Mark David Reeder and Angela Yvonne Reeder
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2017-bk-02649 (alnb)

Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments. (Ch13troffice, cs)

UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA SOUTHERN DIVISION IN RE: CASE NO: 17-02649-DSC13 MARK DAVID REEDER ANGELA YVONNE REEDER Debtors. TRUSTEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS COMES NOW Bradford W. Caraway, Chapter 13 Standing Trustee, and moves this Honorable Court to dismiss the Debtors' case. As grounds therefore, the Trustee shows the following: 1. The Trustee files this motion pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 1307(c). 2. There has been a material default by the Debtors with respect to a term of the confirmed plan. 3. The Debtors are not making plan payments as required by the Confirmation Order. WHEREFORE, the Trustee moves this Honorable Court to dismiss this case. The Trustee requests such other relief as the Court deems appropriate. /s/ Bradford W. Caraway Bradford W. Caraway Chapter 13 Standing Trustee P.O. Box 10848 Birmingham, AL 35202 (205) 323-4631 Certificate of Service I hereby certify that a correct copy of the foregoing motion has been forwarded by email or U.S. mail, to the following on this the 20th day of July, 2018: MARK DAVID and ANGELA YVONNE REEDER BOND, BOTES, REESE & SHINN, P.C. /s/ Bradford W. Caraway TRUSTEE MARK DAVID and ANGELA YVONNE REEDER 6191 FARRIS ROAD DORA, AL 35062 Case 17-02649-DSC13 Doc 37 Filed 07/20/18 Entered 07/20/18 15:01:49 Desc Page 1 of 1

Notice of Hearing on Trustee's Motion to Dismiss (RE: related document(s)[37] Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments). Hearing scheduled 8/21/2018 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.

Van−022 [Notice of Hearing on Trustee's Motion to Dismiss] (Rev. 09/17) UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA, SOUTHERN DIVISION In re: Case No. 17−02649−DSC13 Mark David Reeder Chapter 13 SSN: xxx−xx−9032 Angela Yvonne Reeder SSN: xxx−xx−1703 Debtor(s) NOTICE OF HEARING ON TRUSTEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS Notice is hereby given that a Trustee's Motion to Dismiss has been filed in this case. An evidentiary hearing will be held on 8/21/18 at 10:30 AM in Robert S. Vance Federal Bldg, 1800 5th Ave No, Courtroom 1, Birmingham, AL 35203 to consider and act upon the motion and any response. Notice is further given that if the Debtor or the Debtor's attorney fails to appear at this hearing, the trustee's motion may be granted without further notice. If the attorney for the Debtor fails to appear at this hearing, the Court may impose monetary sanctions or other appropriate sanctions; reduce the award of attorney's fees in the case; and/or require the attorney to disgorge a portion of the fees awarded and paid in the case. If the motion is not granted, the Court may order that: A. (1) if a deduction order is entered in this case and (2) a payment is not received by the Trustee within 60 days from the date of the hearing and (3) unless scheduled payments are received timely by the Trustee for 12 months from the date of the hearing, the Trustee may notify the Court of the continuing default and the case may be dismissed without further notice; or B. (1) if no deduction order is entered in this case and (2) a payment is not received by the Trustee within 30 days from the date of the hearing and (3) unless scheduled payments are received timely by the Trustee for 12 months from the date of the hearing, the Trustee may notify the Court of the continuing default and the case may be dismissed without further notice. Consent forms must be filed no later than 10:00 p.m. on the day preceeding the scheduled hearing day. If a consent form is not fully completed or is not timely filed, it will not be considered and attendance is required by the Debtor, the Debtor's Attorney and the Chapter 13 Trustee. DEBTORS AND THEIR ATTORNEYS SHOULD DRESS APPROPRIATELY TO APPEAR IN THE FEDERAL BANKRUPTCY COURT. Dated: July 23, 2018 By: Joseph E. Bulgarella, Clerk United States Bankruptcy Court dls Case 17-02649-DSC13 Doc 38 Filed 07/23/18 Entered 07/23/18 11:24:32 Desc Ntc of Hrg on Trt Motion to Di Page 1 of 1

BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)[38] Hearing on Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Notice Date 07/25/2018.

United States Bankruptcy Court Northern District of Alabama In re: Case No. 17-02649-DSC Mark David Reeder Chapter 13 Angela Yvonne Reeder Debtors CERTIFICATE OF NOTICE District/off: 1126-2 User: lstubblef Page 1 of 2 Date Rcvd: Jul 23, 2018 Form ID: van022 Total Noticed: 31 Notice by first class mail was sent to the following persons/entities by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center on Jul 25, 2018. db/jdb +Mark David Reeder, Angela Yvonne Reeder, 6191 Farris Road, Dora, AL 35062-2513 cr FIRST INVESTORS SERVICING CORP., C/O CHAMBLESS MATH & CARR, PC, PO BOX 230759, MONTGOMERY, AL 36123-0759 cr +Suntrust Mortgage, Inc, Bankruptcy Department RVW 3034, PO Box 27767, Richmond, VA 23261-7767 cr +Suntrust Mortgage, Inc, Bankruptcy Department RVW 3034, PO Box 27767, Richmond, VA 23261-7767 9486315 ADF of Alabama, LLC, Applied Data Finance, LLC, 15373 Innovation Drive, Suite 250, Attn: General Counsel, San Diego, CA 92128-3428 9403251 +CAPITAL ONE, PO BOX 60500, CITY OF INDUSTRY CA 91716-0500 9403253 +CHECK N GO, 1109 FORESTDALE BOULEVARD, BIRMINGHAM AL 35214-3833 9403255 +CHECK N GO, % AXCESS FINANCIAL, 7755 MONTGOMERY ROAD, CINCINNATI OH 45236-4197 9403254 +CHECK N GO, % ALLIANT CAPITAL MGMT, 3840 E ROBINSON ROAD, #202, BUFFALO NY 14228-2001 9403256 +CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL, 1600 7TH AVENUE SOUTH, BIRMINGHAM AL 35233-1785 9403257 +CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL, % MEDICAL REVENUE SVCS, PO BOX 1149, SEBRING FL 33871-1149 9403261 +ISLAND MED TROY AL LLC PEGAS, % AMERIFINANCIAL SOLUTIONS. LL, PO BOX 65018, BALTIMORE MD 21264-5018 9403262 +LIBERTY FINANCE, 1635 PEDIATRIC DRIVE, #400, JASPER AL 35501-4067 9446221 +NCB Management Services, Inc., One Allied Drive, Trevose, PA 19053-6945 9403263 +PERSONIFY, 15373 INNOVATION DRIVE, SAN DIEGO CA 92128-3415 9403265 +RISE CREDIT, % NCB, ONE ALLIED DR, TREVOSE PA 19053-6945 9403266 +SUNTRUST MORTGAGE, PO BOX 27767, RICHMOND VA 23261-7767 9403267 +SUNTRUST MORTGAGE, PO BOX 85092 MC VA-WMRK-7952, RICHMOND VA 23285-5092 9452255 SunTrust Mortgage, Inc., Bankruptcy Department RVW 3034, PO Box 27767 Richmond, VA 23261 9453937 +Tower Loan of jasper, P.O. Box 888, Jasper, AL 35502-0888 Notice by electronic transmission was sent to the following persons/entities by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center. 9403250 +Fax: 864-336-7400 Jul 24 2018 03:05:04 ADVANCE AMERICA, 957 HIGHWAY 78 #200, DORA AL 35062-4328 9411131 +Fax: 864-336-7400 Jul 24 2018 03:05:04 Advance America, Cash Advance Centers of AL, LLC, 135 N. Church Street, Spartanburg, SC 29306-5138 9403252 E-mail/Text: bankruptcy@thecheckdepot.com Jul 24 2018 02:50:35 CHECK DEPOT, 917 FORESTDALE BLVD, BIRMINGHAM AL 35214 9403258 +E-mail/Text: defaultspecialty.us@bbva.com Jul 24 2018 02:48:25 COMPASS BANK, 95 HULL ROAD, SUMITON AL 35148-4331 9403259 +E-mail/PDF: creditonebknotifications@resurgent.com Jul 24 2018 02:40:31 CREDIT ONE BANK NA, PO BOX 98873, LAS VEGAS NV 89193-8873 9407889 +E-mail/Text: bankruptcy@thecheckdepot.com Jul 24 2018 02:50:35 Check Depot, 211 Summit Pkwy. #116, Birmingham, AL 35209-4742 9403260 +E-mail/Text: bankruptcynotices@fifsg.com Jul 24 2018 02:47:59 FIRST INVESTORS, 380 INTERSTATE NORTH PARKWAY, SUITE 300, ATLANTA GA 30339-2222 9431308 +E-mail/Text: bankruptcynotices@fifsg.com Jul 24 2018 02:47:59 First Investors Servicing Corporation, 380 Interstate North Parkway Suite# 300, Atlanta, GA 30339-2222 9481117 E-mail/PDF: resurgentbknotifications@resurgent.com Jul 24 2018 02:41:45 LVNV Funding, LLC its successors and assigns as, assignee of FNBM, LLC, Resurgent Capital Services, PO Box 10587, Greenville, SC 29603-0587 9404769 +E-mail/PDF: PRA_BK2_CASE_UPDATE@portfoliorecovery.com Jul 24 2018 02:41:26 PRA Receivables Management, LLC, PO Box 41021, Norfolk, VA 23541-1021 9403264 +E-mail/Text: elevate@ebn.phinsolutions.com Jul 24 2018 02:51:06 RISE, PO BOX 101808, FORT WORTH TX 76185-1808 TOTAL: 11 ***** BYPASSED RECIPIENTS (undeliverable, * duplicate) ***** cr* +PRA Receivables Management, LLC, PO Box 41021, Norfolk, VA 23541-1021 TOTALS: 0, * 1, ## 0 Addresses marked '+' were corrected by inserting the ZIP or replacing an incorrect ZIP. USPS regulations require that automation-compatible mail display the correct ZIP. Transmission times for electronic delivery are Eastern Time zone. I, Joseph Speetjens, declare under the penalty of perjury that I have sent the attached document to the above listed entities in the manner shown, and prepared the Certificate of Notice and that it is true and correct to the best of my information and belief. Meeting of Creditor Notices only (Official Form 309): Pursuant to Fed. R. Bank. P. 2002(a)(1), a notice containing the complete Social Security Number (SSN) of the debtor(s) was furnished to all parties listed. This official court copy contains the redacted SSN as required by the bankruptcy rules and the Judiciary's privacy policies. Date: Jul 25, 2018 Signature: /s/Joseph Speetjens Case 17-02649-DSC13 Doc 39 Filed 07/25/18 Entered 07/26/18 00:13:04 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 1 of 3 District/off: 1126-2 User: lstubblef Page 2 of 2 Date Rcvd: Jul 23, 2018 Form ID: van022 Total Noticed: 31 _ CM/ECF NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC FILING The following persons/entities were sent notice through the court's CM/ECF electronic mail (Email) system on July 23, 2018 at the address(es) listed below: Bradford W. Caraway ctmail@ch13bham.com, bhamch13@ecf.epiqsystems.com Karen A Maxcy on behalf of Creditor Suntrust Mortgage, Inc Karen.maxcy@mrpllc.com, BankruptcyECFMail@mrpllc.com Leonard N Math on behalf of Creditor FIRST INVESTORS SERVICING CORP. noticesnd@chambless-math.com Robert D. Reese on behalf of Joint Debtor Angela Yvonne Reeder pn.igotnotices@gmail.com;bbrs.sort@gmail.com;bbrs.igotnotices@gmail.com;bbrs.sort2@gmail.com;aw.i gotnotices@gmail.com;bbrssort4@gmail.com;R62238@notify.bestcase.com;9382390420@filings.docketbird .com Robert D. Reese on behalf of Debtor Mark David Reeder pn.igotnotices@gmail.com;bbrs.sort@gmail.com;bbrs.igotnotices@gmail.com;bbrs.sort2@gmail.com;aw.i gotnotices@gmail.com;bbrssort4@gmail.com;R62238@notify.bestcase.com;9382390420@filings.docketbird .com TOTAL: 5 Case 17-02649-DSC13 Doc 39 Filed 07/25/18 Entered 07/26/18 00:13:04 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 2 of 3 Van−022 [Notice of Hearing on Trustee's Motion to Dismiss] (Rev. 09/17) UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA, SOUTHERN DIVISION In re: Case No. 17−02649−DSC13 Mark David Reeder Chapter 13 SSN: xxx−xx−9032 Angela Yvonne Reeder SSN: xxx−xx−1703 Debtor(s) NOTICE OF HEARING ON TRUSTEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS Notice is hereby given that a Trustee's Motion to Dismiss has been filed in this case. An evidentiary hearing will be held on 8/21/18 at 10:30 AM in Robert S. Vance Federal Bldg, 1800 5th Ave No, Courtroom 1, Birmingham, AL 35203 to consider and act upon the motion and any response. Notice is further given that if the Debtor or the Debtor's attorney fails to appear at this hearing, the trustee's motion may be granted without further notice. If the attorney for the Debtor fails to appear at this hearing, the Court may impose monetary sanctions or other appropriate sanctions; reduce the award of attorney's fees in the case; and/or require the attorney to disgorge a portion of the fees awarded and paid in the case. If the motion is not granted, the Court may order that: A. (1) if a deduction order is entered in this case and (2) a payment is not received by the Trustee within 60 days from the date of the hearing and (3) unless scheduled payments are received timely by the Trustee for 12 months from the date of the hearing, the Trustee may notify the Court of the continuing default and the case may be dismissed without further notice; or B. (1) if no deduction order is entered in this case and (2) a payment is not received by the Trustee within 30 days from the date of the hearing and (3) unless scheduled payments are received timely by the Trustee for 12 months from the date of the hearing, the Trustee may notify the Court of the continuing default and the case may be dismissed without further notice. Consent forms must be filed no later than 10:00 p.m. on the day preceeding the scheduled hearing day. If a consent form is not fully completed or is not timely filed, it will not be considered and attendance is required by the Debtor, the Debtor's Attorney and the Chapter 13 Trustee. DEBTORS AND THEIR ATTORNEYS SHOULD DRESS APPROPRIATELY TO APPEAR IN THE FEDERAL BANKRUPTCY COURT. Dated: July 23, 2018 By: Joseph E. Bulgarella, Clerk United States Bankruptcy Court dls Case 17-02649-DSC13 Doc 39 Filed 07/25/18 Entered 07/26/18 00:13:04 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 3 of 3

Consent to Action at Hearing on Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Filed by Joint Debtor Angela Yvonne Reeder, Debtor Mark David Reeder (RE: related document(s)[37] Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments). (Shinn, J.)

UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA SOUTHERN DIVISION IN RE: Mark David Reeder Angela Yvonne Reeder Case Number: 17 - 02649 - DSC AA Debtor. CONSENT TO ACTION AT HEARING ON TRUSTEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS Comes now the Debtor and hereby consents to the following action being taken in the hearing on the Trustee's Motion to Dismiss: 1 The case may be dismissed. The case shall be converted to one under chapter 7 at the Debtor's request. The Debtor shall resume his / her regular payments to the Trustee. The Debtor consents that the Trustee's Motion to Dismiss will be conditionally DENIED pending compliance by the Debtor with these conditions: (1) the Debtor shall cause a full plan payment to be received in the Trustee's office before 4: 00 p. m ., 30 days from the date of the hearing on the Trustee's Motion to Dismiss; and, (2) the Debtor shall cause all plan payments due during the next 12 months to be received in the full amounts due in the Trustee's office before 4: 00 p. m. on the dates due. The Debtor further consents that if he / she fails to satisfy these conditions, the Trustee may file a Notice of Continuing Default with the Court, with copies to the Debtor and Debtor's attorney, after which the Court may grant the Trustee's Motion to Dismiss and may dismiss this case without further notice or hearing. o The Trustee shall issue a payroll deduction order to the employer of the Debtor, (name of Debtor) at: (employer's name) (employer's address) (employer's telephone number) The Debtor understands that he / she shall make direct payments to the Trustee until the employer begins the deductions. O The Debtor consents to increase Chapter 13 plan payments to _ DATE: 7 - 30 - 18 CONSENTED BY: Q ard Pledas A Daryo inaela Koedera CHAPTER 13 TRUSTEE DEBTOR * o ATTORNEY FOR DEBTOR (S) * This form must be signed by the Debtor. Case 17 - 02649 - DSC13 Doc 40 Filed 08 / 06 / 18 Entered 08 / 06 / 18 14: 41: 48 Document Page 1 of 1 Desc Main

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 94 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
06/21/2017
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Fee Amount $310 Filed by Mark David Reeder, Angela Yvonne Reeder
2
06/21/2017
Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Joint Debtor Angela Yvonne Reeder, Debtor Mark David Reeder.
4
06/21/2017
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor and Joint Debtor Filed Filed by Joint Debtor Angela Yvonne Reeder, Debtor Mark David Reeder.
5
06/21/2017
Employee Income Records Filed by Joint Debtor Angela Yvonne Reeder, Debtor Mark David Reeder.
06/21/2017
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(17-02649-13) [misc,volp13] (310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 20836748. Fee Amount 310.00 (re:Doc# 1) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
06/21/2017
Tax Documents for the Year for 2016 Filed by Joint Debtor Angela Yvonne Reeder, Debtor Mark David Reeder.
7
06/21/2017
Appraisal Filed by Joint Debtor Angela Yvonne Reeder, Debtor Mark David Reeder.
8
06/21/2017
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 07/19/2017 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 08/15/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 10/17/2017. Government Proof of Claim due by 12/18/2017 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 09/18/2017.
9
06/22/2017
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
06/22/2017
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for joint debtors Mark David Reeder and Angela Yvonne Reeder Case Number 04-02110, Chapter 7 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 03/08/2004; Case Number 15-04757, Chapter 7 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 11/24/2015, Standard Discharge on 02/22/2016; Case Number 04-02110, Chapter 7 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 03/08/2004, Standard Discharge on 06/22/2004.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10
06/22/2017
Notes: No Discharge flag set pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 1328(f). Debtor received a chapter 7 discharge on 2/22/2016 in case number 15-04757-TOM filed on 11/24/2015.
11
06/22/2017
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor PRA Receivables Management, LLC.
12
06/23/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 8 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 06/23/2017.
13
06/24/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Joint Debtor Angela Yvonne Reeder, Debtor Mark David Reeder). Notice Date 06/24/2017.
14
06/24/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 9 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 06/24/2017.
15
07/20/2017
Meeting of Creditors Held 07/19/2017. (Ch13troffice, sc)
16
08/14/2017
Courtroom Notes Continuing/Rescheduling (Confirmation Hearing) Hearing scheduled 08/15/2017 at 10:59 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
17
08/16/2017
Bench Sheet from Confirmation Hearing
18
08/25/2017
Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan Signed on 8/25/2017 (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Joint Debtor Angela Yvonne Reeder, Debtor Mark David Reeder).
19
08/27/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 18 Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan). Notice Date 08/27/2017.
20
11/30/2017
Motion for Relief from Stay and Certificate of Service (6191 Farris Road), Fee Amount $181, Filed by Creditor Suntrust Mortgage, Inc
1
Affidavit #
2
Declaration #
3
Exhibits
3 Attachments
21
11/30/2017
Fact Summary for a Motion for Relief from Stay Filed by Creditor Suntrust Mortgage, Inc (RE: related document(s) 20 Motion for Relief from Stay and Certificate of Service (6191 Farris Road), Fee Amount $181,).
11/30/2017
Receipt of Motion for Relief from Stay(17-02649-DSC13) [motion,mrlfsty] (181.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21450242. Fee Amount 181.00 (re:Doc# 20) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
22
11/30/2017
Notice of Final Hearing on Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Karen Maxcy, Attorney for Suntrust Mortgage, Inc. (RE: related document(s) 20 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor Suntrust Mortgage, Inc). Hearing scheduled 12/19/2017 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
24
12/02/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 22 Hearing (Motion for Relief) Set). Notice Date 12/02/2017.
25
12/18/2017
Courtroom Deputy Notes (By agreement of the parties, this matter is settled and Mrs. Maxcy shall submit a proposed order.) RE: Doc #20; Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Karen Maxcy, Attorney for Suntrust Mortgage, Inc.
26
01/02/2018
Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $181, Filed by Creditor FIRST INVESTORS SERVICING CORP.
1
Affidavit #
2
Exhibit
2 Attachments
27
01/02/2018
Fact Summary for a Motion for Relief from Stay Filed by Creditor FIRST INVESTORS SERVICING CORP. (RE: related document(s) 26 Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $181,).
01/02/2018
Receipt of Motion for Relief from Stay(17-02649-DSC13) [motion,mrlfsty] (181.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21560075. Fee Amount 181.00 (re:Doc# 26) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
28
01/03/2018
Notice of Final Hearing on Motion for Relief from Stay filed by First Investors Servicing Corp. (RE: related document(s) 26 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor FIRST INVESTORS SERVICING CORP.). Hearing scheduled 1/30/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
30
01/05/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 28 Hearing (Motion for Relief) Set). Notice Date 01/05/2018.
31
01/29/2018
Courtroom Deputy Notes (By agreement of the parties, this matter is settled and Mrs. Luders shall submit a proposed order.) RE: Doc #26; Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Leonard Math, Attorney for First Investors Servicing Corp.
32
02/09/2018
Order Conditionally Denying Motion For Relief From Stay (Related Doc # 20) Signed on 2/9/2018.
33
02/11/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 32 Order on Motion For Relief From Stay). Notice Date 02/11/2018.
34
02/28/2018
Consent Order Conditionally Denying Motion For Relief From Stay (Related Doc # 26) Signed on 2/28/2018.
35
03/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 34 Order on Motion For Relief From Stay). Notice Date 03/02/2018.
36
03/09/2018
Notice of Withdrawal of Document Filed by Creditor Suntrust Mortgage, Inc (RE: related document(s)doc Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges).
37
07/20/2018
Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments. (Ch13troffice, cs)
38
07/23/2018
Notice of Hearing on Trustee's Motion to Dismiss (RE: related document(s)[37] Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments). Hearing scheduled 8/21/2018 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
39
07/25/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)[38] Hearing on Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Notice Date 07/25/2018.
40
08/06/2018
Consent to Action at Hearing on Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Filed by Joint Debtor Angela Yvonne Reeder, Debtor Mark David Reeder (RE: related document(s)[37] Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments). (Shinn, J.)
41
08/07/2018
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s)[40] Consent to Action at Hearing on Trustee's Motion to Dismiss filed by Joint Debtor Angela Yvonne Reeder, Debtor Mark David Reeder). Hearing scheduled 8/21/2018 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.