/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
11/21/2018
QC Remark (generic) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/21/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/21/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/21/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/21/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
11/21/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)
4
11/21/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)
5
11/21/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)
6
11/21/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
7
11/23/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
8
11/23/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
9
11/23/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
10
12/04/2018
Extend Time
11
12/04/2018
Declaration
12
12/06/2018
Extend Time
13
12/10/2018
Schedules A-J
14
12/10/2018
Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 & 207)
15
12/10/2018
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
16
12/11/2018
Schedule J (Form 106J)
17
12/11/2018
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
18
12/11/2018
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor
12/27/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
01/10/2019
Financial Management Course Certificate
20
01/17/2019
Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)
21
01/17/2019
Memorandum in Support
22
01/17/2019
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
01/18/2019
QC - Deficiency Notice Re: Fees (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/22/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/01/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
23
02/05/2019
Certificate of Service
24
02/05/2019
Certificate of No Objection
25
02/08/2019
Relief from Stay
26
02/12/2019
Request for Special Notice
02/20/2019
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
27
02/21/2019
Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)
28
02/21/2019
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
29
02/21/2019
Certificate of Service
02/21/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
30
02/26/2019
Notice of Deferral of Discharge (Reaffs Not Filed) (BNC Notice)
31
02/28/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
03/12/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
32
03/15/2019
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
33
03/18/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
34
03/19/2019
Certificate of No Objection
35
03/19/2019
Certificate of Service
03/20/2019
QC Remark Re: Incorrect Image (Text entry; no document attached.)
36
03/21/2019
Certificate of No Objection
37
03/21/2019
Certificate of Service
38
03/21/2019
Relief from Stay
03/21/2019
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
39
03/23/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.