Malin et al v. Koontz et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2016-cv-00232 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
67
06/04/2018
Strike
68
06/11/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
69
07/30/2018
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
70
07/30/2018
Order on Motion to Compel
71
08/08/2018
Pretrial Order
72
08/09/2018
Appear
08/09/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/14/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/14/2018
~Util - Set Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
75
08/20/2018
Notice of Change of Address
08/21/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
77
08/22/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
08/23/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/27/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/27/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/27/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/27/2018
~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
80
08/28/2018
Status Report
09/11/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
85
09/11/2018
Settlement Agreement
86
09/14/2018
Judgment

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.