Marshall S Davis and Kimberly H Davis
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

8:2018-bk-80376 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/21/2018
Objection to Claim
doc
05/21/2018
Objection to Claim
doc
05/21/2018
Objection to Claim
1
02/08/2018
Chapter 13 Bankruptcy Petition of Marshall s Davis and Kimberly h Davis
doc
05/21/2018
Objection to Claim
77
12/09/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
80
01/15/2019
Relief from Stay
85
02/05/2019
Limit Notice
doc
02/27/2019
Notice of Mortgage Payment Change

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.