Mary Ann Kapotak
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00291 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
09/05/2018
Chapter 13 Bankruptcy Petition of Mary ann Kapotak
10
09/11/2018
Setting Hearing (SA)
11
09/11/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
12
09/13/2018
Request for Special Notice
13
09/13/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
14
09/20/2018
Notice of Non-Compliance (LBF37)
15
09/20/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
16
09/20/2018
Convert Case From Chapter 7 to Chapter 13 (Hrg Rqd, FRBP2002(a)(4))(CM11)
17
09/21/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
18
09/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
19
09/24/2018
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor
20
09/24/2018
Continue / Reschedule Hearing
21
09/24/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
22
09/25/2018
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
09/25/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/25/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/25/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
23
09/25/2018
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
24
09/25/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
25
09/25/2018
Continue / Reschedule Hearing
26
09/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
27
10/03/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
10/07/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
28
10/15/2018
Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)
29
10/16/2018
Certificate of No Objection
30
10/16/2018
BR1019 Report of Post Petition Debts
31
10/16/2018
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
32
10/16/2018
Proceeding Memo
33
10/16/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
10/17/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
34
10/18/2018
Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)
35
10/18/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
36
10/18/2018
Certificate of Service
10/18/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
37
10/19/2018
Comply (SA)
10/19/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
38
10/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
39
10/22/2018
Convert Case From Chapter 7 to Chapter 13 (BKCONV01)
10/22/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/22/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/22/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/22/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/22/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/22/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
43
10/22/2018
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (With Db Atty) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
10/23/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
44
10/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing
45
10/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
46
10/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
47
10/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
48
10/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
49
11/02/2018
Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)
50
11/02/2018
Notice of Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline
51
11/02/2018
Certificate of Service
52
11/05/2018
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
11/06/2018
OSC Referral (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/06/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
53
11/07/2018
Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)
11/07/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
54
11/08/2018
Certification of Domestic Support Payments
55
11/27/2018
Objection to Confirmation of Plan (CM45-COAwith)
11/27/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
56
11/28/2018
Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum and 206Sum)
12/03/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
57
12/12/2018
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
58
12/13/2018
Proceeding Memo
59
12/14/2018
Relief from Stay
60
12/14/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
61
12/19/2018
Proceeding Memo
62
12/19/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
12/20/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/26/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - CH 11, 12 & 13) (Text entry; no document attached.)
63
12/26/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN04)
01/11/2019
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
64
01/23/2019
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
65
01/25/2019
Amended Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN04)
66
01/29/2019
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
67
01/29/2019
Confirming Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN01) (SA)
01/29/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
68
02/19/2019
Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges (Form 410S2)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.