Maurice Tyrone Mobley and Vicki Michelle Mobley
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-00589 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 186 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
02/13/2018
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Receipt Number O, Fee Amount $310 Filed by Maurice Tyrone Mobley, Vicki Michelle Mobley
2
02/13/2018
Chapter 13 Plan. Filed by Debtor Maurice Tyrone Mobley, Joint Debtor Vicki Michelle Mobley.
3
02/13/2018
Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments Through the Chapter 13 Trustee Assigned to the Case Filed by Debtor Maurice Tyrone Mobley, Joint Debtor Vicki Michelle Mobley
5
02/13/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor and Joint Debtor Filed by Debtor Maurice Tyrone Mobley, Joint Debtor Vicki Michelle Mobley.
6
02/13/2018
Notice of Intent to Pay Chapter 13 Case Filing Fee through Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Maurice Tyrone Mobley, Joint Debtor Vicki Michelle Mobley.
7
02/13/2018
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 03/21/2018 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 04/26/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 04/24/2018. Government Proof of Claim due by 08/13/2018 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 05/21/2018.
8
02/14/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management (Admin adiuser)
9
02/14/2018
Order Approving Application for Payment of Filing Fees In Installments: IT IS ORDERED that the Debtor may pay the filing fee in installments as proposed in the application. A discharge shall not be granted until the filing fee has been paid in full. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all installments of the filing fee must be paid in full before the Debtor or Trustee may make further payments to an attorney or any other person who renders services to the Debtor in connection with the case. (Fee Amount $310.00) (RE: related document(s)[3] Application to Pay Filing Fees in Installments filed by Debtor Maurice Tyrone Mobley, Joint Debtor Vicki Michelle Mobley).
10
02/14/2018
Notice to Show Cause Why This Case Should Not Be Dismissed for Having an Active Chapter 13, Case No. 13-04237-TOM-13. Show Cause hearing to be held on 3/8/2018 at 11:30 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
11
02/13/2018
Notice of Deficient Filing and Show Cause Hearing Why This Case Should Not Be Dismissed for Failure to File Proper Schedules. Incomplete Filings due by 2/27/2018. Show Cause hearing to be held on 3/8/2018 at 11:30 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
12
02/14/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor PRA Receivables Management, LLC.
13
02/15/2018
Motion to Extend Automatic Stay Filed by Debtor Maurice Tyrone Mobley, Joint Debtor Vicki Michelle Mobley
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.