Marshall v. J.s. Haren, Inc., et al

2:1996-cv-01021 (almd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 482 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
06/21/1996
DEMAND for jury trial by Kenneth Marshall (dkt clerk)
2
06/21/1996
NOTICE to circuit court clerk of filing of notice of removal by J.S. Haren, Inc., Jerry Daniels (dkt clerk)
3
06/21/1996
NOTICE to opposing counsel of filing of notice of removal by J.S. Haren, Inc., Jerry Daniels (dkt clerk)
4
06/24/1996
ANSWER to Complaint by J.S. Haren, Inc., Jerry Daniels referred to Judge W. H. Albritton III (dkt clerk)
06/26/1996
File referred to Judge Albritton. (dkt clerk) (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
08/02/1996
ORDER, set Rule 16 Status Conference 9:00 8/14/96 before Judge W. H. Albritton III (signed by Judge W. H. Albritton III), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to MT, EL.
6
08/09/1996
ORDER, reset Rule 16 Status Conference 8:45 8/20/96 before Judge W. H. Albritton III (signed by Judge W. H. Albritton III), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to MT, EL.
7
08/20/1996
SCHEDULING ORDER setting Pretrial Conference for 6/17/97 before Judge W. H. Albritton III; Motion Filing deadline on 3/19/97 ; Discovery cutoff 6/3/97 ; jury trial set for 7/21/97 before Judge W. H. Albritton III ; set amended pleading deadline for 11/3/96; Mediation Notice deadline on 11/29/96 (signed by Judge W. H. Albritton III), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to MT and EL. (dkt clerk)
8
04/04/1997
Plaintiff's Experts and Testimony; referred to Judge Albritton
9
05/06/1997
ORDER, set Rule 16 Scheduling Order Deadlines: Pretrial Conference for 3:45 6/17/97 before Judge W. H. Albritton III ; Proposed Pretrial Order due 6/13/97 ; Jury Trial set for 7/21/97 in Montgomery, AL before Judge W. H. Albritton III ; (signed by Judge W. H. Albritton III), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to EL, BM and MT.
06/18/1997
Pre-Trial Conference held before Judge W. H. Albritton III on 6/17/97 (dkt clerk) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10
06/18/1997
PRETRIAL ORDER setting Scheduling Order Deadlines: trial brief deadline for plaintiff on 7/7/97 and defendant on 7/14/97 ; any motions in limine, fully briefed, must be filed no later than the time of filing trial briefs; trial docket will be mailed to counsel one month prior to trial term; if jury trial, parties are ORDERED to file any requested voir dire questions and any proposed jury instructions no later than one week prior to the date shown on the docket for jury selection; each party shall have available at the time of trial, for use by the court, two copies of the list of his exhibits and two extra copies of each photostatically reproducible exhibits; that this order is binding upon all parties unless modified by Order of the Court (signed by Judge W. H. Albritton III); copies mailed to counsel; furnished to MT, EL, BM. (dkt clerk)
11
06/19/1997
ORDER, setting In Chambers Mediation Conference for 9:00 AM, 6/27/97, Room 330, Frank M. Johnson, Jr. Federal Building and United States Courthouse, 15 Lee Street, Montgomery, AL; that attorneys appear at mediation with parties or person with authority to settle; that parties file with Judge McPherson, Confidential Settlement Conference Statement at least five court days before the Settlement Conference, or on or before June 23, 1997; directing counsel to confer before the mediation conference and exchange offers in an attempt to settle this case; directing counsel to bring conference evidentiary materials in support of thier monetary demands or offers (signed by Mag Judge Vanzetta P. McPherson); copies mailed to counsel; furnished to MT, EL. (dkt clerk) Modified on 09/05/1997
12
07/01/1997
ORDER that on or before 11th July, 1997, the parties shall file a Joint Stipulation of Dismissal (signed by Mag Judge Vanzetta P. McPherson); copies mailed to counsel. (dkt clerk)
13
07/10/1997
STIPULATION of dismissal with prejudice; referred to Judge Albritton (dkt clerk)
14
07/11/1997
ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED with prejudice, each party to bear their own costs (signed by Judge W. H. Albritton III); copies mailed to counsel; furnished to MT, EL, BM. (dkt clerk)
07/11/1997
Case closed (dkt clerk) (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.