Marion Louise Irwin
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

2:2017-bk-10187 (azb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 150 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
08/29/2017
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Individuals, Schedules and Statements (except for those listed below). Failure to timely upload the list of creditors, may result in dismissal of the case without further notice. Electronic Filing Declaration due 09/19/2017, filed by FAY W. BIDLACK of JENNINGS, STROUSS & SALMON, PLC on behalf of Marion Louise Irwin
08/29/2017
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(2:17-bk-10187) [other,volp7] (335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 28790850. Fee amount 335.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
2
08/29/2017
Meeting of Creditors scheduled for 10/03/2017 at 11:00 AM at US Trustee Meeting Room, 230 N. First Avenue, Suite 102, Phoenix, AZ (341-PHX). Complaints objecting to discharge due by 12/04/2017.
3
08/30/2017
Master Mailing List due by 9/5/2017, Schedules/Statements due by 9/12/2017, Chapter 7 Statement of Current Monthly Income Due by 9/12/2017, Payment Advices Declaration Required by 11 USC Section 521(a)(1)(B)(iv) due by 9/12/2017
4
08/30/2017
Deficiency Notice to Debtor and Attorney for Debtor That All Required Documents Were Not Filed.
5
08/30/2017
Master Mailing List filed by FAY W. BIDLACK of JENNINGS, STROUSS & SALMON, PLC on behalf of Marion Louise Irwin.
6
08/30/2017
Schedules and Statements for Individuals Marion Irwin filed by FAY W. BIDLACK of JENNINGS, STROUSS & SALMON, PLC on behalf of Marion Louise Irwin. Electronic Filing Declaration due by 09/6/2017
7
08/30/2017
Initial Statement of Financial Affairs for Individuals filed by FAY W. BIDLACK of JENNINGS, STROUSS & SALMON, PLC on behalf of Marion Louise Irwin. Electronic Filing Declaration due by 09/6/2017
8
08/30/2017
Initial Individual Debtor's Statement of Intention filed by FAY W. BIDLACK of JENNINGS, STROUSS & SALMON, PLC on behalf of Marion Louise Irwin.
9
08/30/2017
Initial Chapter 7 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income Form 122A-1 and Statement of Exemption from Presumption of Abuse Form 122A-1Supp The Debtor has Primarily Non-Consumer Debts. filed by FAY W. BIDLACK of JENNINGS, STROUSS & SALMON, PLC on behalf of Marion Louise Irwin.
10
08/30/2017
Initial Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments filed by FAY W. BIDLACK of JENNINGS, STROUSS & SALMON, PLC on behalf of Marion Louise Irwin.
11
08/30/2017
Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments filed by FAY W. BIDLACK of JENNINGS, STROUSS & SALMON, PLC on behalf of Marion Louise Irwin. Modified text on 10/20/2017
12
08/30/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 4 Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form))
13
09/04/2017
Request for Notice filed by VALERIE LASHALLE SMITH of PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC on behalf of PRA Receivables Management, LLC.
14
09/06/2017
ORDER Dismissing Case Debtor (related document(s) 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)).
15
09/06/2017
ORDER Reinstating Case Debtor signed on 9/6/2017.
16
09/05/2017
Statement of Social Security Number Submitted (related document(s) 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7))
17
09/06/2017
ENTERED IN ERROR - Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint--Notice of Meeting of Creditors (related document(s) 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)) Modified on 9/6/2017
18
09/06/2017
Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint--Notice of Meeting of Creditors
19
09/05/2017
Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing
20
09/06/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Meeting of Creditors (related document(s) 18 BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint)
09/07/2017
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for debtor Marion Louise Irwin Case Number 01-92739, Chapter 7 filed in California Eastern Bankruptcy Court on 07/06/2001, Standard Discharge on 10/11/2001.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
21
09/28/2017
Amendment to Schedules (D,E/F/31.00 Fee) Amended Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Secured Claims filed by FAY W. BIDLACK of JENNINGS, STROUSS & SALMON, PLC on behalf of Marion Louise Irwin. (related document(s) 6 Schedules and Statements)
09/28/2017
Receipt of Amendment to Schedules (D,E/F/31.00 Fee)(2:17-bk-10187-EPB) [other,1229] (31.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 28909421. Fee amount 31.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
22
10/09/2017
Amended Individual Debtor's Statement of Intention filed by FAY W. BIDLACK of JENNINGS, STROUSS & SALMON, PLC on behalf of Marion Louise Irwin.
23
10/10/2017
Continuance of Meeting of Creditors on 11/6/2017 at 12:00 PM at US Trustee Meeting Room, 230 N. First Avenue, Suite 102, Phoenix, AZ (341-PHX).
24
10/20/2017
Disclosure of Compensation by Attorney FRBP 2016 to correct erroneously-filed document at Dkt. #11 filed by FAY W. BIDLACK of JENNINGS, STROUSS & SALMON, PLC on behalf of Marion Louise Irwin.
25
10/24/2017
Request for Notice filed by LARRY 1 BUTLER of BECKET & LEE LLP on behalf of FC Marketplace, LLC.
26
11/02/2017
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice filed by LEONARD J. MCDONALD JR. of TIFFANY & BOSCO, P.A. on behalf of Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, as Trustee for Residential Accredit Loans, Inc., Mortgage Asset-Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-QH7.
27
11/06/2017
Amendment to Schedules (D,E/F/31.00 Fee) Amended Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims filed by FAY W. BIDLACK of JENNINGS, STROUSS & SALMON, PLC on behalf of Marion Louise Irwin. (related document(s) 21 Amendment to Schedules (D,E/F/31.00 Fee))
11/06/2017
Receipt of Amendment to Schedules (D,E/F/31.00 Fee)(2:17-bk-10187-EPB) [other,1229] (31.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 29061716. Fee amount 31.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
28
11/09/2017
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution: I, LOTHAR GOERNITZ, having been appointed trustee of the estate of the above-named debtor(s), report that I have neither received any property nor paid any money on account of this estate; that I have made a diligent inquiry into the financial affairs of the debtor(s) and the location of the property belonging to the estate; and that there is no property available for distribution from the estate over and above that exempted by law. Pursuant to Fed R Bank P 5009, I hereby certify that the estate of the above-named debtor(s) has been fully administered. I request that I be discharged from any further duties as trustee. Key information about this case as reported in schedules filed by the debtor(s) or otherwise found in the case record: This case was pending for 2 months. Assets Abandoned (without deducting any secured claims): $725748.71, Assets Exempt: Not Available, Claims Scheduled: $4144935.35, Claims Asserted: Not Applicable, Claims scheduled to be discharged without payment (without deducting the value of collateral or debts excepted from discharge): $4144935.35. Debtor appeared.
29
12/07/2017
Motion for Relief from Stay (181.00 fee) filed by LEONARD J. MCDONALD JR. of TIFFANY & BOSCO, P.A. on behalf of Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, as Trustee for Residential Accredit Loans, Inc., Mortgage Asset-Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-QH7.
1
Exhibit (A) Note #
2
Exhibit (B) Deed of Trust #
3
Exhibit (C) Assignment #
4
Exhibit (D) Loan Modification
4 Attachments
30
12/08/2017
Notice Regarding Required Personal Financial Management Course (admin)
31
12/08/2017
Financial Management Course Certificate filed by FAY W. BIDLACK of JENNINGS, STROUSS & SALMON, PLC on behalf of Marion Louise Irwin.
32
12/08/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 30 Notice Regarding Required Personal Financial Management Course)
12/11/2017
Receipt of Motion for Relief from Stay (181.00 fee)(2:17-bk-10187-EPB) [motion,185] (181.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 29195802. Fee amount 181.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
33
12/13/2017
Amendment to Schedules (A/B,C,G,H,I,J) Amendment to Schedule A/B: Property and Schedule C: Property Claimed as Exempt filed by FAY W. BIDLACK of JENNINGS, STROUSS & SALMON, PLC on behalf of Marion Louise Irwin.
34
12/21/2017
Limited Objection to Motion/Application Limited Objection to Stay Relief Motion (related to motions(s)29) filed by FAY W. BIDLACK of JENNINGS, STROUSS & SALMON, PLC on behalf of Marion Louise Irwin.
35
12/28/2017
Amended Motion for Relief from Stay filed by LEONARD J. MCDONALD JR. of TIFFANY & BOSCO, P.A. on behalf of Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, as Trustee for Residential Accredit Loans, Inc., Mortgage Asset-Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-QH7 (related document(s) 29 Motion for Relief from Stay (181.00 fee)).
1
Exhibit (A) Note #
2
Exhibit (B) Deed of Trust #
3
Exhibit (C) Assignment #
4
Exhibit (D) Loan Modification
4 Attachments
36
12/28/2017
Notice of Motion for Relief from Stay filed by LEONARD J. MCDONALD JR. of TIFFANY & BOSCO, P.A. on behalf of Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, as Trustee for Residential Accredit Loans, Inc., Mortgage Asset-Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-QH7 (related document(s) 35 Amended Motion for Relief from Stay).
37
01/17/2018
Chapter 7 Discharge, Debtor
38
01/17/2018
Certificate of Service and No Objections filed by LEONARD J. MCDONALD JR. of TIFFANY & BOSCO, P.A. on behalf of Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, as Trustee for Residential Accredit Loans, Inc., Mortgage Asset-Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-QH7. (related document(s) 35 Amended Motion for Relief from Stay)
39
01/17/2018
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order filed by LEONARD J. MCDONALD JR. of TIFFANY & BOSCO, P.A. on behalf of Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, as Trustee for Residential Accredit Loans, Inc., Mortgage Asset-Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-QH7 (related document(s) 35 Amended Motion for Relief from Stay).
40
01/17/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Discharge of Debtor (related document(s) 37 BNC Form Request--Chapter 7 Discharge)
41
01/26/2018
ORDER Granting Amended Motion for Relief from Stay (Related Doc # 35) signed on 1/26/2018.
42
01/29/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 41 Order on Amended Motion for Relief from Stay)
43
01/29/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document (related document(s) 41 Order on Amended Motion for Relief from Stay)
44
02/20/2018
The estate having been fully administered, further administration of the reopened case having been completed, or the case reopened for the filing of further proceedings which either have been filed and no further court action is required or were not filed within 90 days of the reopening; IT IS ORDERED that the case is closed and if a trustee has been appointed, the trustee is discharged from and relieved of his trust. Jurisdiction is retained over any pending adversary(s). Judge Eddward P. Ballinger Jr.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.