Martin Elmer Ewart and Wendy Wisdom Ewart
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-01427 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: 243 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
04/03/2018
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Fee Amount $310 Filed by Martin Elmer Ewart, Wendy Wisdom Ewart
2
04/03/2018
Chapter 13 Plan, and Request to Surrender Collateral. Filed by Debtor Martin Elmer Ewart, Joint Debtor Wendy Wisdom Ewart.
4
04/03/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor and Joint Debtor Filed by Debtor Martin Elmer Ewart, Joint Debtor Wendy Wisdom Ewart.
5
04/03/2018
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Martin Elmer Ewart, Joint Debtor Wendy Wisdom Ewart.
04/03/2018
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(18-01427-13) [misc,volp13] (310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21911633. Fee Amount 310.00 (re:Doc# 1) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
04/03/2018
Tax Documents for the Year for 2017 Filed by Debtor Martin Elmer Ewart, Joint Debtor Wendy Wisdom Ewart.
7
04/03/2018
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 05/09/2018 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 06/19/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 06/12/2018. Government Proof of Claim due by 10/01/2018 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 07/09/2018.
8
04/04/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management (Admin adiuser)
04/04/2018
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for joint debtors Martin Elmer Ewart and Wendy Wisdom Ewart Case Number 10-07442, Chapter 7 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 12/20/2010, Standard Discharge on 04/18/2011.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
04/04/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor PRA Receivables Management, LLC.
10
04/05/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 7 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 04/05/2018.
11
04/05/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Martin Elmer Ewart, Joint Debtor Wendy Wisdom Ewart). Notice Date 04/05/2018.
12
04/06/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 8 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 04/06/2018.
13
05/09/2018
Meeting of Creditors Held 05/09/2018. (Ch13troffice, sd)
14
05/14/2018
Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss. (Ch13troffice, km)
15
05/15/2018
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 14 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 6/19/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
16
05/17/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 15 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 05/17/2018.
17
06/20/2018
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 6/20/2018 (RE: related document(s) 7 Confirmation Hearing, 14 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 7/17/2018 at 11:15 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
18
06/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 17 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 06/22/2018.

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.