Matthew S Williamson
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

8:2018-bk-81628 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
06/01/2018
Meeting of Creditors 13 (Auto Assign)
doc
06/02/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
32
01/12/2019
Limit Notice
35
02/07/2019
Modification of Plan (Trustee Motion)
36
02/10/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.