Maxine Nancy Evans
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00224 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
07/16/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
07/16/2018
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
3
07/16/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
07/16/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/16/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
07/17/2018
Request for Notice by Creditor
07/17/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/17/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/17/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/17/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/17/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
07/17/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
9
07/19/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
10
07/19/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
11
07/19/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
12
08/03/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
08/28/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/28/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
09/24/2018
Reaffirmation Agreement (With Atty Signature) (BKRA01)
14
09/24/2018
Notice Requiring Original Signature
15
09/24/2018
Reaffirmation Agreement (With Atty Signature) (BKRA01)
09/25/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/25/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/25/2018
Court Remark Regarding Reaffirmation Agreement (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
09/26/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.