Marc H Harasti and Lyudmila L Harasti
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

4:2018-bk-00433 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
12/21/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
12/21/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
3
12/21/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
4
12/21/2018
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
5
12/21/2018
Certification of Domestic Support Payments
12/21/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/21/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/21/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/21/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/21/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/21/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
12/21/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)
9
12/22/2018
Request for Notice by Creditor
10
12/23/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
11
12/23/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
12
12/23/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
13
12/23/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
12/24/2018
Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event) (Text entry; no document attached.)
14
12/28/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
15
01/07/2019
Entry of Appearance
16
01/08/2019
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
01/08/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
17
01/12/2019
Amended Schedules A/B C G H I J (no fee)
18
01/12/2019
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
19
01/23/2019
Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)
20
01/23/2019
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
21
01/23/2019
Certificate of Service
01/23/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/04/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/05/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
22
02/13/2019
Certificate of No Objection
02/13/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
23
02/14/2019
Financial Management Course Certificate
24
02/15/2019
Relief from Stay
25
02/17/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
02/20/2019
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/24/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/24/2019
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
26
03/14/2019
Reaffirmation Agreement (With Atty Signature) (BKRA01)
03/18/2019
Court Remark Regarding Reaffirmation Agreement (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.