Martin Sorto
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00298 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
7
09/11/2018
Request for Notice by Creditor
8
09/11/2018
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (Pro Se) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
9
09/12/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
10
09/12/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
11
09/12/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
12
09/12/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
13
09/13/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
14
09/13/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
15
09/19/2018
Entry of Appearance
09/26/2018
OSC Referral (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
09/26/2018
Show Cause for Dismissal of Case (with hrg) (CM48-COAfterHrg) (SA)
09/28/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
17
09/28/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
18
10/02/2018
Notice of Hearing on UST Standing Mtn to Dismiss (CM14-COAwith)
10/15/2018
OSC Referral (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
10/15/2018
Proceeding Memo
20
10/16/2018
Dismissing Case (SA)
21
10/16/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
22
10/18/2018
Amended Order (SA)
23
10/18/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
10/19/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
10/20/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
10/23/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
25
10/31/2018
Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice (BNC Notice)
26
11/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Dismissal
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.