Maureen Valentine Fowler
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

2:2017-bk-02855 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 127 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
07/06/2017
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Receipt Number O, Fee Amount $310 Filed by Maureen Valentine Fowler
2
07/06/2017
Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Maureen Valentine Fowler.
3
07/06/2017
Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments Through the Chapter 13 Trustee Assigned to the Case Filed by Debtor Maureen Valentine Fowler
5
07/06/2017
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed Filed by Debtor Maureen Valentine Fowler.
6
07/06/2017
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Maureen Valentine Fowler.
7
07/06/2017
Notice of Intent to Pay Chapter 13 Case Filing Fee through Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Maureen Valentine Fowler.
8
07/06/2017
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 08/02/2017 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 08/22/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 10/31/2017. Government Proof of Claim due by 01/02/2018 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 10/02/2017.
9
07/07/2017
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
07/07/2017
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for debtor Maureen Valentine Fowler Case Number 08-05803, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 11/18/2008, Dismissed for failure to make plan payments on 01/13/2010; Case Number 98-01474, Chapter 7 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 03/04/1998, Standard Discharge on 06/22/1998; Case Number 07-00537, Chapter 7 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 02/05/2007, Standard Discharge on 02/10/2009; Case Number 10-01099, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 02/24/2010, Dismissed for failure to make plan payments on 10/18/2011.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10
07/07/2017
Order Approving Application for Payment of Filing Fees In Installments: IT IS ORDERED that the Debtor may pay the filing fee in installments as proposed in the application. A discharge shall not be granted until the filing fee has been paid in full. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all installments of the filing fee must be paid in full before the Debtor or Trustee may make further payments to an attorney or any other person who renders services to the Debtor in connection with the case. (Fee Amount $310.00) (RE: related document(s) 3 Application to Pay Filing Fees in Installments filed by Debtor Maureen Valentine Fowler).
11
07/08/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 8 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 07/08/2017.
12
07/09/2017
Amended Schedule A/B: Property Individual, Amended Schedule C, Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules for Individual, Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules, Statement of Financial Affairs for Individual Filed by Debtor Maureen Valentine Fowler.
13
07/09/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Maureen Valentine Fowler). Notice Date 07/09/2017.
14
07/09/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 9 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 07/09/2017.
15
07/11/2017
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Thomas G Tutten Filed by Creditor Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC.
16
08/03/2017
Meeting of Creditors Held 08/02/2017. (Ch13troffice, sc)
17
08/04/2017
Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss. (Ch13troffice, km)
18
08/04/2017
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 17 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 8/22/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
19
08/06/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 18 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 08/06/2017.
20
08/20/2017
ENTERED IN ERROR. Amended Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Maureen Valentine Fowler.
21
08/20/2017
Amended Schedule A/B: Property Individual, Statement of Financial Affairs for Individual, Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules for Individual, Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules Filed by Debtor Maureen Valentine Fowler.
22
08/20/2017
Amended Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Maureen Valentine Fowler.
23
08/20/2017
Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules, Amended Schedule C, Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules for Individual Filed by Debtor Maureen Valentine Fowler.
24
08/20/2017
CORRECTIVE ENTRY Filed by Debtor Maureen Valentine Fowler (RE: related document(s) 20 Amended Chapter 13 Plan).
25
08/28/2017
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 8/28/2017 (RE: related document(s) 8 Confirmation Hearing), 17 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation and Motion to Dismiss Case). Hearing scheduled 9/26/2017 at 11:15 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
26
08/30/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 25 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 08/30/2017.
09/21/2017
Payment of Installment Fee. Fee Amount $ 155.00 Filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway. (Ch13troffice, ct) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/21/2017
Receipt of Payment of Fee(17-02855-DSC13) [misc,feepay] (155.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21186238. Fee Amount 155.00 (re:Doc# ) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
27
09/29/2017
Bench Sheet from Confirmation Hearing
10/18/2017
Payment of Installment Fee. Fee Amount $ 77.50 Filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway. (Ch13troffice, ct) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/18/2017
Receipt of Payment of Fee(17-02855-DSC13) [misc,feepay] (77.50) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21293987. Fee Amount 77.50 (re:Doc# ) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
28
10/20/2017
Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan Signed on 10/20/2017 (RE: related document(s) 17 Trustees Objection to Confirmation and Motion to Dismiss are withdrawn).
29
10/22/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 28 Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan). Notice Date 10/22/2017.
30
10/23/2017
Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges (No Proof of Claim Filed) with Certificate of Service Filed by Creditor Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC.
11/08/2017
Payment of Installment Fee. Fee Amount $ 77.50 Filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway. (Ch13troffice, ct) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/08/2017
Receipt of Payment of Fee(17-02855-DSC13) [misc,feepay] (77.50) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21374657. Fee Amount 77.50 (re:Doc# ) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
31
11/09/2017
Case Filing Fee Paid in Full (RE: related document(s) 10 Order to Pay Filing Fees in Installments).
32
01/12/2018
ENTERED IN ERROR - incorrect docket event used. Trial Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments. (Ch13troffice, ct) Modified on 1/16/2018
33
01/12/2018
CORRECTIVE ENTRY Filed using incorrect docket event; will re-file using correct event Filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway (RE: related document(s) 32 Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments). (Ch13troffice, ct)
34
01/12/2018
Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments. (Ch13troffice, ct)
35
01/16/2018
Notice of Hearing on Trustee's Motion to Dismiss (RE: related document(s) 34 Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments). Hearing scheduled 2/13/2018 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
36
01/18/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 35 Hearing on Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Notice Date 01/18/2018.
37
02/14/2018
Bench Sheet: (RE: related document(s)[34] Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments).
38
02/14/2018
Order Conditionally Denying Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments. (Related Doc # [34]) Signed on 2/14/2018.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.