Mattice v. Northrim Bank
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00234 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/05/2018
Notice of Removal
2
10/05/2018
Civil Cover Sheet
3
10/05/2018
Order to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal
4
10/09/2018
Answer to Complaint
5
10/10/2018
Corporate Disclosure Statement
6
10/10/2018
Notice of Service List
7
10/12/2018
Initial Case Status Report Order
8
10/17/2018
Notice (Other)
11/08/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/08/2018
~Util - Set Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
10
11/13/2018
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
11
11/16/2018
Scheduling Order
12
11/26/2018
Pretrial Order
13
01/24/2019
Stipulation of Dismissal
14
01/25/2019
Order
01/25/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/25/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
01/25/2019
Judgment

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.