Maurice d Miller
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

2:2017-bk-03285 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
View docket sheet
Last full docket sheet refresh: 104 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
08/02/2017
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Receipt Number O, Fee Amount $310 Filed by Maurice D Miller
2
08/02/2017
Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Maurice D Miller.
3
08/02/2017
Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments Through the Chapter 13 Trustee Assigned to the Case Filed by Debtor Maurice D Miller
5
08/02/2017
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed Filed by Debtor Maurice D Miller.
6
08/02/2017
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Maurice D Miller.
7
08/02/2017
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 08/30/2017 at 10:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 09/19/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 11/28/2017. Government Proof of Claim due by 01/29/2018 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 10/30/2017.
8
08/02/2017
Notice of Intent to Pay Chapter 13 Case Filing Fee through Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Maurice D Miller.
9
08/03/2017
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
10
08/03/2017
Order Approving Application for Payment of Filing Fees In Installments: IT IS ORDERED that the Debtor may pay the filing fee in installments as proposed in the application. A discharge shall not be granted until the filing fee has been paid in full. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all installments of the filing fee must be paid in full before the Debtor or Trustee may make further payments to an attorney or any other person who renders services to the Debtor in connection with the case. (Fee Amount $310.00) (RE: related document(s) 3 Application to Pay Filing Fees in Installments filed by Debtor Maurice D Miller).
11
08/04/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 7 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 08/04/2017.
12
08/05/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Maurice D Miller). Notice Date 08/05/2017.
13
08/05/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 9 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 08/05/2017.
14
08/16/2017
Objection to Confirmation of Plan Filed by Creditor Synovus Bank.
15
08/16/2017
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 14 Objection to Confirmation of the Plan filed by Creditor Synovus Bank). Hearing scheduled 9/19/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
16
08/31/2017
Meeting of Creditors Held 8/30/2017. (Ch13troffice, bc)
17
09/05/2017
Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to File Documents under 521(i), Trustee's Motion to Dismiss. (Ch13troffice, km)
18
09/06/2017
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 17 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to File Documents under 521(i), Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 9/19/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
19
09/06/2017
Amended Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Maurice D Miller.
20
09/06/2017
Amended Schedule I: Individual- Your Income, Amended Schedule J: Individual- Your Expenses, Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules for Individual, Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules Filed by Debtor Maurice D Miller.
21
09/08/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 18 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 09/08/2017.
22
09/18/2017
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Gary Wilson Lee Filed by Creditor James A. Brown.
23
09/22/2017
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 9/22/2017 (RE: related document(s) 7 Confirmation Hearing), 14 Objection to Confirmation of the Plan filed by Creditor Synovus Bank, 17 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to File Documents under 521(i), Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 10/24/2017 at 11:15 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
24
09/24/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 23 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 09/24/2017.
10/19/2017
Payment of Installment Fee. Fee Amount $ 155.00 Filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway. (Ch13troffice, ct) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/19/2017
Receipt of Payment of Fee(17-03285-DSC13) [misc,feepay] (155.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21298682. Fee Amount 155.00 (re:Doc# ) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
25
10/24/2017
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 10/24/2017 (RE: related document(s) 7 Confirmation Hearing, 14 Objection to Confirmation of the Plan filed by Creditor Synovus Bank, 17 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to File Documents under 521(i), Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 11/28/2017 at 11:15 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
26
10/26/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 25 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 10/26/2017.
11/08/2017
Payment of Installment Fee. Fee Amount $ 77.50 Filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway. (Ch13troffice, ct) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/08/2017
Receipt of Payment of Fee(17-03285-DSC13) [misc,feepay] (77.50) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21375108. Fee Amount 77.50 (re:Doc# ) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
27
11/27/2017
Withdrawal of Claims: 8 Filed by Debtor Maurice D Miller.
28
11/28/2017
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 11/28/2017 (RE: related document(s) 7 Confirmation Hearing), 14 Objection to Confirmation of the Plan filed by Creditor Synovus Bank, 17 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to File Documents under 521(i), Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 1/30/2018 at 11:15 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
29
11/30/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 28 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 11/30/2017.
12/07/2017
Payment of Installment Fee. Fee Amount $ 77.50 Filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway. (Ch13troffice, ct) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/07/2017
Receipt of Payment of Fee(17-03285-DSC13) [misc,feepay] (77.50) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21481593. Fee Amount 77.50 (re:Doc# ) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
30
12/07/2017
Case Filing Fee Paid in Full (RE: related document(s) 10 Order to Pay Filing Fees in Installments).
31
01/21/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan, and Request for Valuation of Security. Filed by Debtor Maurice D Miller (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Maurice D Miller.).
32
01/21/2018
Amended Schedule I: Individual- Your Income, Amended Schedule J: Individual- Your Expenses, Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules for Individual, Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules Filed by Debtor Maurice D Miller.
33
01/23/2018
Notice of Withdrawal of a Document(RE: related document(s) 14 Objection to Confirmation of Plan Filed by Creditor Synovus Bank.).
34
02/01/2018
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 2/1/2018 (RE: related document(s) 7 Confirmation Hearing, 17 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation and Motion to Dismiss Case). Hearing scheduled 2/13/2018 at 11:15 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
35
02/03/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 34 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 02/03/2018.
36
02/16/2018
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 2/16/2018 (RE: related document(s) 7 Confirmation Hearing), 17 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation and Motion to Dismiss Case). Hearing scheduled 3/13/2018 at 11:15 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
37
02/18/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 36 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 02/18/2018.
38
02/28/2018
Transfer of Claim Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferor: Synovus Mortgage Corp (Claim No. 1) To RH AL, LLC. Fee Amount $25 Filed by Creditor RH AL, LLC.
02/28/2018
Receipt of Transfer of Claim(17-03285-DSC13) [claims,trclm] (25.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21773428. Fee Amount 25.00 (re:Doc# 38) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
39
02/28/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan. Filed by Debtor Maurice D Miller (RE: related document(s) 31 Amended Chapter 13 Plan, and Request for Valuation of Security. Filed by Debtor Maurice D Miller (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Maurice D Miller.).).
40
02/28/2018
Amended Schedule I: Individual- Your Income, Amended Schedule J: Individual- Your Expenses, Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules for Individual, Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules Filed by Debtor Maurice D Miller.
41
03/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 38 Transfer of Claim filed by Creditor RH AL, LLC). Notice Date 03/02/2018.
42
03/13/2018
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 3/13/2018 (RE: related document(s) 7 Confirmation Hearing, 17 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to File Documents under 521(i), Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 4/3/2018 at 11:15 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
43
03/15/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 42 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 03/15/2018.
44
04/05/2018
Bench Sheet from Confirmation Hearing
45
04/25/2018
Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan Signed on 4/25/2018 (RE: related document(s) 17 Trustees objection to Confirmation is overruled and Motion to Dismiss is denied, Motion for Valuation of Security (CM27), 39 Amended Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Maurice D Miller).
46
04/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 45 Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan). Notice Date 04/27/2018.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.