Mary Johnson
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00087 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/24/2018
Dismissing Case (SA)
doc
05/26/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
44
06/05/2018
Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account
45
06/08/2018
Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice (BNC Notice)
46
06/10/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Dismissal
06/11/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/11/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.