Mary Veronica Frontiera
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

1:2018-bk-00204 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
07/02/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
07/02/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
3
07/02/2018
Waive Chapter 7 Filing Fee (Form 103B) (BKM01)
07/02/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/02/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/02/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/03/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
07/03/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)
5
07/03/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)
6
07/03/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)
7
07/03/2018
Request for Notice by Creditor
8
07/05/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
9
07/05/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
10
07/05/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
11
07/05/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
12
07/06/2018
Setting Hearing (SA)
13
07/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
14
07/09/2018
Statement of Intention for Individuals (Form 108)
15
07/09/2018
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
16
07/11/2018
Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)
07/11/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
17
07/11/2018
Declaration
18
07/11/2018
Declaration
19
07/11/2018
Generic Motion / Application
20
07/11/2018
Shorten Time
21
07/11/2018
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
07/12/2018
QC Remark Re: Signature Required (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/12/2018
Update Deadline (Objections - all types) (Text entry; no document attached.)
22
07/12/2018
Declaration
23
07/12/2018
Shorten Time
24
07/12/2018
Affidavit of Service
25
07/12/2018
Affidavit of Service
07/13/2018
Update Deadline (Objections - all types) (Text entry; no document attached.)
26
07/14/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
27
07/16/2018
Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)
28
07/18/2018
Proceeding Memo
29
07/18/2018
Waive Filing Fee (BKO01)
30
07/18/2018
Relief from Stay
07/18/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
31
07/19/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
32
07/20/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
33
07/20/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
07/24/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
34
08/02/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
35
08/02/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
36
08/13/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
08/22/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/22/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/23/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
37
09/26/2018
Request for Special Notice
38
10/10/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
39
10/12/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
10/16/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.