Mark A Koeneman
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2013-bk-00138 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
155
07/31/2018
Notice of Change of Address for Creditor
07/31/2018
Update Matrix (Text entry; no document attached.)
156
08/01/2018
Notice of Final Cure Mortgage Payment - 3002.1(f)
157
08/01/2018
Notice of Final Cure Mortgage Payment - 3002.1(f)
158
08/16/2018
Response to Notice of Final Cure Payment Rule 3002.1 (g)
159
08/20/2018
Response to Notice of Final Cure Payment Rule 3002.1 (g)
160
08/30/2018
Objection to Claim (CM44-COAwith)
161
09/26/2018
Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)
162
09/28/2018
Objection to Claim (CM44-COAwith)
163
10/03/2018
Proceeding Memo
164
10/10/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
165
10/30/2018
Response to Notice of Final Cure Payment Rule 3002.1 (g)
166
11/01/2018
Proceeding Memo
167
11/02/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
168
12/13/2018
Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account
169
12/13/2018
Notice of Intent to Enter Chapter 13 Discharge
170
01/11/2019
Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (Form 410S1)
171
01/17/2019
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
172
01/19/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
01/22/2019
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.