Matthew James Deel and Arlene Sue Deel
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00190 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
06/18/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
06/18/2018
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
3
06/18/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
4
06/18/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
5
06/18/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
06/18/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
06/18/2018
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
06/19/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/19/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/19/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
06/19/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)
8
06/19/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)
9
06/19/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)
10
06/20/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
11
06/21/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
12
06/21/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
13
06/21/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
07/27/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
14
09/11/2018
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
15
09/13/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
16
09/13/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
17
09/25/2018
Notice of Deferral of Discharge (Reaffs Not Filed) (BNC Notice)
18
09/25/2018
Final Notice of Intent to Close Case Without Discharge - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
19
09/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
20
09/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
21
10/04/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
22
10/04/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
23
10/10/2018
Amended Schedules A/B C G H I J (no fee)
24
10/11/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
25
10/13/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
10/15/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/16/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.