Malaeoletalu Nellie Tauinaola-Taafua
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2019-bk-00001 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
01/03/2019
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
01/03/2019
Waive Chapter 7 Filing Fee (Form 103B) (BKM01)
3
01/03/2019
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
01/03/2019
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/03/2019
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
01/03/2019
Waive Filing Fee (BKO01)
01/04/2019
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/04/2019
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/04/2019
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/04/2019
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
01/05/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
9
01/06/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
10
01/06/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
11
01/06/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
12
01/25/2019
Notice of Hearing on UST Standing Mtn to Dismiss (CM14-COAwith)
13
01/25/2019
Excepted from Electronic Filing
14
01/25/2019
Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)
15
01/25/2019
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
16
01/25/2019
Certificate of Service
17
01/28/2019
Order to be Excepted from Electronic Filing
18
01/30/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
02/07/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
02/11/2019
Request for Special Notice
20
02/13/2019
Dismissing Case (SA)
02/13/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
21
02/14/2019
Proceeding Memo
22
02/15/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
23
02/15/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
02/22/2019
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
03/04/2019
Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice (BNC Notice)
25
03/06/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Dismissal
03/21/2019
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - dismissed or converted, no funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/25/2019
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.