Martin, et al v. Ctb, Inc., et al
Court Docket Sheet

2:1999-cv-00703 (almd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 543 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
07/12/1999
DEMAND for jury trial by Richard Martin
2
07/12/1999
NOTICE of Filing Notice of Removal by CTB, Inc.
3
07/12/1999
CONSENT & JOINDER by Latco, Inc. in [1-1] Notice of Removal; referred to Judge W. H. Albritton III
4
07/12/1999
ANSWER to Complaint by Latco, Inc.; referred to Judge W. H. Albritton III
5
07/13/1999
CONSENT & JOINDER by Linco Holdings in [1-1] notice of removal; referred to Judge W. H. Albritton III
6
07/13/1999
ANSWER to Complaint by Linco Holdings (Attorney Richard E. Broughton); referred to Judge W. H. Albritton III
07/19/1999
File referred to Judge Albritton (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
07/28/1999
MOTION by Richard Martin for Charles D. "Skip" Davidson to Appear Pro Hac Vice FILING FEE $ 10.00 RECEIPT # 77672 ; referred to Judge W. H. Albritton III
8
07/29/1999
ORDER granting [7-1] motion for Charles D. "Skip" Davidson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (signed by Judge W. H. Albritton III), copies mailed to counsel.
9
07/29/1999
MOTION by CTB, Inc. to Dismiss for failure to name real party in interest ; or, in the alternative, to Dismiss and Transfer Venue ; or, in ther alternative, to Dismiss for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted ; or, in the alternative, for More Definite Statement ; referred to Judge W. H. Albritton III
10
07/30/1999
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for Richard Martin by Tiernan W. Luck III
11
07/30/1999
MOTION for L. Landis Sexton to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff. Referred to Judge W. H. Albritton III (dkt clerk)
08/03/1999
Stamped ORDER granting [11-1] motion for L. Landis Sexton to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff (Terminated attorney Lowell Landis Sexton for Richard Martin (by Judge W. H. Albritton III), copies mailed to counsel. (Text entry; no document attached.)
12
08/18/1999
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Response to Order to Show Cause due on 9/8/99 for Richard Martin to show cause why [9-1] motion to Dismiss for failure to name real party in interest or, in the alternative, [9-2] motion to Dismiss and Transfer Venue or, in the alternative, [9-3] motion to Dismiss, or, in the alternative, [9-4] motion for More Definite Statement by CTB, Inc. should not be granted; allowing defendant until 9/8/99 to reply; setting said motion for submission on 9/8/99 (signed by Judge W. H. Albritton III), copies mailed to counsel.
13
08/30/1999
MOTION by Latco, Inc. for Lynn Gipson to Appear Pro Hac Vice; FILING FEE $10; RECEIPT #78139 (Exhibits A & B, Consent to Admittance of Pro Hac Vice, etc. and Verified Application for Admission to Practice, etc. attached), referred to Judge W. H. Albritton III h
09/01/1999
CASE reassigned to Mag. Judge John L. Carroll (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/01/1999
CASE NO LONGER REFERRED TO Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/01/1999
Motion(s) referred to Mag. Judge John L. Carroll: [13-1] motion for Lynn Gipson to Appear Pro Hac Vice; [9-1] motion to Dismiss for failure to name real party in interest, [9-2] motion to Dismiss and Transfer Venue, [9-3] motion to Dismiss for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted, [9-4] motion for More Definite Statement; [4-1] motion to Dismiss (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/01/1999
File referred to Mag. Judge Carroll (Text entry; no document attached.)
14
09/01/1999
RESPONSE by Richard Martin in opposition to [9-1] motion to Dismiss for failure to name real party in interest by CTB, Inc., [9-2] motion to Dismiss and Transfer Venue by CTB, Inc. (w/Exhibits A-B attached); referred to Mag. Judge John L. Carroll
15
09/07/1999
BRIEF by CTB, Inc. in response to [14-1] opposition to transfer venue (w/Exhibit A attached); referred to Mag. Judge John L. Carroll
09/13/1999
Stamped ORDER granting [13-1] motion for Lynn Gipson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (by Mag. Judge John L. Carroll), copies mailed to counsel. (Text entry; no document attached.)
25
09/13/1999
ORDER consolidating with CA #99-C-704-N & CA #99-C-705-N with all future documents to the filed in this case; [9-1], [9-3], and [4-1] motions to Dismiss set for submission on 10/4/99 with any briefs on the venue issue to be filed on or before that date; directing the parties to file the consent to mag. judge form on or before 10/4/99 (signed by Mag. Judge John L. Carroll), copies mailed to counsel.
09/13/1999
Consolidated Lead Case (Text entry; no document attached.)
26
09/13/1999
SCHEDULING ORDER setting Pretrial Conference for 8:30 6/15/00 in chambers before Mag. Judge John L. Carroll; Motion Filing deadline on 3/17/00; Discovery cutoff 6/1/00; jury trial set for 10:00 7/17/00 in Montgomery before Mag. Judge John L. Carroll; set amended pleading deadline for 11/27/99; Jury selection set for 10:00 7/17/00 in Montgomery before Mag. Judge Susan R. Walker; proposed jury instructions due on 7/3/00; voir dire questions due 7/3/00; Mediation Notice deadline on 4/12/00 (signed by Mag. Judge John L. Carroll), copies mailed to counsel; furnished YG, SL, JT, CAC & HC. VACATED PER ORDER OF 2/25/00 (cc) Modified on 02/25/2000
27
09/27/1999
CONSENT by Linco Holdings to [9-2] motion to Transfer Venue and brief in support thereof by CTB, Inc.; referred to Mag. Judge John L. Carroll
28
10/01/1999
BRIEF by CTB, Inc. in response to [14-1] opposition to transfer venue filed by Richard Martin (with Exhibit A attached); referred to Mag. Judge John L. Carroll
29
10/04/1999
JOINDER by Latco, Inc. in [9-2] motion to Transfer Venue by CTB, Inc.; referred to Mag. Judge John L. Carroll
30
10/04/1999
SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF by CTB, Inc. in support of [9-1] motion to Dismiss for failure to name real party in interest, [9-2] motion to Dismiss and Transfer Venue; referred to Mag. Judge John L. Carroll
31
10/06/1999
SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE by Richard Martin, Thomas R. Beatty, James Beatty in opposition to [9-1] motion to Dismiss for failure to name real party in interest, [9-2] motion to Dismiss and Transfer Venue, [9-3] motion to Dismiss for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted, [9-4] motion for More Definite Statement by CTB, Inc. (with exhibits C-K attached); referred to Mag. Judge John L. Carroll
32
10/08/1999
Incorporation by reference of brief in support of motion to dismiss filed in CV-99-C-705-N prior to consolidation and JOINDER by Latco, Inc. in [9-2] motion to Transfer Venue and [30-1] brief in support by CTB, Inc.; referred to Mag. Judge John L. Carroll
33
11/08/1999
NOTICE (MOTION) by Latco, Inc. of Substitution Counsel as to Helen Johnson Alford and Frank L. Parker, Jr. for Charles Darwin "Skip" Davidson and Lynn Gipson; referred to Mag. Judge John L. Carroll (dkt clerk)
34
11/16/1999
ORDER granting [33-1] motion of Substitution Counsel as to Helen Johnson Alford and Frank L. Parker, Jr. for Charles Darwin "Skip" Davidson and Lynn Gipson; terminated attorney Lynn Gipson for Latco, Inc., attorney Charles "Skip" D. Davidson for Latco, Inc. (signed by Mag. Judge John L. Carroll), copies mailed to counsel.
35
01/14/2000
MOTION to Intervene by National Union Fire, and alternative for Bifurcated Trial; referred to Mag. Judge John L. Carroll (dkt clerk)
36
01/19/2000
ORDER directing parties to file a response to motion; Response to Motion set to 2/2/00 for [35-1] motion to Intervene by National Union Fire and [35-2] motion for Bifurcated Trial (signed by Mag. Judge John L. Carroll), copies mailed to counsel.
37
02/01/2000
RESPONSE by Latco, Inc. in opposition to [35-1] motion to Intervene by National Union Fire, [35-2] motion for Bifurcated Trial; referred to Mag. Judge John L. Carroll (dkt clerk) Modified on 02/01/2000
38
02/01/2000
JOINT MOTION by Richard Martin, CTB, Inc. to Stay proceedings and scheduling deadlines ; referred to Mag. Judge John L. Carroll
39
02/02/2000
RESPONSE by Richard Martin, Thomas R. Beatty, James Beatty in opposition to [35-1] motion to Intervene by National Union Fire, [35-2] motion for Bifurcated Trial; referred to Mag. Judge John L. Carroll
40
02/04/2000
ORDER directing the parties to file any objections to the granting of joint motion to stay; Response to Motion set to 2/14/00 for [38-1] joint motion to Stay proceedings and scheduling deadlines (signed by Mag. Judge John L. Carroll), copies mailed to counsel.
41
02/09/2000
JOINDER MOTION by Latco, Inc. to Stay Proceedings and Scheduling Deadlines; referred to Mag. Judge John L. Carroll (dkt clerk)
42
02/10/2000
CONSENT by Linco Holdings to [41-1] motion to Stay Proceedings and Scheduling Deadlines by Latco, Inc.; referred to Mag. Judge John L. Carroll
43
02/25/2000
ORDER granting [38-1] motion to Stay Proceedings and Scheduling Deadlines; staying all proceedings in this case; vacating [26-1] Rule 16 Scheduling order; directing the parties to inform the court as soon as the Alabama Supreme Court rules (signed by Mag. Judge John L. Carroll), copies mailed to counsel; furnished YG, SL, JT, CAC & HC. (cc) Modified on 02/25/2000
44
02/28/2000
BRIEF by Latco, Inc. in support of [37-1] response in opposition; referred to Mag. Judge John L. Carroll
45
03/15/2000
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for Richard Martin, Thomas R. Beatty, James Beatty by M. Adam Jones
46
03/15/2000
MOTION by Richard Martin, Thomas R. Beatty, James Beatty for Tiernan W. Luck III to Withdraw as Attorney ; referred to Mag. Judge John L. Carroll
03/20/2000
Stamped ORDER granting [46-1] motion for Tiernan W. Luck III to Withdraw as Attorney (Terminated attorney Tiernan W. Luck for James Beatty, for Thomas R. Beatty, for Richard Martin (by Mag. Judge John L. Carroll), copies mailed to counsel. (Text entry; no document attached.)
47
03/31/2000
ORDER that all pending motion be DISMISSED without prejudice, with leave to refile; terminating [35-1] motion to Intervene by National Union Fire, [35-2] motion for Bifurcated Trial [27-1] motion to Dismiss, [9-1] motion to Dismiss for failure to name real party in interest, [9-2] motion to Dismiss and Transfer Venue, [9-3] motion to Dismiss for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted, [9-4] motion for More Definite Statement, [4-1] motion to Dismiss; as further set out (signed by Mag. Judge John L. Carroll); copies mailed to counsel (dkt clerk)
48
09/25/2000
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for Richard Martin, Thomas R. Beatty, James Beatty by Rhon E. Jones
49
11/08/2000
MOTION by Latco, Inc. for Partial Summary Judgment ; referred to Mag. Judge John L. Carroll (cc) Modified on 11/08/2000
50
11/08/2000
MEMORANDUM by Latco, Inc. in support of [49-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Latco, Inc. (w/Exhibits A-C attached); referred to Mag. Judge John L. Carroll
51
11/08/2000
AMENDED MOTION to Intervene by National Union Fire referring to: [35-1] motion to Intervene by National Union Fire; referred to Mag. Judge John L. Carroll
52
11/21/2000
MOTION (w/attachment) by CTB, Inc. to Set Status Hearing, referred to Mag. Judge John L. Carroll. (dkt clerk)
53
11/22/2000
RESPONSE by Latco, Inc. to [51-1] supplemental amended motion to Intervene by National Union Fire, referred to Mag. Judge John L. Carroll. (dkt clerk)
54
12/07/2000
RESPONSE by Richard Martin, Thomas R. Beatty, James Beatty in opposition to [51-1] amended motion to Intervene by National Union Fire; referred to Mag. Judge John L. Carroll
56
01/04/2001
ORDER directing that under Rule 26(f) the report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable but not later than 1/26/01, as further set out (signed by Mag. Judge John L. Carroll), copies provided to counsel.
57
01/04/2001
MOTION by CTB, Inc. to Substitute Attorney Amy Bowman for D. Mitchell Henry ; referred to Mag. Judge John L. Carroll
58
01/18/2001
ORDER denying [35-1] motion to Intervene by National Union Fire; denying [9-1] motion to Dismiss for failure to name real party in interest, denying [9-2] motion to Dismiss and Transfer Venue, denying [9-3] motion to Dismiss for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted, denying [9-4] motion for More Definite Statement (signed by Mag. Judge John L. Carroll), copies provided to counsel.
59
01/29/2001
ORDER set Scheduling Conference for 8:30 2/8/01 before Mag. Judge John L. Carroll (signed by Mag. Judge John L. Carroll), copies provided; furn: yg hc sl.
60
02/08/2001
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for Richard Martin, Thomas R. Beatty, James Beatty by L. Shane Seaborn
61
02/09/2001
ORDER directing the parties that on or before 2/28/01 to file the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan; said report should comply with Form 35 of the Appendix of Forms to the F.R.C.P. (signed by Mag. Judge John L. Carroll), copies provided to counsel.
62
02/22/2001
MOTION by Latco, Inc. for Leave to File third-party complaint (w/Exhibits 1-2 attached); referred to Mag. Judge John L. Carroll
63
02/27/2001
ORDER granting [62-1] motion for Leave to File third-party complaint; directing that any objections be filed on or before 3/8/01 (signed by Mag. Judge John L. Carroll), copies provided to counsel.
64
02/27/2001
THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT by Latco, Inc. against Paslode Corporation, J&S Tool & Fastener, Charoen Pokphand WITHDRAWN PER 7/20/01 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL (cc) Modified on 07/23/2001
65
02/28/2001
MOTION by CTB, Inc. to Bifurcate ; referred to Mag. Judge John L. Carroll
66
02/28/2001
REPORT of Parties Planning Meeting containing discovery plan (applies to 99-C-703-N); referred to Mag. Judge Carroll.
67
02/28/2001
REPORT of Parties' Planning Meeting containing discovery plan (applies to 99-C-704-N and 99-C-705-N); referred to Mag. Judge Carroll.
68
03/01/2001
OBJECTION by CTB, Inc. to plaintiff's 30(b)(6) deposition notice and 30(b)(5) documents request; referred to Mag. Judge John L. Carroll. This document applies to 99-C-704-N only. (cc) Modified on 03/06/2001
69
03/09/2001
ORDER vacating the portion of [25-1] order which orders consolidation of this case with 99-C-704-N and 99-C-705-N; that this case will proceed as a separate case; denying as moot [65-1] motion to Bifurcate (signed by Mag. Judge John L. Carroll), copies provided to counsel.
03/09/2001
**Remove panel flag for lead case. (Text entry; no document attached.)
70
03/19/2001
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for Richard Martin by Larry A. Golston Jr.
71
03/20/2001
SCHEDULING ORDER setting Pretrial Conference for 10/31/01 in chambers before Mag. Judge John L. Carroll; Motion Filing deadline on 8/2/01; Discovery cutoff 10/17/01; jury trial set for 12/3/01 trial term in Montgomery before Mag. Judge John L. Carroll; set amended pleading deadline for 8/3/01; proposed jury instructions due on 11/19/01; voir dire questions due 11/19/01; Mediation Notice deadline on 8/28/01 (signed by Mag. Judge John L. Carroll), copies provided to counsel, YG, SL, WR & HC.
72
03/22/2001
ORDER granting [55-1] motion for leave to Amend [1-1] complaint; directing that any objections should be filed on or before 4/4/01 (signed by Mag. Judge John L. Carroll), copies provided to counsel.
73
03/22/2001
FIRST AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT by Richard Martin amending [1-1] complaint
74
03/23/2001
MOTION (w/Exhibits A-F attached) by Richard Martin to Remand to the Barbour County, Clayton Division, Circuit Court, referred to Mag. Judge John L. Carroll. (dkt clerk)
75
03/27/2001
ORDER directing the defendants to file a responsel; Response to Motion set to 4/10/01 for [74-1] motion to Remand to the Barbour County, Clayton Division, Circuit Court (signed by Mag. Judge John L. Carroll), copies provided to counsel.
76
03/28/2001
MOTION by CTB, Inc. for D. Mitchell Henry to Withdraw as Attorney ; referred to Mag. Judge John L. Carroll
77
03/30/2001
Stamped ORDER granting [76-1] motion for D. Mitchell Henry to Withdraw as Attorney (Terminated attorney D. Mitchell Henry for CTB, Inc. (by Mag. Judge John L. Carroll), copies provided to counsel.
78
04/10/2001
RESPONSE by Linco Holdings to [74-1] motion to Remand to the Barbour County, Clayton Division, Circuit Court, by Richard Martin referred to Mag. Judge John L. Carroll
79
04/10/2001
RESPONSE by CTB, Inc. to [74-1] motion to Remand to the Barbour County, Clayton Division, Circuit Court, by Richard Martin referred to Mag. Judge John L. Carroll
80
04/10/2001
RESPONSE by Latco, Inc. to [74-1] motion to Remand to the Barbour County, Clayton Division, Circuit Court, by Richard Martin referred to Mag. Judge John L. Carroll
81
06/12/2001
CASE reassigned to Mag Judge Vanzetta P. McPherson
06/12/2001
Motion(s) referred to Mag Judge Vanzetta P. McPherson : [74-1] motion to Remand, [57-1] motion to Substitute Attorney Amy Bowman for D. Mitchell Henry [52-1] motion to Set Status Hearing, [49-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment [51-1] amended motion to Intervene by National Union Fire (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/18/2001
Paslode Corporation's Consent to Magistrate letter (#81) returned with the following notation: The Corporation Company is not the registered agent. (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/28/2001
CASE reassigned to Judge W. H. Albritton III (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/28/2001
REFERRAL JUDGE reassigned to Mag Judge Vanzetta P. McPherson (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/28/2001
Motion(s) referred to Judge W. H. Albritton III : [74-1] motion to Remand to the Barbour County, Clayton Division, Circuit Court referred to Judge W. H. Albritton III, [57-1] motion to Substitute Attorney Amy Bowman for D. Mitchell Henry referred to Judge W. H. Albritton III, [49-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment referred to Judge W. H. Albritton III (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/28/2001
File referred to Judge Albritton (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/29/2001
CASE reassigned to Judge Myron H. Thompson (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/29/2001
Motion(s) referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson : [74-1] motion to Remand to the Barbour County, Clayton Division, Circuit Court, referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson, [57-1] motion to Substitute Attorney Amy Bowman for D. Mitchell Henry referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson, [49-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/29/2001
File referred to Judge Thompson (Text entry; no document attached.)
82
07/02/2001
ORDER denying as moot [52-1] motion to Set Status Hearing; treating notice of substitution as a motion to substitute attorney; granting [57-1] motion to Substitute Attorney Amy Bowman for D. Mitchell Henry; terminated attorney D. Mitchell Henry for CTB, Inc. (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies provided to counsel.
83
07/10/2001
ORDER amending [71-1] Scheduling order; resetting Scheduling Order Deadlines: Pretrial Conference for 9/25/01 before Judge Myron H. Thompson; Jury Trial set for 11/5/01 term of court before Judge Myron H. Thompson (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies provided to counsel, YG, SC, WR & HC.
84
07/10/2001
ORDER denying as moot [49-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies provided to counsel.
85
07/10/2001
ORDER denying [74-1] motion to Remand (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies provided to counsel.
86
07/12/2001
ORDER directing defendant Latco, Inc. to amend its third-party complaint to assert the basis for jurisdiction in this court, 28 U.S.C.A. 1653, otherwise [64-1] third-party complaint will be dismissed without prejudice; setting Amended Pleadings deadline to 7/27/01 (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies provided to counsel.
87
07/13/2001
MOTION by Richard Martin for Tiernan W. Luck III to Withdraw as Attorney ; referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson
88
07/20/2001
NOTICE of Dismissal of [64-1] third-party claim by Latco, Inc.; referred to Judge Thompson.
89
07/20/2001
MOTION by Latco, Inc. for Leave to File third-party complaint (w/Exhibits 1-4 attached); referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson
90
07/25/2001
ANSWER by CTB, Inc. to complaint & amended complaint; referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson
91
07/26/2001
MOTION by CTB, Inc., Latco, Inc. to Extend Time to disclose expert reports ; referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson
93
07/27/2001
MOTION by Linco Holdings to Extend Time to disclose expert reports ; referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson
94
07/31/2001
ORDER granting [92-1] motion to Amend [1-1] complaint (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies provided to counsel.
95
07/31/2001
AMENDED COMPLAINT by Richard Martin against Bruce Singleton amending [1-1] complaint
96
07/31/2001
ORDER granting [89-1] motion for Leave to File third-party complaint (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies provided to counsel.
97
07/31/2001
ORDER granting [91-1] motion to Extend Time to disclose expert reports (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies provided to counsel.
98
07/31/2001
ORDER granting [93-1] motion to Extend Time to disclose expert reports (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies provided to counsel.
99
07/31/2001
ORDER granting [87-1] motion for Tiernan W. Luck III to Withdraw as Attorney (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies provided to counsel.
100
07/31/2001
THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT by Latco, Inc. against Illinois Tool Works and J&S Tool & Fastener
101
08/01/2001
MOTION by Latco, Inc. for Summary Judgment ; referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson
102
08/01/2001
MEMORANDUM by Latco, Inc. in support of [101-1] motion for Summary Judgment by Latco, Inc. (w/Exhibits A-D attached); referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson
103
08/01/2001
MOTION by CTB, Inc. to Extend Time to file motion for summary judgment ; referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson
104
08/01/2001
AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT by Richard Martin amending [95-1] amended complaint to reflect jury demand which was omitted on the amended complaint
105
08/02/2001
SUMMONS issued; summons, complaint w/notice of removal, first amendment to complaint, amended complaint & amendment to amended complaint mailed by CMRRR to Bruce Singleton
106
08/02/2001
MOTION by CTB, Inc. for Summary Judgment ; referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson
107
08/02/2001
BRIEF by CTB, Inc. in support of [106-1] motion for Summary Judgment (w/Exhibits 1-7 attached); referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson
108
08/02/2001
MOTION by Linco Holdings to continue summary judgment deadline ; referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson
109
08/02/2001
MOTION by Linco Holdings for Summary Judgment (w/Exhibits A-E attached); referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson
110
08/02/2001
Statement of Facts and BRIEF by Linco Holdings in support of [109-1] motion for Summary Judgment; referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson
112
08/06/2001
OBJECTION by Richard Martin to [103-1] motion to Extend Time to file motion for summary judgment by CTB, Inc.; referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson
113
08/06/2001
SUMMONS issued; summons, 3rd party complaint, notice of removal, original complaint, 3/22/01 amendment to complaint & 7/31/01 amended complaint mailed by CMRRR to J&S Tool & Fastener, Illinois Tool Works
114
08/08/2001
RETURN RECEIPT CARD showing service of summons, complaint w/notice of removal, first amendment to complaint, amended complaint & amendment to amended complaint on Dana Singleton on 8/6/01 for Bruce Singleton. Answer due on 8/27/01 for Bruce Singleton
115
08/08/2001
RETURN RECEIPT CARD showing service of summons, 3rd party complaint, complaint w/notice of removal, 3/22/01 amendment to complaint & 7/31/01 amended complaint on Tina Blue on 8/7/01 for Illinois Tool Works. Answer due on 8/27/01 for Illinois Tool Works
116
08/09/2001
MOTION by Richard Martin to Leave to Take Deposition of confined person ; referred to Mag Judge Vanzetta P. McPherson
117
08/10/2001
EXPERT DISCLOSURES consisting of reports from individuals that may be used as expert witnesses at the trial by CTB, Inc., Latco, Inc. (w/Exhibits 1-6); referred to Judge Thompson. FILED UNDER SEPARATE COVER
118
08/13/2001
ANSWER by Latco, Inc. to [95-1] amended complaint; referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson
119
08/13/2001
RETURN RECEIPT CARD showing service of summons, 3rd party complaint, complaint w/notice of removal, 3/22/01 amendment to complaint & 7/31/01 amended complaint on J. Brady on 8/10/01 for J&S Tool & Fastener. Answer due on 8/30/01 for J&S Tool & Fastener
120
08/13/2001
ORDER granting [116-1] motion to Leave to Take Deposition (signed by Mag Judge Vanzetta P. McPherson), copies provided to counsel.
121
08/13/2001
ORDER granting [103-1] motion to Extend Time and [108-1] motion to continue to the extent that the [71-1] Scheduling order is amended to reflect the following: resetting Scheduling Order Deadlines: Discovery cutoff to 12/10/01; Motion Filing to 10/26/01; Pretrial Conference for 8:30 1/10/02 in Montgomery before Judge Myron H. Thompson; Proposed Pretrial Order due 1/7/02; Jury selection and Jury Trial set for 10:00 2/19/02 in Montgomery before Judge Myron H. Thompson; denying [101-1], [106-1] and [109-1] motions for Summary Judgment with leave to renew if the parties so desire before the extended new dispositive motion deadline (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies provided to counsel, YG, SC, WR & HC.
122
08/13/2001
ORDER granting [111-1] motion to Amend [1-1] complaint to substitute real party in interest (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies provided to counsel.
123
08/13/2001
AMENDED COMPLAINT by Richard Martin adding An-Ro Farms, Inc. as a plaintiff amending [1-1] complaint; jury demand
124
08/15/2001
ORDER amending [121-2] order to reflect that Jury selection is set for 10:00 2/11/02 in Montgomery; Jury Trial set for 10:00 2/19/02 in second floor courtroom before Judge Myron H. Thompson (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies provided to counsel, YG, SC, WR & HC.
125
08/16/2001
LIMITED OBJECTION by CTB, Inc. to [111-1] motion to Amend [1-1] complaint to substitute real party in interest by Richard Martin; referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson
127
08/17/2001
ORDER setting [125-1] motion to Strike and [125-1] objection by CTB, Inc. for submission on 8/31/01, with all briefs due by said date (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies provided to counsel.
128
08/17/2001
ORDER treating the notice of substitution as a motion to substitute; granting [126-1] motion to substitute original expert reports for the copies filed with [117-1] expert disclosures by Latco, Inc., CTB, Inc. (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies provided to counsel.
129
08/17/2001
ANSWER by CTB, Inc. to [95-1] amended complaint; referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson
130
08/24/2001
OBJECTION to Offer of Judgment and MOTION by Richard Martin for order declaring offer of judgment to be of no legal effect (w/referenced offer attached); referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson
131
08/27/2001
RESPONSE by Richard Martin to [125-1] limited objection to motion to amend complaint to substitute real party in interest by CTB, Inc.; referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson
132
08/27/2001
ANSWER by Latco, Inc. to [123-1] amended complaint; referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson
133
08/27/2001
MOTION by Illinois Tool Works to Dismiss third-party claim ; referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson
134
08/27/2001
ANSWER by Linco Holdings to second amended complaint; referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson
135
08/27/2001
MOTION by Bruce Singleton to Dismiss, or in the alternative for Summary Judgment (w/attachments); referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson
136
08/27/2001
MEMORANDUM BRIEF by Bruce Singleton in support of [135-1] motion to Dismiss or in the alternative [135-2] motion for Summary Judgment by Bruce Singleton (w/attachments); referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson
137
08/28/2001
Notice Concerning Settlement Conference and Mediation filed by Richard Martin; referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson
138
08/29/2001
ANSWER by J&S Tool & Fastener (Attorney Michael Baird Beers, William F. Patty, Angela Christine Taylor) to [100-1] third-party complaint by Latco, Inc.; referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson
139
08/30/2001
ORDER setting [130-1] objection to offer of judgment and motion for order declaring offer of judgment to be of no legal effect by Richard Martin for submission on 9/14/01 with all briefs due by said date (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson, copies provided to counsel.
140
08/30/2001
ORDER setting [133-1] motion to Dismiss third-party claim by Illinois Tool Works for submission on 9/14/01 with all briefs due by said date (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies provided to counsel.
141
08/30/2001
ORDER setting [135-1] motion to Dismiss or in the alternative, [135-2] motion for Summary Judgment by Bruce Singleton for submission on 9/14/01, with the plaintiff to file his brief and evidentiary materials by said date (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies provided to counsel.
142
08/30/2001
RESPONSE by CTB, Inc. to plaintiff's response to CTB's [131-1] response to limited objections to motion to amend complaint to substitute real party in interest; referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson
143
09/11/2001
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Illinois Tool Works, Inc.; referred to Judge Thompson.
144
09/12/2001
ORDER overruling [125-1] objection; denying [125-1] motion to Strike (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies provided to counsel.
145
09/13/2001
RESPONSE by Latco, Inc. to [133-1] motion to Dismiss third-party claim by Illinois Tool Works; referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson
09/14/2001
REFERRAL JUDGE reassigned to Mag. Judge Delores R. Boyd (Text entry; no document attached.)
146
09/14/2001
MOTION by Bruce Singleton for additional time to file a reply brief to plaintiff's response to Bruce Singleton's motion to dismiss or in the alternative, motion for summary judgment ; referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson
147
09/14/2001
RESPONSE by Linco Holdings to [130-1] objection to offer of judgment and motion for order declaring offer of judgment to be of no legal effect by Richard Martin; referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson
148
09/14/2001
RESPONSE by Richard Martin, An-Ro Farms, Inc. to [135-1] motion to Dismiss or in the alternative, [135-2] motion for Summary Judgment by Bruce Singleton (w/Exhibits A-B attached); referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson
149
09/18/2001
ORDER denying without prejudice [146-1] motion for additional time to file a reply brief, etc.; advising that any such request must be accompanied with the proposed brief; that said brief may not include any new evidence (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies provided to counsel.
150
09/18/2001
ANSWER to Third Amended Complaint by CTB, Inc.; referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson
151
09/21/2001
MOTION by Bruce Singleton for Leave to File a reply brief to plaintiff's response to Bruce Singleton's motion to dismiss or in the alternative, motion for summary judgment (w/proposed document); referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson
152
09/25/2001
ORDER granting [151-1] motion for Leave to File a reply brief (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies provided to counsel.
153
09/25/2001
REPLY by Bruce Singleton to plaintiff's [148-1] response to [135-1] motion to Dismiss or in the alternative [135-2] motion for Summary Judgment by Bruce Singleton
10/03/2001
REFERRAL JUDGE reassigned to Mag Judge Vanzetta P. McPherson per instructions form Chief Deputy. (Text entry; no document attached.)
154
10/26/2001
MOTION (w/Exhibits A-H attached) by Illinois Tool Works for Summary Judgment and Citation of Authority in Support of Same referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson. (dkt clerk)
155
10/26/2001
MOTION by Latco, Inc. for Summary Judgment referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson. (dkt clerk) Modified on 10/26/2001
156
10/26/2001
MEMORANDUM (w/Exhibits A-F attached) by Latco, Inc. in support of [155-1] motion for Summary Judgment by Latco, Inc. referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson. (dkt clerk)
157
10/26/2001
MOTION by J&S Tool & Fastener for Summary Judgment referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson. (dkt clerk)
158
10/26/2001
BRIEF (w/Exhibits A-S [Q being a video tape] filed under separate cover) by J&S Tool & Fastener in support of [157-1] motion for Summary Judgment; referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson. [Edited to reflect that the Exhibits are under separate cover (cc)] (dkt clerk) Modified on 10/31/2001
159
10/26/2001
MOTION (w/Exhibits 1-7 attached) by CTB, Inc. for Summary Judgment referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson. (dkt clerk)
160
10/26/2001
BRIEF by CTB, Inc. in support of [159-1] motion for Summary Judgment referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson. (dkt clerk)
161
10/26/2001
RENEWED MOTION (w/Exhibits A-G attached) by Linco Holdings for Summary Judgment referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson. (dkt clerk)
162
10/26/2001
STATEMENT OF FACTS AND BRIEF by Linco Holdings in support of [161-1] motion for Summary Judgment referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson. (dkt clerk)
163
10/31/2001
ORDER setting [155-1] motion for Summary Judgment by Latco, Inc. for submission on 11/16/01, with the non-movants to file their briefs and evidentiary materials by said date (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies provided to counsel.
164
10/31/2001
ORDER setting [161-1] motion for Summary Judgment by Linco Holdings for submission on 11/16/01, with the non-movants to file their briefs and evidentiary materials by said date (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies provided to counsel.
165
10/31/2001
ORDER setting [159-1] motion for Summary Judgment by CTB, Inc. for submission on 11/16/01, with the non-movants to file their briefs and evidentiary materials by said date (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies provided to counsel.
166
10/31/2001
ORDER setting [154-1] motion for Summary Judgment by Illinois Tool Works for submission on 11/16/01, with the non-movants to file their briefs and evidentiary materials by said date (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies provided to counsel.
167
10/31/2001
ORDER setting [157-1] motion for Summary Judgment by J&S Tool & Fastener for submission on 11/16/01, with the non-movants to file their briefs and evidentiary materials by said date (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies provided to counsel.
168
11/07/2001
ORDER denying as further set out [133-1] motion to Dismiss third-party claim, (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies provided to counsel. (dkt clerk)
169
11/15/2001
BRIEF IN RESPONSE by Latco, Inc. (w/Exhibits A-F attached) to [154-1] motion for Summary Judgment and Citation of Authority in Support of Same by Illinois Tool Works referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson. (dkt clerk)
170
11/15/2001
BRIEF IN RESPONSE (w/Exhibits A-F attached) by Latco, Inc. to [157-1] motion for Summary Judgment by J&S Tool & Fastener referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson. (dkt clerk)
171
11/16/2001
SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM by Illinois Tool Works in support of [154-1] motion for Summary Judgment and Citation of Authority in Support of Same by Illinois Tool Works referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson. (dkt clerk)
173
11/16/2001
RESPONSE (w/Exhibits A-R attached)by Richard Martin and opposition to [155-1] motion for Summary Judgment by Latco, Inc., [154-1] motion for Summary Judgment and Citation of Authority in Support of Same by Illinois Tool Works, [161-1] motion for Summary Judgment by Linco Holdings, [159-1] motion for Summary Judgment by CTB, Inc., [157-1] motion for Summary Judgment by J&S Tool & Fastener referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson. (dkt clerk)
174
11/26/2001
OBJECTION (w/Exhibits 1-4 attached) by CTB, Inc. to [172-1] motion to Amend [1-1] complaint by Richard Martin referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson. (dkt clerk)
12/05/2001
Tele-conference held before Judge Myron H. Thompson on 12/5/01 (re: Pla's motion to amend complaint) (dkt clerk) (Text entry; no document attached.)
175
12/05/2001
Courtroom Deputy's MINUTES of proceedings held on 12/5/01 before Judge Thompson, regarding pla's motion to amend complaint [EDITED to show Court Reporter: Mitchell Reisner (nna)]. (dkt clerk) Modified on 12/06/2001
176
12/07/2001
ORDER advising that as the court has been informed that this cause is now settled between plaintiffs Richard Martin and An-Ro Farms, Inc, and defendant Bruce Singleton, this lawsuit is dismissed with prejudice as to the claims against defendant Bruce Singleton, with the parties to bear their own costs and with leave, within 45 days, to stipulate to a different basis for dismissal; denying [135-1] motion to Dismiss, or in the alternative, [135-2] motion for Summary Judgment as moot (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies provided to counsel.
177
12/07/2001
ORDER advising that as the court has been informed that this cause is now settled between plaintiffs Richard Martin and An-Ro Farms, Inc. and defendant Linco Holdings of Georgia, Inc., this lawsuit is dismissed with prejudice as to the claims against defendant Linco Holdings of Georgia, Inc., with the parties to bear their own costs and with leave to the parties, within 45 days, to stipulate to a different basis for dismissal; denying as moot [161-1] motion for Summary Judgment (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies provided to counsel.
178
12/07/2001
ORDER advising that as the court has been informed that this cause is now settled between plaintiffs Richard Martin and An-Ro Farms, Inc., and defendants Keith Harris, David Tyler and Mickey Waldrop, this lawsuit is dismissed with prejudice as to the claims against defendants Keith Harris, David Tyler and Mickey Waldrop, with the parties to bear thier own costs and with leave, within 45 days, to stipulate to a different basis for dismissal (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies provided to counsel.
179
12/07/2001
ORDER advising that as the court has been informed that this cause is now settled between plaintiffs Richard Martin and An-Ro Farms, Inc., and defendant CTB, Inc., this lawsuit is dismissed with prejudice as to the claims against defendant CTB, Inc., with the parties to bear their own costs and with leave, within 45 days, to stipulate to a different basis for dismissal; denying as moot [159-1] motion for Summary Judgment (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies provided to counsel.
180
12/07/2001
ORDER advising that as the court has been informed that this cause is now settled between third-party plaintiff Latco, Inc. and third-party defendant Illinois Tool Works, this lawsuit is dismissed with prejudice as the the claims against third-party defendant Illinois Tool Works, with the parties to bear their own costs and with leave, within 45 days, to stipulate to a different basis for dismissal; denying as moot [154-1] motion for Summary Judgment (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies provided to counsel.
181
12/07/2001
ORDER advising that as the court has been informed that this cause is now settled bwtween third-party plaintiff Latco, Inc. and third-party defendant J & S Tool and Fastener, Inc., this lawsuit is dismissed with prejudice as to the claims against third-party defendant J & S Tool and Fastener, Inc. with the parties to bear their own costs and with leave, within 45 days, to stipulate to a different basis for dismissal; denying as moot [157-1] motion for Summary Judgment (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies provided to counsel.
182
12/07/2001
ORDER denying as moot [130-1] motion for order declaring offer of judgment to be of no legal effect (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies provided to counsel.
183
12/07/2001
ORDER denying as moot [172-1] motion to Amend [1-1] complaint (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies provided to counsel.
184
12/07/2001
MOTION by Richard Martin, Latco, Inc. to Extend Deadline for Discovery or, in the Alternative, to continue the case referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson. (dkt clerk)
185
12/11/2001
ORDER resetting Discovery deadline to 12/30/01 (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies provided to counsel. (dkt clerk)
186
12/11/2001
ORDER setting Rule 16 Scheduling Order Deadlines: Pretrial Conference for 8:30 AM, 1/10/02, in chambers, Montgomery, AL, before Judge Myron H. Thompson; Jointly Proposed Pretrial Order due 1/5/02; Jury selection set for 10:00 AM, 2/11/02, in Montgomery, AL; Jury Trial set for 10:00 AM, 2/19/02, in Montgomery, AL, before Judge Myron H. Thompson, as further set out in order (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies provided to counsel (furnished to YG, SC, HC, WR). (dkt clerk)
187
12/18/2001
ORDER setting Brief deadline to 12/28/01 for defendant Latco, Inc. to file a supplemental brief on the choice-of-law issue raised in plaintiffs response to [155-1] motion for Summary Judgment (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies provided to counsel.
188
12/26/2001
SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF by Latco, Inc. in support of [155-1] motion for Summary Judgment. Referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson
189
01/04/2002
ORDER: The court having been informed that this cause is now settled, it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of the court that this lawsuit is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice, with the parties to bear their own costs and with leave to the parties, within 45 days, to stipulate to a different basis for dismissal or to stipulate to the entry of judgment instead of dismissal, and with leave to any party to file, within 45 days, a motion to have the dismissal set aside and the case reinstated or the settlement enforced, should the settlement not be consummated. Denying as moot: [184-2] motion to continue the case, and [155-1] motion for Summary Judgment (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies provided to counsel. (dkt clerk)
01/04/2002
Case closed (dkt clerk) (Text entry; no document attached.)
190
01/28/2002
JOINT STIPULATION of dismissal referred to Judge Thompson. (dkt clerk)
191
01/29/2002
ORDER that upon consideration of [190-1] joint stipulation of dismissal, it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT and DECREE of the court that this cause is dismissed with prejudice (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies provided to counsel.
192
01/31/2002
STIPULATION of dismissal filed by third-party plaintiff Latco, Inc. and third-party defendant Illinois Tool Works Inc. as to all claims stated by Latco, Inc. against Illinois Tool Works, Inc.; referred to Judge Thompson.
193
01/31/2002
JOINT STIPULATION of dismissal filed by plaintiff & defendants; referred to Judge Thompson.
194
02/01/2002
ORDER that pursuant to [192-1] joint stipulation of dismissal, all claims stated by third-party plaintiff Latco, Inc., against third-party defendant Illinois Tool Works, Inc., are dismissed with prejudice, all costs taxed as paid (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies provided to counsel.
195
02/01/2002
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE that upon the [193-1] joint motion of the parties for an order of dismissal, it is ordered and decreed that: all parties are permanently enjoined from disclosing the terms or amount of this settlement, with the exceptions as further set out in order; that as stipulated and for good cause shown, this civil action is dismissed, with prejudice, as to all defendants (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies provided to all counsel of record as directed.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.