Matthew Thomas Edmondson
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00110 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/25/2018
Vacating Order (SA)
06/19/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
21
06/19/2018
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
22
06/21/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
23
06/21/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
24
07/06/2018
Final Notice of Intent to Close Case Without Discharge - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
25
07/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
26
07/15/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
27
07/19/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
28
07/21/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
07/25/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.