Mario C. Corcino and Marcela C. Corcino
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2017-bk-00274 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
34
06/18/2018
Employ (CM41)
35
06/18/2018
Declaration
36
06/21/2018
Employ
37
07/02/2018
Sell Property (Sec 363(b) - NOT Free & Clear) (CM22)
38
07/02/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
39
07/02/2018
Certificate of Service
40
07/24/2018
Certificate of No Objection
07/25/2018
QC Remark Re: Incorrect Image (Text entry; no document attached.)
41
07/26/2018
Corrective Entry (File Correct Image ONLY - No Changes to Document)
42
07/27/2018
Sell Property (Under Sec 363(b))
08/03/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
43
08/08/2018
Objection to Claim (CM44-COAwith)
44
08/14/2018
Withdrawal of Claim
45
08/14/2018
Withdrawal of Claim
46
08/15/2018
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
08/15/2018
Calendar Remark (Objection Withdrawn) (Text entry; no document attached.)
47
08/20/2018
Compensation / Professional Fees
48
08/20/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
49
08/21/2018
Certificate of Service
50
09/11/2018
Certificate of No Objection
09/11/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
51
09/18/2018
Compensation
09/18/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
52
10/19/2018
Trustees Final Report (TFR)
53
11/02/2018
Notice of Trustees Final Report and Application for Compensation (NFR) (CM43-COAwith)
54
11/02/2018
Certificate of Service
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.