Mary Alice Eckardt
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00166 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/31/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
doc
05/31/2018
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
05/31/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
05/31/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
doc
05/31/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
05/31/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
05/31/2018
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
05/31/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/31/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
05/31/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)
doc
05/31/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)
doc
05/31/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)
doc
05/31/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
doc
06/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
doc
06/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
doc
06/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
13
06/21/2018
Request for Notice by Creditor
07/03/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/03/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
14
07/05/2018
Reaffirmation Agreement (Pro Se - No Atty Signature) (BKRA02)
15
07/05/2018
Notice of Reaffirmation Hearing (Chambers Template-BNC Notice)
16
07/07/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
17
08/01/2018
Proceeding Memo
18
08/03/2018
Regarding Reaffirmation Agreement (CM37-COAfter) (SA)
08/03/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
08/03/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
20
08/05/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
21
08/20/2018
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
22
08/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
23
08/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
24
08/24/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
08/27/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
25
08/27/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
26
08/29/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
08/30/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.