Martini Anterioette Kennedy
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-01626 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/24/2018
Meeting of Creditors Held
doc
05/29/2018
Dismiss Case - Other
doc
05/29/2018
Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments
doc
05/29/2018
Trustee Objection to Confirmation of Plan
37
01/30/2019
Transfer of Claim
38
02/01/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
39
02/08/2019
Granting Trustee's Notice of Debtor's Continuing Default
40
02/11/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
42
02/15/2019
Notice and Order
44
02/18/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.