Marilyn Kay Holm
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00282 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
08/30/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
08/30/2018
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
08/30/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
08/30/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
4
08/30/2018
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
08/30/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/30/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/30/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/30/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/30/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/30/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/31/2018
Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event) (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
09/01/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
9
09/01/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
10
09/01/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
10/07/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
10/08/2018
Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum)
14
10/08/2018
Change of Address
15
10/09/2018
Amended Voluntary Petition
10/09/2018
Update Debtor Information (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/09/2018
Notice of Asset Determination (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
11/09/2018
Notice to File Proof of Claim (BNC Notice)
17
11/11/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice to File Proof of Claim
11/28/2018
Notice of Asset Determination (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
11/29/2018
Request for Notice by Creditor
19
12/03/2018
Employ (CM41)
20
12/03/2018
Declaration
21
12/06/2018
Employ
22
12/06/2018
Notice of Deferral of Discharge (Reaffs Not Filed) (BNC Notice)
23
12/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
24
12/26/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
25
12/28/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
26
02/08/2019
Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum and 206Sum)
02/08/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
27
02/08/2019
Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum and 206Sum)
28
02/20/2019
Approve Settlement / Compromise Under Rule 9019 (Re Estate - By Trustee or DIP Only) (CM36)
29
02/20/2019
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
30
03/14/2019
Certificate of No Objection
03/15/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.