Mark Paul Placek
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00421 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
12/11/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
12/11/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
2
12/11/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
12/11/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/11/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/11/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/12/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/12/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/12/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/12/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
12/12/2018
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (With Db Atty) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
7
12/13/2018
Entry of Appearance
8
12/14/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
9
12/14/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
10
12/14/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing
11
12/14/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
12
12/14/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
13
12/14/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
14
12/20/2018
Entry of Appearance
12/31/2018
OSC Referral (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
01/03/2019
Order (Generic) (SA)
01/03/2019
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/03/2019
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
01/04/2019
Notice of Hearing on UST Standing Mtn to Dismiss (CM14-COAwith)
01/07/2019
OSC Referral (Text entry; no document attached.)
17
01/07/2019
Verification of Creditor Mailing Matrix
01/09/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/11/2019
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/14/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
01/17/2019
Show Cause (with hrg) (SA)
19
01/24/2019
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor
20
01/24/2019
Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)
21
02/01/2019
Proceeding Memo
02/01/2019
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
22
02/01/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
02/05/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
23
02/06/2019
Order (Generic) (SA)
24
02/06/2019
Dismissing Case (SA)
02/15/2019
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
25
02/21/2019
Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account
26
02/22/2019
Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice (BNC Notice)
27
02/24/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Dismissal
02/25/2019
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.