Margaret A. Bertran
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

4:2012-bk-00501 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/21/2018
Generic Motion / Application
05/22/2018
Document Served Conventionally (Notes Service Through the Mail) (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/29/2018
QC Remark (generic) (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
05/22/2018
Order (Generic) (SA)
06/06/2018
QC Remark (generic) (Text entry; no document attached.)
312
06/08/2018
Appeal - Order From Appellate Court Re: Disposition of Appeal
06/13/2018
QC Remark (generic) (Text entry; no document attached.)
313
06/13/2018
Order (Generic) (SA)
314
06/13/2018
Order (Generic) (SA)
315
06/15/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
316
06/15/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
06/18/2018
QC Remark (generic) (Text entry; no document attached.)
317
06/20/2018
Order (Generic) (SA)
318
06/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
07/13/2018
QC Remark (generic) (Text entry; no document attached.)
319
07/16/2018
Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election (Fee) (BKA04)
320
07/16/2018
Appeal - Clerks Notice of Filing Appeal and Transmittal
321
07/16/2018
Appeal - Clerks Notice of Requirements for Perfection of Appeal
322
07/16/2018
Appeal - Clerks Transmittal Form to BAP or USDC
07/16/2018
Document Served Conventionally (Notes Service Through the Mail) (Text entry; no document attached.)
323
07/18/2018
Appeal - Clerks Receipt of Transmittal of Appeal (BKA12)
324
07/18/2018
Appellant Designation of Record
325
07/19/2018
Clerks Notice of Fees Due (Not Deferred)
326
07/21/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
07/26/2018
QC Remark (generic) (Text entry; no document attached.)
327
07/27/2018
Generic Motion / Application
07/27/2018
Document Served Conventionally (Notes Service Through the Mail) (Text entry; no document attached.)
328
08/03/2018
Certification of No Transcript Ordered
08/06/2018
QC Remark (generic) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/10/2018
QC Remark (generic) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/16/2018
QC Remark (generic) (Text entry; no document attached.)
329
08/17/2018
Order (Generic) (SA)
330
08/19/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
331
08/27/2018
Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election (Fee) (BKA04)
332
08/28/2018
Generic Motion / Application
333
08/28/2018
Amended Notice of Appeal
334
08/29/2018
Appeal - Clerks Notice of Filing Appeal and Transmittal
335
08/29/2018
Appeal - Clerks Notice of Requirements for Perfection of Appeal
336
08/29/2018
Appeal - Clerks Transmittal Form to BAP or USDC
08/29/2018
Document Served Conventionally (Notes Service Through the Mail) (Text entry; no document attached.)
337
08/30/2018
Appeal - Clerks Receipt of Transmittal of Appeal (BKA12)
338
08/31/2018
Appeal - Clerks Certificate of Readiness to the BAP or USDC (BKA11)
08/31/2018
Document Served Conventionally (Notes Service Through the Mail) (Text entry; no document attached.)
342
10/04/2018
Order (Generic) (SA)
343
10/06/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
344
10/11/2018
Appeal - Clerks Receipt of Transmittal of Appeal (BKA12)
345
10/12/2018
Appeal - Clerks Receipt of Transmittal of Appeal (BKA12)
346
10/17/2018
Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)
10/17/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
347
10/17/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
348
10/17/2018
Certificate of Service
349
10/17/2018
Order (Generic) (SA)
350
10/18/2018
Appeal - Clerks Certificate of Readiness to the BAP or USDC (BKA11)
10/18/2018
Document Served Conventionally (Notes Service Through the Mail) (Text entry; no document attached.)
351
10/18/2018
Entry of Appearance
352
10/19/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
353
10/22/2018
Appeal - Order From Appellate Court Re: Disposition of Appeal
354
10/22/2018
Appeal - Order From Appellate Court Re: Disposition of Appeal
355
10/26/2018
Appeal - Order From Appellate Court Re: Disposition of Appeal
356
10/30/2018
Certification of No Transcript Ordered
357
10/31/2018
Appeal - Clerks Certificate of Readiness to the BAP or USDC (BKA11)
10/31/2018
Document Served Conventionally (Notes Service Through the Mail) (Text entry; no document attached.)
358
11/01/2018
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
11/02/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
359
11/02/2018
Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)
360
11/06/2018
Hearing
11/29/2018
QC Remark (generic) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/29/2018
QC Remark (generic) (Text entry; no document attached.)
361
11/29/2018
Proceeding Memo
362
12/04/2018
Relief from Stay
363
12/06/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
364
12/14/2018
Audio File (Active Event)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.