Marcella Davidson
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-01871 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: 244 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
05/03/2018
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Fee Amount $310 Filed by Marcella Davidson
2
05/03/2018
Chapter 13 Plan, and Request for Valuation of Security. Filed by Debtor Marcella Davidson.
4
05/03/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed by Debtor Marcella Davidson.
5
05/03/2018
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Marcella Davidson.
6
05/03/2018
Appraisal NADA Guides Value Report - 2013 Chrysler 200 Filed by Debtor Marcella Davidson (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan).
7
05/03/2018
Appraisal Tax Assessor Statement - 3212 31st Pl N Filed by Debtor Marcella Davidson.
8
05/03/2018
Tax Documents for the Year for 2017 Filed by Debtor Marcella Davidson.
05/03/2018
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(18-01871-13) [misc,volp13] (310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 22027844. Fee Amount 310.00 (re:Doc# 1) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
05/03/2018
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 06/06/2018 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 07/17/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 07/12/2018. Government Proof of Claim due by 10/30/2018 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 08/06/2018.
10
05/04/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management (Admin adiuser)
05/04/2018
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for debtor Marcella Davidson Case Number 96-08083, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 11/08/1996, Standard Discharge on 02/02/2001; Case Number 04-09742, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 11/03/2004, Standard Discharge on 01/05/2010.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11
05/05/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 9 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 05/05/2018.
12
05/06/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 10 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 05/06/2018.
13
05/06/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Marcella Davidson). Notice Date 05/06/2018.
14
05/07/2018
Supplemental Certificate of Service pursuant to LR 3015-1(c) Filed by Debtor Marcella Davidson (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan).
15
06/06/2018
Meeting of Creditors Held 6/6/2018. (Ch13troffice, jc)
16
06/07/2018
Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss. (Ch13troffice, km)
17
06/08/2018
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 16 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 7/17/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
18
06/10/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 17 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 06/10/2018.
30
01/13/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
32
02/15/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
34
02/18/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.