Manning v. Alaska Department of Fish & Game
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00208 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
09/17/2018
Complaint
2
09/17/2018
Civil Cover Sheet
3
09/17/2018
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
4
10/03/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
5
10/04/2018
Complaint
6
10/04/2018
Unissued Summons
12/13/2018
Order Reassigning Case (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
12/17/2018
Order
9
01/02/2019
Notice of Change of Address
10
01/17/2019
Amended Complaint
11
01/17/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
12
01/17/2019
Certificate of Service
13
01/22/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
14
01/31/2019
Notice (Other)
15
02/04/2019
Order
16
02/12/2019
Reconsideration
17
02/14/2019
Order on Motion for Reconsideration
18
02/21/2019
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
19
02/22/2019
Judgment
20
03/05/2019
Notice of Appeal
21
03/05/2019
Certificate of Service
22
03/06/2019
Notice of Appeal
23
03/06/2019
Certificate of Service
24
03/08/2019
USCA Case Number
25
03/08/2019
USCA Scheduling Order
26
03/12/2019
USCA Order

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.