Marvin L Lanier
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

8:2018-bk-81568 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/26/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management
doc
05/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
05/28/2018
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
05/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
20
07/25/2018
Approving
09/04/2018
Installments Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
26
12/28/2018
Modify Plan
27
12/28/2018
Debtor Objection to Claim
28
12/28/2018
Incur Debt
29
12/28/2018
Statistical Summary of Certain Liabilities
31
12/30/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.